WALKER, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00670-NBF
District Judge Nancy B. Firestone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo ROSE WALKER, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daphne Lynn Pattison +1 228 374 5554
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brent M. McBurney +1 202 307 0277 brent.mcburney@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/13/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/10/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 30 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. Parites shall bear their own costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank 29 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 Court Filing
    ORDER granting [9-2] motion for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record. Parties shall bear their own costs. ( signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone ) Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 28 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002 Terminated:
        RESPONSE by ROSE WALKER to [22-1] response by USA. Service: 3/6/02. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: 1/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [26-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to defendant's supplemental brief and mooting [25-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to Defendant's supplemental brief Plaintiff's response to Defendant's supplemental brief due 3/7/02 (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (LTD)
            LREF
            Blank 26 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002, Terminated: 1/14/2002 Terminated:
            MOTION by ROSE WALKER (Service: 1/1/02) to Extend Time to respond to defendant's supplemental brief (60 days). Response due: 1/18/02 (DS)
              LREF
              Blank 25 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: 1/3/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
              MOTION by ROSE WALKER (Service: 12/20/01) to Extend Time to file response to Defendant's supplemental brief (an additional 7 days). Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/7/02. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 24 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to supplemental brief Plaintiff's response to supplemental brief due 12/21/01 (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 12/21/2001
                  LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: 11/20/2001, Terminated: 11/20/2001 Terminated:
                  MOTION by ROSE WALKER (Service: 11/16/01) to Extend Time to respond to supplemental brief , (30 days). Response due: 12/3/01. (FE) Modified on 01/09/2002
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                    RESPONSE by USA to [20-3] order. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/22/01. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 21 Filed: 10/2/2001, Entered: 10/2/2001
                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume (25 pages), at Washington, D.C., for date of September 21, 2001 . Notice to parties. (VO) Modified on 10/02/2001
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001 Court Filing
                        ORDER Defendant's Brief deadline to 10/22/01 and Plaintiff's response deadline to 11/21/01 (signed by Judge Nancy Firestone). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/17/2001 Court Filing
                          ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 9/21/01 ( signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone ) Copy to parties. (VO)
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: 6/13/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                            REPLY by ROSE WALKER to response to [13-1] cross motion. Service: 6/6/01. (LTD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001 Terminated:
                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/31/01) to [13-1] cross motion. Reply due: 6/18/01 (DS)
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 4/13/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [15-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion Response to [13-1] cross motion reset to 5/31/01 ( signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 4/12/2001, Entered: 4/13/2001, Terminated: 4/13/2001 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 4/12/01) to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion . (until 05/31/01). Response due: 4/30/01. (LTD) Modified on 06/05/2001
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: 3/20/2001 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                                    STATEMENT OF FACTS by ROSE WALKER filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 3/14/01. (LTD) Modified on 01/09/2002
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: 3/20/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                      CROSS MOTION by ROSE WALKER (Service: 3/14/01) and RESPONSE to [9-1] motion to Dismiss by USA, [9-2] motion for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record by USA. Filed by Leave of the Judge. Response due: 4/16/01. (LTD) Modified on 01/09/2002
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: 3/20/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                        Deadline updated; Response to [13-1] cross motion reset to 4/16/01 (LTD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 12 Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss Response to [9-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 3/22/01 (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001, Terminated: 2/22/2001 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by ROSE WALKER (Service: 2/16/01) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss requests an additional 30 days. Response due: 3/5/01. (FE) Modified on 01/09/2002
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 10 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Statement of Facts
                                              STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA [by leave of the judge]. Service: 1/19/01 (DS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 9 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 1/19/01) to Dismiss , or, in the alternative, for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record filed [by leave of the judge]. Response due: 2/20/01 (DS)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Administrative Record
                                                  Administrative record, consisting of one bound volume, filed by USA. (DS)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [6-1] motion for Leave to file the administrative record. ( signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001, Terminated: 1/22/2001 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 1/19/01 ) for Leave to file the administrative record . Response due: 2/5/01 (DS)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting [4-1] motion for Protective Order (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/2/2001, Terminated: 1/4/2001 Motion for Protective Order
                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 1/2/01 ) for Protective Order or stay of discovery. Response due: 1/19/01. (HW)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: 12/8/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Brent McBurney Service : 12/6/00 (JT)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/14/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                              Notice of assignment to Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/14/2000 Complaint
                                                                COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits A through J), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #050766. Answer due on 1/12/01. (FE)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 78 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?