TENNESSEE VALLEY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:01-cv-00249-CFL
District Judge Charles F. Lettow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tennessee Valley Authority, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Veterans Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter K. Shea +1 865 632 7319 +1 865 632 6718 pkshea@tva.gov
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sonia Marie Orfield +1 202 353 0534 +1 202 514 8624 sonia.m.orfield@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/26/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County None
Terminated 1/31/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '06-5073'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED, ECF, SNF
  Entries (233) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 211 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Court Filing
ORDER RETURNING UNFILED: Motion to Intervene received 7/24/2007 from William Peterson. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (rhb, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 210 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007 Court Filing
    ORDER returning submission. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (rs1)
      LREF
      Legal Document 209 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006 CAFC Case Number
      CAFC Case Number 06-5073 for [208] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 208 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 Court Filing
        NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by USA. Copies to Judge Charles F. Lettow, opposing party and CAFC. (Orfield, Sonia)
          LREF
          Legal Document 207 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 Certified Transcript to Attorney
          CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated January 31, 2006, forwarded to Peter K. Shea. See letter in file. (bre,)
            LREF
            Legal Document 206 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006
            JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $34,893,207.00. No costs. (lld, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 205 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006 Court Filing
              PUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment for plaintiff in the amount of $34,893,207.In accord with Restatement (Second) of Judgments Sec. 26(1)(b) and (e), TVA shall retain the right to bring subsequent actions on claims for damages incurred after September 30, 2004.Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                LREF
                Legal Document 204 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 27, 2005 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005
                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 11/14/2005. (vp1, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 203 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005
                    POST TRIAL BRIEF (Response) filed by USA. (Orfield, Sonia)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 202 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005
                      POST TRIAL BRIEF RESPONSE filed by TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY. (Shea, Peter)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 201 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005
                        POST TRIAL BRIEF by USA. (Orfield, Sonia)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 200 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 Court Filing
                          ORDER granting defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time. Defendant's opening Post Trial Brief due 9/21/2005 (plaintiff filed opening Post Trial Brief on 9/16/2005). Plaintiff's and Defendant's Post Trial Response Briefs due 10/19/2005.Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 199 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005
                            Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY. (Shea, Peter)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 198 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005, Terminated: 9/19/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                              First MOTION for Extension of Time until September 21, 2005 to The parties' post-trial briefs filed by USA. Response due by 10/3/2005. (Orfield, Sonia)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 197 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                Cumulative Index (Transcript Under Seal) June 21, 2005 through July 15, 2005 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Transcript previously submitted. Filed w/Exhibits. Plaintiffs 1-99, Defendants 2-313, Joint 1-3. Plaintiffs exhibits under seal: 32, 35, 43, 68 and 68A. Defendants exhibits under seal: 38 and 216. Joint exhibits under seal: 2 and 3. Please refer to Cumulative Index for specific exhibit. (dw1)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 196 Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005
                                  NOTICE by TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY of Withdrawal of Oral Motion to Seal Documents (Shea, Peter)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005
                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/20/2005. (vp1, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 195 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/11 (Pg 1264-1560), 7/12(Pg 1561-1810), 713 (Pg 1811-2077), 7/14 (Pg 2078-2330), 7/15 (Pg 2331-2497), 2005 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (eph, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/8/2005
                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/6/2005. (vp1, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 194 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 7/5/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                          TRANSCRIPT (Pg 1045-1263) of Proceedings held on 6/27/05 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (eph, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005
                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/6/2005. (vp1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 193 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/21 (Pg 1-229),6/22 (Pg 230-493),6/23 (Pg 494-750),6/24 (Pg 751-1014),6/25 (Pg 1015-1044 taken at Soddy Daisy, TN), 2005 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (eph, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 192 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005
                                                STIPULATION by all parties. (Crawford, Kevin)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 190 Filed: 6/18/2005, Entered: 6/18/2005
                                                  STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATIONS by TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY. (Shea, Peter)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 191 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                    TRANSCRIPT (Pg 1-62) of Proceedings held on 6/13/05 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (eph, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005
                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/20/2005. (vp1, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 189 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 Court Filing
                                                        PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
                                                          Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Trial set for 6/21/2005 09:30 AM before Judge Charles F. Lettow; initial post trial briefs due 9/16/2005; responsive post trial briefs due 10/14/2005; closing argument set for 10/27/2005 10:00 AM before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jat, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 188 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005
                                                            Objection to Exhibit List by USA. Related document: [184] Exhibit List filed by TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY,. (Attachments: # (1) Objections)(Crawford, Kevin)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 187 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005
                                                              Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by USA. (Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 186 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005
                                                                Witness List by USA. (Lo Re, Alan)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 185 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005
                                                                  Exhibit List by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit List)(Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 184 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005
