KING v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00660-VJW
District Judge Victor J. Wolski, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo SARAH KING, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Warren Walluk +1 210 226 4384 +1 210 226 4526 awalluklaw@hotmail.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sonia Marie Orfield +1 202 353 0534 +1 202 514 8624 sonia.m.orfield@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/8/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County
Terminated 1/9/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 36 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Status Report
STATUS REPORT, filed by SARAH KING. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 11/9/2005.(mb2, )
    LREF
    Blank 35 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER: Directing the Clerk to file Plaintiff's Status Report. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (mb2, )
      LREF
      Blank 34 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/9/2006
      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, in favor of plaintiff. (lld, )
        LREF
        Blank 33 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/9/2006 Court Filing
        ORDER directing the clerk to enter judgment for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (lld, )
          LREF
          Blank 32 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005 Memorandum
          Defendant's Report Pursuant to RCFC 56.2(b)(3), filed by USA. Service: 9/22/2005.(mb2, )
            LREF
            Blank 31 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Status Report
            STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. Service: 8/8/2005.(mb2, )
              LREF
              Blank 30 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Court Filing
              ORDER GRANTING [29] Motion; and REMANDING case to Air Force, with further proceedings stayed during the pendency of the remand.Agency Decision due by 9/26/2005. Defendant's Status Report due by 8/12/2005. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. Certified copy forwarded to the AFBCMR.(dls)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Administrative Record Returned
                Administrative Record Returned defendant's attorney for return to agency pursuant to RCFC 56.2(a)(4). (dls )
                  LREF
                  Blank 29 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005, Terminated: 6/28/2005 Terminated:
                  MOTION that Plaintiff be Deemed to Have Filed a Dispositive Motion and Defendant be Deemed to Have Opposed that Motion upon the Grounds Already Set Fourth in the Parties' Briefing on Defendant's Dispositive Motion, filed by SARAH KING, USA. Service: 6/10/2005. Response due by 6/27/2005. (mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 28 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                    PUBLISHED OPINION on [17] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 27 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/9/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 10/26/2004 before Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004
                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 11/29/2004. (vp1, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 26 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: 11/16/2004 Redacted Document
                          REDACTED DOCUMENT by USA redacting [25] Administrative Record. (jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 25 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: 11/16/2004 Administrative Record
                            ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD in One Volume [Large Orange Binder] by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 24 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: 11/16/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                              ORDER granting [23] Dft's Motion for Leave to withdraw previously submitted motion for leave to file administrative record, and for leave to file original record under seal alond with redacted record, with waiver of the copying requirements. The clerk is directed to file the original copy of the record under seal, and to file in the public record a redacted copy of the Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 23 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004, Terminated: 11/15/2004 Terminated:
                                MOTION for Leave to File to withdraw previously submitted motion for leave to file administrative record, and for leave to file original record under seal alond with redacted record, with waiver of the copying requirements by USA.Service: 11/10/2004. Response due by 11/29/2004 (hw1, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 22 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                  ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [17] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record: Oral Argument set for 10/26/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Victor J. Wolski. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (dw1)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 21 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Description not available
                                    REPLY in Support of [17] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA. Service: 8/27/2004.(jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 20 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: 8/20/2004 Response to Motion
                                      RESPONSE to [17] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SARAH KING. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Reply due by 8/30/2004. Service: 8/12/2004.(jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 19 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 7/2/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [18] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 8/13/2004. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (dw1)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 18 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004, Terminated: 6/30/2004 Terminated:
                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to [17] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record,until August 13, 2004, by SARAH KING.Service: 6/25/04. Response due by 7/12/2004 (jat, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 17 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Terminated:
                                            MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) or, in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon the Administrative Record, by USA.Service: 5/27/2004. Response due by 6/28/2004. (jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 16 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Statement of Facts
                                              STATEMENT OF FACTS by USA. Service: 5/27/2004.(jcp, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 15 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Terminated:
                                                MOTION for Leave to File the Administrative Record, and MOTION to Waive Copy Requirements by USA.Service: 5/27/2004. Response due by 6/14/2004. (jcp, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court hereby RESCINDS the order of 11/27/2000, and 1/4/2001, which had placed the case in abeyance. Because the AFBCMR decision did not moot the issue, this case shall proceed. Dft's Dispositive Motion shall be due on or before 5/28/2004. Pltf's response and dft's subsequent reply shall follow as specified under RCFC Rule 7.2. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Joint Status Report
                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 4/16/04.(dw1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                      STATUS REPORT ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS the parties to file a Joint Status Report no later than 4/19/2004. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jcp, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                        NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Victor Wolski. (jcp, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                          ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to Rule 40.1(c) of the RCFC, which permits the Chief Judge to reassign any case if necessary for the efficient administration of justice, the Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign the above captioned case to Judge Victor Wolski. Judge John P. Wiese no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Sonia Marie Orfield for UNITED STATES Service: 6/10/03.(hw1, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [7-1] joint motion to Extend Time within which to hold case in abeyance (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001, Terminated: 1/4/2001 Description not available
                                                                JOINT MOTION by SARAH KING, USA to Extend Time within which to hold case in abeyance , (until ?). (HW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: 12/1/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by M. Jocelyn Lopez Wright. Service: 11/30/00. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: 11/29/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting [4-1] motion to hold case in abeyance. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: 11/29/2000, Terminated: 11/27/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                      MOTION by SARAH KING to hold case in abeyance. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 12/14/00 (JT)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/16/2000 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER (i) directing parties to confer and arrange for preliminary status conference; (ii) identifying filing requirements for conference; and (iii) precluding filing of dispositive motions until after conference has been held. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese (JT)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 11/8/2000, Entered: 11/9/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                          Notice of assignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 11/8/2000, Entered: 11/9/2000 Complaint
                                                                            COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #050762. Answer due on 1/7/01. (FE) Modified on 11/14/2000
                                                                              LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 163 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?