CLINCHFIELD COAL, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00642-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CLINCHFIELD COAL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Martin Rolfe +1 804 788 8200 rrolfe@hunton.com
No Logo ELKAY MINING COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Martin Rolfe +1 804 788 8200 rrolfe@hunton.com
No Logo HEARTLAND RESOURCES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Martin Rolfe +1 804 788 8200 rrolfe@hunton.com
No Logo HOLSTON MINING, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Martin Rolfe +1 804 788 8200 rrolfe@hunton.com
No Logo Jewell Ridge Coal Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Martin Rolfe +1 804 788 8200 rrolfe@hunton.com
No Logo MEADOW RIVER COAL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Martin Rolfe +1 804 788 8200 rrolfe@hunton.com
No Logo MOTIVATION COAL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Martin Rolfe +1 804 788 8200 rrolfe@hunton.com
No Logo Paramont Coal Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Martin Rolfe +1 804 788 8200 rrolfe@hunton.com
No Logo PYXIS RESOURCES COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Martin Rolfe +1 804 788 8200 rrolfe@hunton.com
No Logo RANGER FUEL CORPORATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Martin Rolfe +1 804 788 8200 rrolfe@hunton.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/31/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $2473000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/17/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/9/2004 Motion to Continue
MOTION to Continue the Stay of Proceedings by USA.Service: 11/5/2004. Response due by 11/22/2004.(dw1)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 6/3/2002 Remark
    Earlierentry of 9/26/01 (Motion to Dismiss) was in error. (JT)
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      DUPLICATE ENTRY FOR STATISTICAL USE ONLY. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001
        Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by CLINCHFIELD COAL, ELKAY MINING COMPANY, HEARTLAND RESOURCES, HOLSTON MINING, INC., JEWELL RIDGE COAL, MEADOW RIVER COAL, MOTIVATION COAL, PARAMONT COAL CORPOR, PYXIS RESOURCES, RANGER FUEL CORPORATION and USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. (AB)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001
          Case closed (AB)
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001 Terminated:
            REPLY by USA to [9-1] report by plaintiffs. Service: 7/11/01. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001
              STATUS REPORT by CLINCHFIELD COAL, ELKAY MINING COMPANY, HEARTLAND RESOURCES, HOLSTON MINING, INC., JEWELL RIDGE COAL, MEADOW RIVER COAL, MOTIVATION COAL, PARAMONT COAL CORPOR, PYXIS RESOURCES and RANGER FUEL CORPORAT. Service: 7/3/01. [Response to Defendant's suggestion for further Proceedings and Request for Pretrial Conference] (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 Status Report
                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/19/01. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER re: GRANTING the parties request to suspend this case, etc. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                    JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Answer
                      ANSWER to Complaint by USA Service: 12/26/00 (JPSR due 2/12/01) (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Charles Stoddart. Service: 11/29/00. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: 11/1/2000 Notice of Related Cases
                          NOTICE of related case: (98-414 C). (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: 11/1/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                            Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: 11/1/2000 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #050691. Answer due on 1/2/01. (FE)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 156 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?