WISCONSIN ELECTRIC v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00697-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Wisconsin Electric Power Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard William Oehler +1 206 359 8419 +1 206 359 9419 roehler@perkinscoie.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharon Ann Snyder +1 202 616 0347 +1 202 514 7969 sharon.snyder@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/16/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $35000000
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status PstTrlBrf
Flags ECF, PROTO, SNF
  Entries (430) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 414 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
RESPONSE to [413] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Griffiths, Jay)
    LREF
    Legal Document 413 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
    MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
      LREF
      Legal Document 412 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Court Filing
      ORDER re telephone conference call. Supplemental briefs shall be filed on or before 9/17/08; Oral argument is scheduled for 9/26/2008. Signed by Senior Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008
        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Brief due by 9/17/2008; Oral Argument set for 9/26/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom #5 before Senior Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
          LREF
          Legal Document 411 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008
          RESPONSE to [410] MOTION For A Telephonic Status Conference and For An Enlargement of Time, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Reply due by 8/29/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Eileen Supko, # (2) Affidavit Richard J. Sieracki)(Griffiths, Jay)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008
            Minute Entry for telephone status conference held in Washington, DC on 8/15/2008 before Senior Judge James F. Merow. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1] Proceeding was not officially recorded. (lae)
              LREF
              Legal Document 410 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008, Terminated: 8/18/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
              MOTION For A Telephonic Status Conference and For An Enlargement of Time, filed by USA.Response due by 9/2/2008.(Snyder, Sharon)
                LREF
                Legal Document 409 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Court Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER: Supplemental Brief due by 8/18/2008. Signed by Senior Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 408 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008
                  RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Part 2, # (2) Part 3, # (3) Part 4, # (4) Part 5, # (5) Part 6, # (6) Part 7, # (7) Part 8)(Griffiths, Jay)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 407 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008
                    POST TRIAL BRIEF , REPLY BRIEF, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Part 2)(Griffiths, Jay)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 406 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Court Filing
                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral Argument set for 8/22/2008, 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Signed by Senior Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 405 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Court Filing
                        ORDER granting [404] Motion for Extension of Time: plaintiff's post-trial reply, responses to defendant's proposed findings of fact, and counter-designations of deposition or trial testimony, and any potential objections, in response to the November 9, 2007 submission of designated testimony are due on or before July 10, 2008. Signed by Senior Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 404 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008, Terminated: 6/17/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                          MOTION for Extension of Time until July 3, 2008 to to File (1) Post-trial Reply Brief, (2) Responses to Defendant's Proposed Findings of Fact, and (3) Counter-designations of Deposition or Trial Testimony, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Response due by 7/3/2008.(Griffiths, Jay)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 403 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008
                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [393] MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Testimony Regarding Defendant's Settlements With Other Utilities, filed by USA. (Orfield, Sonia)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 402 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008
                              RESPONSE to [393] MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Testimony Regarding Defendant's Settlements With Other Utilities, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Reply due by 6/6/2008. (Griffiths, Jay)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 401 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008 Court Filing
                                ORDER granting [400] Motion for Extension of Time. Notice re proposed oral argument dates due 6/24/2008. Signed by Senior Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 400 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008, Terminated: 5/22/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until June 24, 2008 to Confer With Counsel And Notify The Court Of Proposed Dates For Oral Argument, filed by USA.Response due by 6/9/2008.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 399 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting [398] Motion for Extension of Time to and including May 22, 2008, to file Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Renewed Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Testimony Regarding Defendant's Settlements With Other Utilities. Signed by Senior Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 398 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008, Terminated: 5/12/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until May 22, 2008 to file Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Renewed Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Testimony Regarding Defendant's Settlements With Other Utilities, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Response due by 5/29/2008.(Griffiths, Jay)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 397 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting [396] Motion for Extension of Time to and including 6/17/2008 to file its (1) reply to defendant's post-trial brief, (2) responses to defendant's proposed findings of fact, and (3) counter-designations of deposition or trial testimony, and any potential objections, in response to defendant's November 9, 2007 submission of designated testimony. Signed by Senior Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 396 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008, Terminated: 5/9/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until June 17, 2008 to File (1) Post-trial Reply Brief, (2) Responses to Defendant's Proposed Findings of Fact, and (3) Counter-designations of Deposition or Trial Testimony, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Response due by 5/27/2008.(Poulin, Emily)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 395 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008
                                            RESPONSE to [394] First MOTION Supplement Trial Record, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Reply due by 5/12/2008. (Poulin, Emily)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 394 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008
                                              First MOTION Supplement Trial Record, filed by USA.Response due by 5/12/2008.(Shultis, Russell)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 393 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008
