PEARSON v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:01-cv-00250-LMB
District Judge Lawrence M. Baskir, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo WILLIAM O. PEARSON, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sheryl Beth Flum +1 202 307 6496
Office COFC
Filed 4/26/2001
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 202 - Tax - Declaratory Judgment 28:1507
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 8/15/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags AUTO, CLOSED, ENDADR
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER re: The Clerk of the Court is directed not to accept any filings from the parties in this closed case if the submissions do not comply with the Rules of the Court ( signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, without prejudice, for failure to comply with Rule 8(a). (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER re: The Court hereby DISMISSES Plaintiff's action WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Rule 8(a) of the Rules of the Court of Federal Claims (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001 Amended ComplaintCourt Filing
          AMENDED COMPLAINT by WILLIAM O. PEARSON (Answer due 8/23/01) amending [2-1] complaint, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/10/01. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER re: The Court shall return "Plaintiff's Motion for Substitution" pursuant to Rule 5(e) and 83 of the Court of Federal Claims and plaintiff is instructed to re-read the Order issued by this Court on 6/28/01 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: 6/28/2001 Court Filing
              ORDER denying as moot [6-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: 6/28/2001 Court Filing
                ORDER Plaintiff shall file a new complaint by 7/27/01 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 6/8/2001, Entered: 6/11/2001, Terminated: 6/28/2001 Terminated:
                  MOTION by USA (Service : 6/8/01 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint , (until August 24, 2001) and for Leave to file a motion to dismiss complaint prior to a preliminary conference . Response due: 6/25/01. (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                    SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: 5/29/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Sheryl Beth Flum Service: 5/24/01. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: 4/26/2001 Court Filing
                        Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: 4/26/2001
                          COMPLAINT filed. Answer due on 6/25/01. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: 4/26/2001, Terminated: 8/15/2001 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                            MOTION by WILLIAM O. PEARSON (Service: 4/26/01) to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: 4/26/2001
                              CASE assigned to Sr. ADR Judge Thomas J. Lydon. (FE)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 79 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?