HOLT v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00571-LMB
District Judge Lawrence M. Baskir, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT, Plaintiff

Represented by Wiley Rein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric S. Andreas +1 202 719 7104 +1 202 719 7049 EAndreas@wileyrein.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian John Moran +1 202 307 6299 +1 202 514 7969 christian.moran@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/25/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County
Terminated 9/9/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '06-5017'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (117) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 107 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 1/12/2006 CAFC Mandate Dismissing
MANDATE of CAFC dismissing [105] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 106 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Terminated:
    CAFC Case Number 06-5017 for [105] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 105 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Terminated:
      NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by USA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. Fee not required.(hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 104 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Certified Transcript to Attorney
        CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated September 12, 2005, forwarded to Eric S. Andreas. See letter in file. (bre,)
          LREF
          Blank 103 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/9/2005
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $59,912.40. (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank 102 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/9/2005 Unpublished Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
            ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ORDER. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in the amount of $59,912.40. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (lld, )
              LREF
              Blank 101 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 ~Notice (other)
              NOTICE of Filing pursuant to RCFC 56.2(b)(4) filed by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT. Service: 9/6/05.(dls )
                LREF
                Blank 100 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Terminated:
                MOTION for Separate Judgment, filed by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT. Service: 8/29/2005. Response due by 9/15/2005. (mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 99 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 ~Notice (other)
                  NOTICE of filing response to the court's February 18, 2005 order by USA. Service: 6/1/05.(dw1)
                    LREF
                    Blank 98 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Terminated:
                    Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney Eric Andreas in place of Karen M. Lockwood filed by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT.Service: 3/24/2005. (mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                      ***Attorney Eric S. Andreas for SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT added. Attorney Karen McCleary-Cale Lockwood terminated. (mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/22/2005 Remark
                        Certified copy of the February 18, 2005, Opinion forwarded to the Board for Correction of Naval Records. (dls )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/22/2005 Administrative Record Returned
                          Administrative Record Returned to defendant for return to agency pursuant to RCFC 56.2(a)(4). (dls )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005
                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 2/14/2005. (vp1, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 97 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                              PUBLISHED OPINION on [19] Cross Motion filed by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT, [11] Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Transcript
                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/13/05 before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (eph, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 96 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Supplemental BriefCourt Filing
                                  SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 01/13/05.(mb2, ) Modified on 1/19/2005 (mb2, ).
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 95 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                    Plaintiff's NOTICE of intent to rely on supplemental authority. by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT Service: 1/10/05.(eph, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 93 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court confirms Oral Argument is rescheduled in this case for 1/13/2005 at 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 94 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004 Order Cancelling Deadline/HearingCourt Filing
                                        ORDER Cancelling Oral Argument scheduled in this case for December 14, 2004, @2:00p.m. (EST). Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (lg1, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 92 Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: 11/10/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral Argument set for 12/14/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dw1)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 91 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Status Report
                                            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 10/22/04.(tjk, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 90 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004
                                              NOTICE to Interested Persons pursuant to Rule 14(b)(1) forwarded to defendant's attorney for service this day. (dls)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 89 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting [88] Motion to Notify Interested Party. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dls)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 88 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004, Terminated: 8/6/2004 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION to Notify Interested Party (Ms. Hilda Holt) filed by USA.Service: 8/4/04. Response due by 8/23/2004 (dls)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 87 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER: The Court confirms Oral Argument is scheduled in this case for 9/16/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 86 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                      REPLY by USA re [81] Supplemental Brief. Service: 6/25/04.(dw1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 85 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting [84] Dft's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to [81] Pltf's Supplemental Brief. Reply due by 6/25/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 84 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004, Terminated: 6/7/2004 Terminated:
