COSTIGAN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00636-BAF
District Judge Bohdan A. Futey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DANIEL JOSEPH COSTIGAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy Lee Presson +1 770 997 0334 +1 770 478 2334 caninecabin@bellsouth.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Joseph Nestor
Office COFC
Filed 10/27/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 8/27/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58, dismissing the complaint without prejudice. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (DS)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 Court Filing
    ORDER directing the Clerk to dismiss the complaint without prejudice for failure to comply with Court orders. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (DS)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001
      Case closed (DS)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Eric Joseph Nestor. Service: 8/21/01. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [12-1] motion for Leave to file responsive pleading out of time Plaintiff's responsive pleading is due on 8/7/01 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (LTD)
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: 7/25/2001, Terminated: 7/31/2001 Motion for Leave to File
            MOTION by DANIEL JOSEPH COSTIGAN (Service: 7/24/01) for Leave to file responsive pleading out of time . (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 7/12/2001 Order on Motion for Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey) Copy to parties. Show Cause Response due: 7/25/01 for DANIEL JOSEPH COSTIGAN. Defendant's reply is returned UNFILED because no response from Plaintiff was filed. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to return Plaintiff's filings received on 6/18/01 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to motion to dismiss Response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction reset to 6/14/01 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 6/5/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001, Terminated: 6/11/2001 Terminated:
                    MOTION by DANIEL JOSEPH COSTIGAN (Service: 6/4/01) to Extend Time to file response to motion to dismiss until 6/14/01. Response due: 6/21/01. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 Order on Motion for Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing plaintiff to show cause why the complaint should not be dismissed by 6/5/01, with the Clerk directed to dismiss the complaint without further order if plaintiff fails to comply. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service : 3/5/01 ) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 4/5/01 (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 Court Filing
                          ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint Answer deadline to 3/5/01 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000, Terminated: 1/10/2001 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service : 12/22/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until March 5, 2001]. Response due: 1/8/01 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 11/7/2000, Entered: 11/9/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Sean Curtis Griffin Service : 11/7/00 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: 10/30/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                Notice of assignment to Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: 10/30/2000 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #050675. Answer due on 12/26/00. (FE)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 96 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?