METZ v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00540-CFL
District Judge Charles F. Lettow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo KEVIN J. METZ, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GARY MYERS & ASSOCIATES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary R. Myers +1 800 355 1095 +1 603 529 3009 myers@mclaw.us
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian John Moran +1 202 307 6299 +1 202 514 7969 christian.moran@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/5/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County
Terminated
Origin 4
Reopened 12/27/2006
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '05-5158'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag REOPEN
  Entries (83) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007
Appeal record returned from CAFC. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 67 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 12/28/2006 CAFC Mandate Reversing
    MANDATE of CAFC reversing [63] Published Opinion/Order (hw1, ).
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006
      Appeal record sent to CAFC. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 66 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/15/2005 Terminated:
        CAFC Case Number 05-5158 for [65] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 65 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005, Terminated: 12/27/2006 Notice of Appeal
          NOTICE OF APPEAL by USA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. Fee waived. (hw1, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005
            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/2/2005. (vp1, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Transcript
              TRANSCRIPT (Pg 1-36) of Proceedings held on 5/18/05 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (eph, )
                LREF
                Blank 64 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005
                JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff is awarded judgment as follows: (1) back pay in the amount of $30,300.74 for the period from September 9, 1994 through October 30, 1995; (2) early retirement starting on October 31, 1995, back retirement pay in the grade of E-7 from October 31, 1995 to the present, and retirement pay for the remainder of MSgt. Metz's natural life; (3) expurgation of all references to MSgt. Metz's separation in lieu of court-martial from his record. Costs to plaintiff. (lld, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 63 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 Court Filing
                  PUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION granting [58] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by KEVIN J. METZ,. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment awarding MSgt. Metz relief as follows: (1) back pay in the amount of $30,300.74 for the period from September 9, 1994 through October 30, 1995; (2) early retirement starting on October 31, 1995, back retirement pay in the grade of E-7 from October 31, 1995 to the present, and retirement pay for the remainder of MSgt. Metz's natural life; (3) expurgation of all references to MSgt. Metz's separation in lieu of court-martial from his record. Costs to plaintiff. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lld, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 62 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [58] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by KEVIN J. METZ. Service: 4/25/2005.(mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 61 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                      ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [58] MOTION for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2005 at 10:00 AM before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 60 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005 Response to Motion
                        RESPONSE to [58] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by USA. Reply due by 5/3/2005. Service: 4/19/2005.(hw1, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 59 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER: The court accnowledges receipt of Plaintiff's Notice, filed March 23, 2005. This notice shall be treated as a motion for judgment. Defendant shall respond to plaintiff's motion for judgement on or before 4/19/2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 58 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005, Terminated: 5/31/2005 Terminated:
                            MOTION for Summary Judgment, pursuant to Rule 56.2(b)(4), submitted as "Plaintiff's Notice," re [50] Order Remanding to Agency filed by KEVIN J. METZ.Service: 3/22/2005. Response due by 4/25/2005 (hw1, ) .
                              LREF
                              Blank 57 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Response to Order to Show Cause
                              RESPONSE (pursuant to RCFC 56.2(b)(3)) TO [50] PUBLISHED OPINION, remanding case to the United States Air Force, filed by USA. Service: 2/28/2005.(mb2, ) Modified on 3/25/2005 to clarify docket text. (dls).