                                                          UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [81] Pltf's Supplemental Brief, until 6/25/2004, by USA.Service: 6/1/2004. Response due by 6/18/2004. (jcp, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 83 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [82] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Supplemental Brief. Reply due by 6/4/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dw1)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 82 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004, Terminated: 5/11/2004 Terminated:
                                                              UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [81] Pltf's Supplemental Brief, until 6/4/2004, by USA.Service: 5/6/2004. Response due by 5/24/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 81 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Supplemental Brief
                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT. Service: 4/30/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 80 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER (Non-ADR Pilot Program Case, Revised June 10, 2003). Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dw1)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 79 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting [77] Pltf's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Pltf's Supplemental Brief due by 4/30/2004. Dft's reply is due no later than 5/14/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 78 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004 Terminated:
                                                                      Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney Karen M. Lockwood in place of Plaintiff Pro Se by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT.Service: 3/23/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 77 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004, Terminated: 3/29/2004 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/30/2004 to file the Supplemental Brief Ordered by the Court in its 12/19/2003 Order by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT.Service: 3/23/2004. Response due by 4/9/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 76 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until April 2, 2004 to file file supplemental brief by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT. Fi8led by leave of the Judge.Service: 2/17/2004. (hw1, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 75 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER: Pltf's Unopposed Motion for an Enlargement of Time Until 4/2/2004, to file Pltf's Supplemental Brief is hereby GRANTED. Dft's reply is due no later than 4/16/2004.Reply due by 4/16/2004. Supplemental Pleadings due by 4/2/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 74 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Order Removing Case from ADRCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER: We ask that the Clerk of Court remove this case from the ADR Program. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 73 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Response to [71] Court Scheduling Order of 12/19/2003 by USA. Service: 1/16/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 72 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 12/11/2003 before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 71 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/24/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall file supplemental briefs addressing these items in the context of the statutory governing SBP entitlement. The Dft shall file its brief on 1/16/2004. Pltf will file a response to that brief by 2/17/2004. The Dft will file its reply thereto no later than 3/2/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/15/2003
                                                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 1/12/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003
                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir: Hearing held at 2pm on December 11, 2004. (dcl)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/21/2003 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER: The Court confirms the telephonic Oral Argument on [19] Pltf's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment, and [11] Dft's Motion to Dismiss or Motion for Summary Judgment: Oral Argument set for 12/11/2003 02:00 PM before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER: The parties shall notify the Court's Judicial Assistant of the proposed oral argument dates for the cross motions for summary judgment no later than 11/14/2003. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Amended Complaint
                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT. Service: 9/20/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 67 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                REPLY to Dft's Opposition to [19] Pltf's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT. Service: 9/20/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 10/3/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [65] Motion for Leave to File a response to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and to file Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (vro, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003, Terminated: 9/26/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time for an Enlargement of Time to Reply to Dft's Opposition to Pltf's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and to File an Amended Complaint by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT.Service: 9/2/03. Response due by 9/19/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 64 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to cross motion and to file her amended complaint,until 9/1/03, by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT.Service: 5/9/03. (hw1, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 63 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                        NOTICE of filing of Statement of Supplemental Authority, by The United States.(lrd)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 62 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                          NOTICE of filing of Statement on Stipulations, by The United States. (lrd)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 61 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting [59] Motion for leave to File Statement of Supplemantal Authority, granting [60] Motion for Leave to File Statement regarding stipulations. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (lrd)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/19/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File statement regarding stipulations by The United States.Service: 3/14/03. Response due by 3/31/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 59 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003, Terminated: 4/8/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                MOTION for leave to file supplemental authority by The United States.Service: 3/14/03. Response due by 3/31/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003