                                                                    Exhibit List by TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY. (Attachments: # (1))(Shea, Peter)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 183 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005
                                                                      Witness List by TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY. (Shea, Peter)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 182 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005
                                                                        Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY. (Shea, Peter)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 181 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part [177] Motion in Limine, and granting in part and denying in part [178] Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 180 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005
                                                                            RESPONSE to [177] MOTION in Limine To Exclude Testimony filed by TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY. Reply due by 5/31/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 2)(Shea, Peter)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 179 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005
                                                                              RESPONSE to [178] MOTION in Limine re Government Model filed by TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY. Reply due by 5/31/2005. (Shea, Peter)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 178 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005, Terminated: 5/25/2005 Motion in Limine
                                                                                MOTION in Limine filed by USA. Response due by 5/31/2005. (Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 177 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005, Terminated: 5/25/2005 Motion in Limine
                                                                                  MOTION in Limine To Exclude Testimony filed by USA. Response due by 5/31/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Lo Re, Alan)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 176 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005
                                                                                    Exhibit List by USA. (Attachments: # (1))(Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 175 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005
                                                                                      Witness List by USA. (Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 174 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting [173] Motion for Extension of Time. Exchange of Witness and Exhibit Lists shall take place on or before 05/06/2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 173 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: 4/19/2005, Terminated: 4/20/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until May 6, 2005 to Exchange Witness and Exhibit Lists filed by TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY. Response due by 5/6/2005 (Shea, Peter)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005
                                                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 2/18/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 172 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/3/05 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (eph, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 171 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/4/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part [167] Motion for Extension of Time. Dates in scheduling order of 7/9/2004 are amended as follows. Defendant's expert reports due by 3/29/2005. Depositions of defendant's experts to be completed by 4/29/2005. Discovery to be completed by 4/29/2005. Plaintiff's Memorandum of Facts and Law due by 5/27/2005. Trial is tentatively scheduled to begin on 6/21/2005 in Chattanooga, Tennessee. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 170 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005
                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [167] MOTION for Extension of Time until March 29, 2005 for Submission of expert reports by defendant filed by TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY. Reply due by 2/16/2005. (Shea, Peter)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 169 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005
                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. (Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 168 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Hearing on [167] MOTION for Extension of Time. Telephonic Hearing set for 2/3/2005, 03:30 PM. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: . Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion for enlargement of time due by 5:00 p.m. 2/2/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 167 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005, Terminated: 2/4/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until March 29, 2005 for Submission of expert reports by defendant by USA. Response due by 2/7/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Orfield, Sonia) Modified on 1/31/2005 to correct text. (dls ).
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 166 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Sonia Marie Orfield for USA. (Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004
                                                                                                              *** Attorney Harold Dewitt Lester terminated. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 165 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER denying [164] Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a). Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 164 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/10/2004, Terminated: 8/12/2004 Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a)
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [161] Published Opinion, by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 163 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: submission of damages report by TVA for fy 2004 - December 1, 2004;submission of expert reports by TVA - December 1, 2004;submission of expert reports by defendant - February 15, 2005;conclusion of depositions of plaintiff's experts - February 15, 2005;conclusion of depositions of defendant's experts - April 15, 2005;close of discovery - April 15, 2005;submission of TVA's and defendant's witness and exhibit lists - April 29, 2005;submission of TVA's Memorandum of Facts and Law and supplemental witness and exhibit lists - May 13, 2005;submission of defendants's Memorandum of Facts and Law and any supplemental witness and exhibit lists - June 10, 2005;submission of motions in limine by either party - May 13, 2005;submission of responses to motions in limine - May 27, 2005;pretrial conference - June 13, 2005 at 9:30 a.m. at national courts building;trial commencement - June 20, 2005 at 9:30 a.m., a portion may be held in Knoxville, TN, with the remainder in Washington, DC. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before 2/1/2005 addressing place for trial and preliminary estimate of trial time. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before 5/5/2005 with final estimate of trial time. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 162 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/2/2004
                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 161 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                      PUBLISHED OPINION on [53] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA, [57] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA, and [107] Cross Motion filed by TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY. [53] Motion for Summary Judgment on Greater Than Class C Waste is denied without prejudice. [57] Motion for Summary Judgment on Rate of Acceptance is denied. [107] Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Joint Status Report due by 7/2/2004.Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 160 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004
                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF TVA's Supplemental Brief on the Proper Scope of Damages in This Action. (Shea, Peter)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 159 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 4/2/2004 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004
                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles F. Lettow : Oral Argument on cross-motions for summary judgment held on 4/2/04. (lcd, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004
                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 4/7/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 158 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Defendant's Supplemental Brief filed by TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY. (Shea, Peter) Modified on 3/18/2004 (dw1).