                                LREF
                                Blank 56 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [55] Motion for Extension of Time. Response to the Court's Remand Order due by 2/28/2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 55 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005, Terminated: 1/28/2005 Terminated:
                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until 02/28/05 to File and Serve the Response to the Court's Remand Order by USA.Service: 01/27/05. Response due by 2/14/2005 (mb2, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 54 Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: 1/13/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [53] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its response to the court's remand order by 1/27/05. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jat, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: 1/13/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's response to the court's remand order due by 1/27/2005. (jat, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 53 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004, Terminated: 12/29/2004 Terminated:
                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until January 27, 2005 to file Response to the court's Remand Order by USA.Service: 12/17/04. (dw1)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 52 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004 Status Report
                                          STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 10/29/2004.(jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 51 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Status Report
                                            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 8/30/2004.(jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 50 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004 Court Filing
                                              PUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER DENYING defendant's motion to dismiss and alternative motion for summary judgment on the administrative record; GRANTING-IN-PART plaintiff's motion for summary judgment; REMANDING case (for six months) to the Secretary of the Air Force for further proceedings consistent with the specific directions set forth in this opinion; and directing defendant to report to the Court the status of remand proceedings every 60 days until the Court's instructions have been carried out. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow.(Agency Decision due by 12/30/2004. Status Report due by 8/30/2004) Certified copy forwarded to the Secretary of the Air Force. (dls, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004
                                                Administrative Record (consisting of three volumes) returned to defendant's counsel for return to agency pursuant to RCFC 56.2(a)(4). (dls)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004 Response
                                                  REPLY to [45] Dft's Post Trial Brief filed by KEVIN J. METZ. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 5/28/2004.(jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [47] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File Pltf's Reply to Dft's Post Trial Brief Out of Turn. The Clerk of the Court shall file pltf's Reply to Dft's Post Trial Brief as of this date. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004, Terminated: 6/4/2004 Terminated:
                                                      UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Pltf's Reply to Dft's Post Trial Brief Out of Turn by KEVIN J. METZ.Service: 5/28/2004. Response due by 6/14/2004. (jcp, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004 Response
                                                        REPLY to [44] Pltf's Post Trial Brief, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 5/27/2004.(jcp, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Post-Trial Brief
                                                          POST TRIAL BRIEF by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE](jcp, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                            POST HEARING BRIEF by KEVIN J. METZ. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 5/18/2004.(jcp, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in Two Volumes held on 4/19/2004 - 4/20/2004 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 4/26/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles F. Lettow : Evidentiary Hearing Day 2 held on 4/20/2004. (lcd, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004
                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles F. Lettow : Evidentiary Hearing Day 1 held on 4/19/2004. (lcd, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Witness List
                                                                      Witness List by KEVIN J. METZ. (jat, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 3/26/2004 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: 3/26/2004
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles F. Lettow : Pretrial Conference held on 3/26/2004, addressing issues related to evidentiary hearing scheduled for 4/19/2004 and 4/20/2004. (lcd, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004
                                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 3/31/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [39] Dft's Motion to Schedule a Pretrial Conference. A conference addressing the topics set forth in dft's Motion shall be held on 3/26/2004 at 9:30 am at the National Courts Building. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2004 09:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004, Terminated: 3/23/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION to Schedule a Pretrial Conference, by USA.Service: 3/22/2004. Response due by 4/8/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER: [37] Dft's Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004, Terminated: 3/9/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's [36] 2/20/2004 Order, Scheduling an Evidentiary Haring by USA.Service: 3/5/2004. Response due by 3/22/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Order on Motion for HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER: [32] Pltf's Motion for an Evidentiaary Hearing is GRANTED. An Evidentiary Hearing will be held on 4/19/2004 and 4/20/2004 09:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004
                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles F. Lettow : Hearing held on 1/7/04. (rs1, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                            RESPONSE to [32] MOTION for leave to submit affidavits, or in the alternative for a Hearing and for leave File a MOTION to Remand filied by USA. Reply due by 2/27/2004. Service: 2/13/2004.(hw1, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [33] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [32] Pltf's MOTION for Leave to Submit Affidavits. Response due on or before 2/13/2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004, Terminated: 2/11/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [32] Pltf's MOTION for Leave to Submit Affidavits, or in the Alternative MOTION for an Evidentiary Hearing, or in the Further Alternative MOTION for Remand to the Army Board for Correction of Militayr Records, until 2/13/2004, by USA.Service: 2/5/2004. Response due by 2/23/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004, Terminated: 2/20/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Submit Affidavits, or in the Alternative MOTION for an Evidentiary Hearing or in the Further Alternative MOTION to Remand to the Army Board for Correction of Military Records (ABCMR) by KEVIN J. METZ.Service: 1/16/2004. Response due by 2/6/2004. Response due by 2/6/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 1/7/2004 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: 1/6/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                      REPLY to Dft's Opposition to [24] Pltfs' CROSS MOTION and REPLY to Dft's Reply to Pltf's Opposition to [15] Dft's Motion to Dismiss, or Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by KEVIN J. METZ. Service: 12/29/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                        COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS by USA. Service: 12/18/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting [27] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. The Clerk's office shall file Dft's Counter-Statement of Facts. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003, Terminated: 12/22/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time, Out of Time, until 12/19/2003 to file Dft's Counter-Statement of Facts in Response to Pltf's Cross Motion for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record by USA.Service: 12/18/03. Response due by 1/5/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/17/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [24] CROSS MOTION to [15] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by filed by USA. Reply due by 15/04. Service: 12/15/03.(jat, ) Modified on 12/31/2003 to correct reply due date. (dls).