                                                                                                                  Status Conference held (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Transcript
                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 4, 2003. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER Reply to Response to Motion reset to 6/2/03 for [19-1] cross motion and plaintiff's motion to file an amended complaint is GRANTED (signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER setting Status Conference for 3:00 p.m. on 2/4/03 (signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Statement of Itemized Documents and Their Importance as Requested by the Court by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/17/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Response
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA pursuant to [53-4] order. Service: 12/27/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER re: Telephonic Status Conference for 3:00 p.m., 1/29/03 , Affidavits shall be filed by Brief deadline of 12/27/02 , and Staying proceedings ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT to [49-1] ADR pilot. Service: 10/10/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT to [50-1] response by USA, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/20/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/25/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA to Court Order on Alternative Dispute Resolution. Service: 9/20/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002 ADR - Notice of ADR Automatic Program Procedures.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Notice of ADR Pilot Procedures (signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to Parties (FE)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: 9/3/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA pursuant to [47-3] order. Service: 8/27/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002
                                                                                                                                          CASE assigned to ADR Judge Robert H. Hodges . (DS)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [46-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion to amend the complaint; Reply to Response to Motion reset to 12/27/02 for [18-1] motion for Leave to file an amended complaint ; directing defendant to file the missing documents of the Administrative Record by 8/30/02 ; and directing the Clerk to appoint an ADR Judge for this case under the ADR Pilot Program. ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002, Terminated: 7/30/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                              MOTION by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT (Service: 7/22/02) to Extend Time to file reply to response to amend the complaint , (120 days). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: 7/24/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                Notice of reassignment to Judge Lawrence M. Baskir . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/2/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [43-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to the Motion for leave to Amend the complaint Reply to Response to Motion reset to 8/29/02 for [18-1] motion for Leave to file an amended complaint (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002, Terminated: 5/1/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT (Service: 4/24/02) to Extend Time to file reply to the Motion for leave to Amend the complaint until 8/29/02. Response due: 5/13/02. (LTD) Modified on 05/01/2002
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [41-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to the Motion to Amend the complaint Reply to Response to Motion reset to 5/1/02 for [18-1] motion for Leave to file an amended complaint (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002, Terminated: 1/23/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT (Service: 1/15/02) to Extend Time to file reply to the Motion to Amend the complaint until 5/1/02. Response due: 2/1/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: 12/18/2001, Terminated: 12/13/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT (Service : 12/3/01 ) to Extend Time within which to reply to the response to the motion to amend the complaint , (until February 1, 2002) (HW)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: 12/18/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT (Service: 12/3/01) to Extend Time within which to reply to response to cross motion , (until February 1, 2002). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: 12/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [40-1] motion to Extend Time within which to reply to the response to the motion to amend the complaint, granting [39-1] motion to Extend Time within which to reply to response to cross motion, granting [36-1] motion for Leave to file out of time for an enlargement of time to reply to opposition to cross-motion for summary judgment Reply to Response to Motion reset to 2/1/02 for [19-1] cross motion , Amended Pleadings deadline to 2/1/02 ( signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001 Notice of Change of AddressCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of change of address by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT, filed by leave of the Judge. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: 12/11/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT (Service: 12/3/01) for Leave to file out of time for an enlargement of time to reply to opposition to cross-motion for summary judgment . Response due: 12/20/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/15/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [34-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to the Motion to Amend and granting [33-1] motion for Leave to file out of time for an enlargement of time to reply to Defendant's opposition to Motion to Amend complaint Reply to Response to Motion reset to 12/3/01 for [18-1] motion Leave to file an amended complaint (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/15/2001, Terminated: 11/14/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT (Service: 11/2/01) to Extend Time to file reply to the Motion to Amend until 12/2/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/14/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT (Service: 11/2/01) for Leave to file out of time for an