BLUESTONE COAL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00634-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BLUESTONE COAL CORPORATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Kelly, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thad Stevenson Huffman +1 202 973 0200 +1 202 973 0232 tshuffman@jacksonkelly.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/25/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $590000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 35 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007
JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by BLUESTONE COAL CORPORATION. Service: 1/19/2006.(mij, )
    LREF
    Blank 34 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: 1/9/2007
    ORDER NOTICE granting re: [33] Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented) pursuant to Rule 83.1(d)(4). Added attorney Thad Stevenson Huffman for BLUESTONE COAL CORPORATION. Attorney Dennis Jeffery Whittlesey terminated. Signed by the Clerk. (mij, )
      LREF
      Blank 33 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: 1/9/2007, Terminated: 1/9/2007 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented)
      Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney Thad S. Huffman in place of Dennis J. Whittlesey , filed by BLUESTONE COAL CORPORATION. Service: 1/9/2006.(mij, )
        LREF
        Blank 32 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 Court Filing
        ORDER to parties who have filed claims in this court for refund of excise taxes on coal production. Signed by Judge James F. Merow for Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mij, )
          LREF
          Blank 31 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Joint Status Report
          JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 2/25/2005.(mb2, )
            LREF
            Blank 30 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
            STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 2/25/2005. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mb2, )
              LREF
              Blank 29 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Joint Status Report
              JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 01/21/05.(mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 28 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER issued to parties who have filed claims for refund of excise taxes on coal productions. Attorneys asked to respond no later than 2/21/05. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (eph, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 27 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Joint Status Report
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 1/30/2004.(jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 26 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                    STATUS REPORT ORDER: Counsel will advise the court whether they have resolved this case, or whether they intend to file stipulations of dismissal. If settlement discussions are continuing, they should advise the court of the status of these negotiations and the likelihood that they will be successful in the near future. The parties may file a Joint Status Report no later than 1/30/2004, or they may file independently. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 25 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                      NOTICE of Certain Arguments that Plaintiffs intend to raise at the 6/24/02 hearing by BLUESTONE COAL. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/20/02 (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 24 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Response
                        SUR-REPLY by BLUESTONE COAL to reply filed 1/7/02 by USA in 99-268T. Service: 2/25/02. (LTD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 23 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 RemarkCourt Filing
                          PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO BRING RECENT DEVELOPMENTS TO THE COURT'S ATTENTION AND TO FILE A SHORT REPLY BRIEF. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 22 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Motion for Leave to File
                            MOTION by BLUESTONE COAL (Service: 1/4/02) for Leave to file a brief in response to Defendant's additional brief . Response due: 1/22/02. (LTD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 21 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                              STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by BLUESTONE COAL. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/22/01. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 20 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                RESPONSE by BLUESTONE COAL (Service: 10/22/01) to cross-motion filed in 99-268T by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 11/9/01. (LTD)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 19 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001
                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by BLUESTONE COAL. Service: 8/31/01. (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 18 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001
                                    MOTION by BLUESTONE COAL (Service: 8/31/01) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 10/1/01. (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 17 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 Amended Complaint
                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT by BLUESTONE COAL (Answer due 9/4/01 ) amending [1-1] complaint Service: 8/16/01 (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 16 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting [15-2] motion for Leave to file an amended answer ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 15 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001, Terminated: 8/22/2001 Motion for Reconsideration
                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 8/16/01 ) for Reconsideration of [13-4] order , and for Leave to file an amended answer . Response due: 9/4/01. (LTD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001
                                            Deadline updated; Response to [15-1] motion for Reconsideration of [13-4] order and [15-2] motion for Leave to file an amended answer reset to 9/4/01 . (LTD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 14 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 Response
                                              RESPONSE (report on the nature and extent of possible IRS audits) by USA pursuant to [13-4] order. Service: 8/15/01 (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 13 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER Plaintiff's Motion Filing deadline to 8/31/01 , Defendant's Response deadline to 10/1/01 , Plaintiff's Reply deadline to 10/15/01 and defendant's motion to notify other parties is denied (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 10:00 a.m. 8/2/01, in the National Courts Building, Washington, DC ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001 Court Filing
                                                    Notice of reassignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. on 7/18/01 (signed by Acting Chief Judge Sarah L. Wilson for Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: 6/15/2001 Status Report
                                                        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/14/01. (LTD)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER re: The Court orders that proceeding's in this case be suspended pending resolution of the petition for a writ of certiorari in case No. 00-360 (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 12/20/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Answer
                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 12/20/00 (JPSR due 2/6/01). (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 11/22/2000, Entered: 11/22/2000 Court Filing
                                                                ORDER. STANDARD SPECIAL PROCEDURES ( signed by Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: 11/22/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Charles Stoddart Service : 11/20/00 (JT)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                    NOTICE by BLUESTONE COAL of related cases: (00-244 T). (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                      Notice of assignment to Judge Edward J. Damich. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Complaint
                                                                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #050654. Answer due on 12/26/00. (FE)
                                                                          LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 193 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?