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re: [15] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, and [24] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to [15] Dft's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record: Motion Hearing shall be held on 1/7/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                  CROSS MOTION and OPPOSITION to [15] Dft's Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), and Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record by KEVIN J. METZ. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 11/12/03. Response due by 12/15/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF FACTS With Adoptions, Exceptions and Additions to Dft's Statement of Facts by KEVIN J. METZ. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 11/12/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [21] Pltf's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [15] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) or, in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record. Response due on or before 11/14/2003. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003, Terminated: 10/28/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [15] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record,until 11/14/03, by KEVIN J. METZ.Service: 10/23/03. Response due by 11/10/2003 (jat, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                          Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney Gary R. Myers in place of Kevin J. Metz, Pro Se Plaintiff With Affidavit of Substituted Counsel by KEVIN J. METZ.Service: 10/14/03. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 Administrative Record (Supplement)
                                                                                                                            AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD I (p. 1 through 160) by USA. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Amended Administrative Record by USA. Service: 10/16/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                ***Attorney Gary Rowland Myers for KEVIN J. METZ added. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/16/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Service by USA re: [14] Dft's Statement of Facts, [15] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) or, in the Altervative MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, [16] Administrative Record Volume I and II, and Dft's Motion to File Administrative Record. Service: 10/8/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                    Set Deadline as to [15] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record. Response due by 11/10/2003 (dls, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 Administrative RecordCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (2 Volumes) by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/26/03.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT OF FACTS by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Judgment, Motion for Leave to file the Administrative Record and Statement of Facts; granting [12] Motion for Leave to File Administrative Record. Defendant shall promptly effect appropriate service on Mr. Metz personally, as required by RCFC 5, of all documents submitted to the Court on 9/26/03. Upon effecting appropriate service, Defendant shall file with the Court a proper Proof of Service. Plaintiff's time to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for Judgment shall run from the date of proper service of such motion on Mr. Metz. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jat, ) Modified on 10/8/2003 (jat, ).
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003, Terminated: 10/2/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File administrative record by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge.Service: 9/26/03. Response due by 10/14/2003 (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 10/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER disallowing the filing of the Notice of Appearance for failure to comply with RCFC 83.1(c)(4) and directing the Clerk's Office to return the Notice. Substitution by plaintiff of his counsel of record may be allowed upon compliance with RCFC 83.1(c)(4). Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/16/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 9/12/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Charles Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to Rule 40.1(c) of the RCFC, which permits the Chief Judge to reassign any case if necessary for the efficient administration of justice, the Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign the above captioned case to Judge Charles Lettow. Judge John P. Wiese no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Christian John Moran for The United States. Service: 5/8/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 11/2/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Stay Proceedings. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 11/1/2000, Entered: 11/3/2000, Terminated: 11/2/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by KEVIN J. METZ (Service : 10/30/00 ) to Stay Proceedings (pending a final decision by the AFBCMR). (DS)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Emmanuel Michael Chiaparas. Service: 9/21/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: 9/13/2000 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER (i) directing parties to confer and arrange for preliminary status conference; (ii) identifying filing requirements for conference; and (iii) precluding filing of dispositive motions until after conference has been held Signed by Judge John P. Wiese (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge John P. Wiese . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT filed. Copies (5) to defendant. FILING FEE $ 120 RECEIPT # 050333 (Answer due on 11/6/00) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                      CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned . (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 166 times.

                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?