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 156 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 157 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Response to the Court's [155] 2/3/2004 Scheduling Order, filed by USA. Service: 2/27/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 155 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Dft shall file a Supplemental Brief on or before 2/27/2004. Pltf shall file a Supplemental Brief on or before 3/19/2004. A Hearing on pending motions will be held on 4/2/2004 09:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004
                                                                                                                                        ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES [147] Dft's Second Motion to Renew its Motion toConsolidate as well as its previous motions relating to consolidation. The Court further LIFTS THE STAY of the remainder of the cases to which the Order of 4/16/2003, applied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket this Order in this case with an entry noting the same on the dockets of the remaining SNFcases captioned in Dft's instant motion, with a courtesy copy to all SNF parties and presiding SNF judges of the Court. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 154 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Counsel for Dft's Change of Telephone and Facsimile Numbers by USA. Service: 12/2/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 153 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that all filings in this case relating to issues of consolidation shall be captioned solely in the name of this case and shall show the name of the presiding judge in this case. A courtesy copy of any such filing to issues of consolidation shall be provided to the Clerk's Office for transmission to the Chief Judge. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 152 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Pltfs' Responses to [147] Dft's Second MOTION to the Chief Judge to Renew Consideration of Dft's Motion to Consolidate filed by USA, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 9/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 151 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION to [147] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate filed by TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Reply due by 9/2/2003. Service: 8/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 150 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The Clerk's Office received Pltf Tennesee Valley Authority's Opposition to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate on August 19, 2003, which was sumbitted out of time, being due on August 15, 2003. It is hereby ORDERED: Pltf Tennessee Valley Authority's Opposition to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate is filed by leave of Court this date. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 149 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Charles Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 148 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to Rule 40.1(c) of the RCFC, which permits the Chief Judge to reassign any case if necessary for the efficient administration of justice, the Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign the above captioned case to Judge Charles Lettow. Judge Eric G. Bruggink no longer assigned to case. The Clerk is also directed to notify the parties that the case will not be included in the September 8, 2003 expansion of Electronic Case Filing. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/15/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                          Dft's Motion to the Chief Judge for Leave to Correct Certificate of Service and to Waive Requirements of RCFC 5.3 Regarding "Dft's Second Motion [to the Chief Judge] to Renew its Motion to Consolidate." (Original Motion located in Case No. 98-126C) (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 147 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            SECOND MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate by USA. [COPY] (Original Document in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 7/29/03 by hand. Response due by 8/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 146 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/11/2003 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 145 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 9, 2003 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003
                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/9/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003
                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eric G. Bruggink: Status Conference held on 5/9/2003. (dmh)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 144 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Surreply
                                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY re [57] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY. Service: 4/22/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 143 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/9/2003 at 02:30 PM before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 142 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 141 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [57] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The United States, filed with a supplemental appendix in support. Service: 3/28/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 140 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [138] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Surreply due by 4/24/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 139 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: further proceedings. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 138 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003, Terminated: 4/3/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of reply to the motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance by 59 pages, by The United States. Service: 3/28/03. Response due 4/14/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 137 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 136 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by TENNESSEE VALLEY to [133-1] report by USA. Service: 3/12/03 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 135 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [53-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. Service: 3/11/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 134 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: See order [612-1] dated 3/7/03, in case 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                              Status Conference held ( Transcript due 4/3/03 ) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 133 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 2/28/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 132 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of January 31, 2003. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 131 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 130 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 128 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 129 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: (1) granting [120-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file response to cross-motion; (2) granting [120-2] motion to deny or suspend plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment ; (3) Reply to Response to Motion reset to 3/11/03; (4) reply for [57-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment reset to 3/28/03 for [53-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment ; (5) Status Report deadline to 2/28/03 ; (6) and Plaintiff my file its reponse to this outline by Brief deadline of 3/14/03 ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 127 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 126 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 125 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER setting telephonic hearing for 10:00 a.m. on 1/31/03 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese for Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 02/03/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 124 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [120-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file response to cross-motion. Service: 1/23/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 123 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - see 98-126 C for order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 122 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. on 1/31/03 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 121 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by TENNESSEE VALLEY (Service: 1/16/03) to [120-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file response to cross-motion. Reply due: 1/31/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 120 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003, Terminated: 1/31/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 1/10/03 ) to Extend Time within which to file response to cross-motion , (until ?) and to deny or suspend plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment . Response due: 1/27/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 118 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 117 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [111-1] motion to suspend the briefing on the motions for summary judgment Defendant to file reply briefs and response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, or identify the need for further discovery due 1/10/03 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 116 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SURREPLY by TENNESSEE VALLEY re: [111-1] motion to suspend the briefing on the motions for summary judgment by USA. Service: 12/2/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 115 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [114-1] motion for Leave to file a surreply (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 114 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002, Terminated: 12/6/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by TENNESSEE VALLEY (Service: 12/2/02) for Leave to file a surreply in further opposition to Defendant's motion to suspend briefing. Response due: 12/19/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 113 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [111-1] motion to suspend the briefing on the motions for summary judgment. Service: 1/26/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 112 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/21/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by TENNESSEE VALLEY (Service: 11/15/02) to [111-1] motion to suspend the briefing on the motions for summary judgment. Reply due: 12/2/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 111 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002, Terminated: 12/16/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 11/12/02) to suspend the briefing on the motions for summary judgment . Response due: 11/29/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 110 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FaCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response by TENNESSEE VALLEY to [54-1] proposed findings by USA, filed by leave of the Judge, (regarding the rate of spent Nuclear Fuel Acceptance). Service: 10/23/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 109 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FaCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response by TENNESSEE VALLEY to [58-1] proposed findings by USA (regarding Greater than Class C Radioactive Waste Arguments), filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/23/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 108 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by TENNESSEE VALLEY filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/23/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 107 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CROSS MOTION by TENNESSEE VALLEY ( Service: 10/23/02 ) and RESPONSE to [57-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment by USA, [53-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment by USA, filed by leave of the Judge. Filed together with separate appendix and separate Declaration of Thomas L. Hayslett, Jr. Response due: 11/12/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; Response to [107-1] cross motion reset to 11/12/02 . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 106 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 105 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 104 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 103 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 102 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 101 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 100 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 99 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 98 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 97 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: see order [467-1] dated 7/29/02, in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 96 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 95 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 94 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 93 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER returning Plaintiff's amended complaint (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 92 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER; re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 91 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 90 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 89 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 88 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 87 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C.(signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 86 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, Re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 85 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: order in 98-126, filed 6/6/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 84 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/3/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 83 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 82 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 81 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: See [395-1] order in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 80 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 79 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 78 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 77 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 76 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 75 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 74 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 73 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 72 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: see order in 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 71 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 70 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying motion to preclude or, in the alternative, defer, depositions pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 69 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion to extend time to respond to interrogatories until 3/8/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 68 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See Case No. 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 67 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 66 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying motion to reconsider filed 1/22/02 and granting the motion to revise dates in 9/26/01 order filed 1/24/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. See order in 98-126C filed 2/1/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 64 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 2/12/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 63 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 1/11/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 62 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 01/03/02 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 60 Filed: 12/27/2001, Entered: 12/28/2001 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of December 19, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 61 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: 1/2/2002 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PUBLISHED DECISION granting [59-1] motion to stay partial summary judgment proceedings, denying [15-1] motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's responses to the motions for summary judgment in this action will be due 45 days after the close of discovery or the denial of further discovery by Judge Weinstein ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 59 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by TENNESSEE VALLEY (Service: 12/13/01) to stay partial summary judgment proceedings . Response due: 1/2/02 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 58 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/7/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 11/28/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/7/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION, with one volume of Appendix, by USA (Service: 11/28/01) for partial Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance. Response due: 12/31/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 56 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [55-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 55 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: 12/7/2001, Terminated: 12/3/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 11/28/01) For leave to exceed the page limitation. Response due: 12/21/01 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service by hand: 11/27/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION, with one volume of Appendix, by USA (Service by hand: 11/27/01) for partial Summary Judgment . Response due: 12/26/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/20/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER see order 98-126C filed 11/16/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. See 98-126 C ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to respond to motion to compel production of documents to 11/06/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: Public Service Electric and Gas motion to extend time filed on 11/2/01, within which to respond to the defendant's motion to compel is GRANTED (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (see motion filed in 98-126C) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to complete production of documents to 11/19/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [28-1] motion for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order. Individual Judges retain the right to decide dispositive motions. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [31-1] motion for Leave to file the Motion for Clarification of 9/26/01 and directing Clerk's Office to return the motion to Plaintiff unfiled (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [30-1] motion for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. and granting the Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file copies of the response to the transfer motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. on 12/19/01 for [15-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of supplemental certificate of service by USA. Service: 10/19/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 10/19/01) to Compel . Response due: 11/5/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Service: 10/19/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [15-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 10/19/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: All filings shall bear the name of the discovery Judge, all matters to be brought to the attention of the Court shall be filed with the discovery Judge only, the Clerk of the Court is directed not to accept for filing any motion by a party in one of the captioned cases for leave to file material with a Judge in an individual case ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 10/16/01) to Compel . Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/2/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/16/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file Defendant's response and Defendant's corrected certificate of service due 10/25/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: Defendant's motion to extend time filed on 10/15/01, within which to file the proposed stipulated order concerning the scheduling and conduct of depositions in the coordinated discovery proceeding, is GRANTED, see motion in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001, Terminated: 10/30/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by TENNESSEE VALLEY (Service: 10/11/01) for Leave to file the Motion for Clarification of 9/26/01 . Response due: 10/11/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001, Terminated: 10/29/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 10/10/01) for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc Response due: 10/29/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/11/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [27-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to the Motion to Dismiss Reply to Response to Motion reset to 10/19/01 for [15-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001, Terminated: 11/1/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by TENNESSEE VALLEY (Service by hand: 10/9/01) for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order . Response due: 10/23/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001, Terminated: 10/10/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 10/5/01) to Extend Time to file reply to the Motion to Dismiss until 10/19/01. Response due: 10/22/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [25-1] motion to Extend Time to submit plan for production of e-mail messages Plan is to filed by 10/22/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001, Terminated: 10/3/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 10/1/01) to Extend Time to submit plan for production of e-mail messages until 10/22/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: The Joint Motion for an Order for Consolidated Discovery filed on 7/10/01, is granted, with the exception of document production, the parties are granted an enlargement of time until 10/1/01, to submit a plan addressing the production of e-mail messages (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [22-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to dismiss Reply to Response to Motion reset to 10/5/01 for [15-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: 9/19/2001, Terminated: 9/21/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 9/18/01) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to dismiss until 10/05/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER setting Status Conference for 4:00 p.m. on 9/20/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: 9/7/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [19-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file a reply brief Reply to Response to Motion reset to 9/18/01 for [15-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001, Terminated: 9/7/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 9/4/01 ) to Extend Time within which to file a reply brief , (until September 18, 2001). Response due: 9/21/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting motion for protective order in the form provided by Exhibit A of the parties 08/10/01 motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). See case number 98-126 C for motion. Protective order in 98-458 C is also granted, subject to reconsideration by assigned judge. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by TENNESSEE VALLEY (Service: 8/16/01) to [15-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 9/4/01. (LTD) Modified on 09/05/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 9/11/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein, Discovery Judge). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [14-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of the parties "Joint Motion for an order Coordinating Discovery" (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 7/18/01) to Dismiss . Response due: 8/20/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001, Terminated: 8/3/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 7/11/01) for Leave to file a copy of the parties "Joint Motion for an order Coordinating Discovery" . Response due: 7/30/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 7/12/2001, Terminated: 8/3/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 7/11/01) for Protective Order . Response due: 7/30/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 7/12/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint Answer deadline to 7/18/01 ( signed by the Clerk ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: 7/12/2001, Terminated: 7/11/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 7/10/01) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to July 18, 2001). (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Copy of Yankee Atomic's Motion for Leave to file documents relevant to the telephone conference with Judge Wiese. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: 6/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 7/10/01 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink) Copy to parties. (DS) Modified on 06/26/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 6/22/2001, Entered: 6/26/2001, Terminated: 6/25/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 6/22/01) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to July 10, 2001). (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER resetting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 6/14/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER scheduling Status Conference for 10:30 a.m., 6/14/01 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: On 1/8/2001, Dft filed a Motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 CFR part 961. The Chief Judge hereby designates Judge Wiese as the managing judge in the above cited cases for the purpose of meeting with the parties to consider whether consolidation or other joint handling of discovery or other pre-trial matters is appropriate. Judge Wiese is requested to formulate a management plan, if one is appropriate, and is authorized to make appropriate rulings with respect to this purpose. Designating Judge Wiese as managing judge involving alleged breaches of standard contract cases (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 3/17/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. . Service : 5/14/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of re-assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: 4/26/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by TENNESSEE VALLEY of related cases: (98-126 C, 98-154 C, 98-474 C, 98-483 C, 98-484 C, 98-485 C, 98-486 C, 98-488 C, 98-614 C, 98-621 C, 99-447 C, 00-440 C, 00-697 C, 00-703 C). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: 4/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of assignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: 4/26/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #051647. Answer due on 6/25/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 182 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?