enlargement of time to reply to Defendant's opposition to Motion to Amend complaint . Response due: 11/19/01 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/6/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/2/01) to [19-1] cross motion. Reply due: 11/19/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [30-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to the Motion to Dismiss Reply to Response to Motion reset to 11/5/01 for [11-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 10/25/2001, Entered: 10/26/2001, Terminated: 10/31/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 10/25/01) to Extend Time to file reply to the Motion to Dismiss i until 11/5/01. Response due: 11/13/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/19/01) to [18-1] motion for Leave to file an amended complaint. Reply due: 11/2/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [27-1] motion to Extend Time to file a response to the Motion for leave and reply to the Motion to Dismiss and Cross-Motion Response to [18-1] motion for Leave to file an amended complaint reset to 10/19/01 , and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 10/29/01 for [11-1] motion to Dismiss and [11-2] motion for Judgment upon the administrative record (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/12/2001, Terminated: 10/12/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 10/11/01) to Extend Time to file a response to the Motion for leave and reply to the Motion to Dismiss and Cross-Motion until 10/19/01 and 10/29/01 respectively. Response due: 10/29/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: 9/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [25-1] motion to Extend Time within which file and serve response Response to [18-1] motion for Leave to file an amended complaint reset to 10/12/01 , and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 10/22/01 for [11-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001, Terminated: 9/13/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 9/12/01 ) to Extend Time within which file and serve response , (30 days). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for leave to file an amended complaint and opposition to our motion to dismiss Response to [18-1] motion for Leave to file an amended complaint reset to 9/12/01 and Response to [19-1] cross motion reset to 9/20/01 (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001, Terminated: 8/28/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 8/27/01) to Extend Time to respond to motion for leave to file an amended complaint and opposition to our motion to dismiss (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 8/8/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [21-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the motion for leave to file an amended complaint and granting [21-2] motion to Extend Time to file reply to the Motion to Dismiss and cross-motion for summary judgment Response to [18-1] motion for Leave to file an amended complaint reset to 8/29/01 , and Reply to Response to Motion and Response to Cross-Motion is due on 9/6/01 for [11-1] motion to Dismiss, reset to 9/6/01 for [11-2] motion for Judgment upon the administrative record (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 7/31/2001, Terminated: 8/8/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 7/30/01) to Extend Time to respond to the motion for leave to file an amended complaint , and to Extend Time to file reply to the Motion to Dismiss and cross-motion for summary judgment until 8/29/01 and 9/6/01 respectively. Response due: 8/16/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of FILING ADDITIONAL EXHIBITS by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT, by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001, Terminated: 2/5/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CROSS MOTION, with supporting documents, by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT (Service: 7/7/01) and RESPONSE to [11-1] motion to Dismiss by USA, [11-2] motion for Judgment upon the administrative record by USA. Filed leave of the Judge. Response due: 8/7/01. (LTD) Modified on 07/16/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT (Service: 7/11/01) for Leave to file an amended complaint . Response due: 7/30/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 5/8/2001, Entered: 5/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to motion to dismiss Response to [11-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 7/9/01 (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 5/4/2001, Entered: 5/7/2001, Terminated: 5/8/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT (Service: 5/3/01) to Extend Time to file response to motion to dismiss , (until July 9, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to Motion to Dismiss Response to [11-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 5/8/01, [11-2] motion for Judgment upon the administrative record reset to 5/8/01 (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001, Terminated: 3/7/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by SHIRLEY JEAN HOLT (Service : 3/2/01) to Extend Time to file response to Motion to Dismiss (until 05/08/01). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative record filed by USA. Service: 2/6/01. (2 volumes) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [9-1] motion for Leave to file the administrative record (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 2/5/01) to Dismiss , or in the alternative, for Judgment upon the administrative record . Response due: 3/8/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 2/5/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001, Terminated: 2/6/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 2/5/01) for Leave to file the administrative record . Response due: 2/22/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint Answer deadline to 2/5/01 ( signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001, Terminated: 1/19/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 1/18/01 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint , (until February 5, 2001). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: 11/29/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 1/22/01. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: 11/21/2000, Terminated: 11/27/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 11/17/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until January 22, 2001]. Response due: 12/4/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Special procedures order to conserve resources of the parties and expedite disposition ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ). Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Christian John Moran. Service: 10/5/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: 9/26/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of assignment to Judge James T. Turner. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #050454. Answer due on 11/24/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 131 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?