                                                MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Testimony Regarding Defendant's Settlements With Other Utilities, filed by USA.Response due by 5/12/2008.(Orfield, Sonia)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 392 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [391] Motion for Extension of Time to and including May 21, 2008, for the parties to confer regarding mutually convenient dates for oral argument and to notify the court of the proposed dates. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 391 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008, Terminated: 4/18/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until May 21, 2008 to Confer Regarding Mutually Convenient Dates for Oral Argument, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Response due by 5/5/2008.(Poulin, Emily)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 390 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008 Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [389] Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to submit counter-designations of deposition or trial testimony, and any potential objections in response to defendant's submission of designated testimony. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 389 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008, Terminated: 3/28/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until May 13, 2008 to File Counter-designations of Deposition and Trial Testimony and Any Potential Objections, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Response due by 4/14/2008.(Griffiths, Jay)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 388 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008
                                                          RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, filed by USA. (Finn, Stephen)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 387 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008
                                                            POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by USA. (Finn, Stephen)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 386 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008
                                                              Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, filed by USA. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 385 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [384] Motion for Extension of Time. Post Trial Response Brief due 3/25/2008. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 384 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008, Terminated: 3/21/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until March 25, 2008 to File Post-Trial Brief, Findings of Fact, Responses to Plaintiff's Findings of Fact, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Response due by 4/7/2008.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 383 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting [382] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Post Trial Brief due 3/21/2008 and plaintiff's reply due 5/9/2008. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 382 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008, Terminated: 3/17/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time until March 21, 2008 to File Post-Trial Brief, filed by USA.Response due by 3/21/2008.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 381 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008
                                                                        RESPONSE to [378] MOTION to Amend/Correct the Cumulative Index, filed by USA.Reply due by 3/6/2008. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 380 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [379] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Post Trial Brief due 3/7/2008 and Plaintiff's Post Trial Reply Brief due 4/25/2008. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 379 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008, Terminated: 2/6/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until March 7, 2008 to to File Post-trial Brief of Defendant, filed by USA.Response due by 2/25/2008.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 378 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008
                                                                              MOTION to Amend/Correct the Cumulative Index, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Response due by 2/19/2008.(Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 377 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008 Transcript - Cumulative Index
                                                                                Cumulative Index for TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-21) held on September 10, 2007 through October 16, 2007. Filed with plaintiff, defendant and joint exhibits. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit List) (dw1)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 376 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: 12/26/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting [373] Motion for Extension of Time. Counter-designations of deposition or trial testimony, and any potential objections, in response to defendant's Testimony of Designations due: 3/28/2008. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 375 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007
                                                                                    Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 374 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007
                                                                                      POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 373 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007, Terminated: 12/26/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until March 28, 2008 to File Counter-designations of Deposition and Trial Testimony and Any Potential Objections, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Response due by 1/7/2008.(Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 372 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007
                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION Withdraw Designation of Alan Brownstein Deposition Designations re [334] Order on Motion in Limine,, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,,,, filed by USA.Response due by 12/27/2007.(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007
                                                                                            The relief requested in the [372] Motion is SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 371 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [370] Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for an Enlargement of Time. The deadline to submit counter-designations of deposition or trial testimony, and any potential objections in response to defendant's submission of designated testimony filed November 9, 2007 is enlarged to and including December 21, 2007. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 370 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007, Terminated: 11/29/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until December 21, 2007 to File Counter-designations of Deposition and Trial Testimony and Any Potential Objections, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Response due by 12/17/2007.(Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 369 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007
                                                                                                  STIPULATION (Joint) Regarding Plaintiff's Claim for Legal Costs, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 368 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007
                                                                                                    NOTICE, filed by USA re [334] Order on Motion in Limine,, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,,, [362] MOTION re [290] MOTION to Strike [256] Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Deposition And Trial Testimony Designations And, In The Alternative, Motion In Limine to Preclude Reliance Upon Those Designations As Substantive Evidence Pursuant To RCFC 32(a) MOTION re [290] MOTION to Strike [256] Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Deposition And Trial Testimony Designations And, In The Alternative, Motion In Limine to Preclude Reliance Upon Those Designations As Substantive Evidence Pursuant To RCFC 32(a) MOTION re [290] MOTION to Strike [256] Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Deposition And Trial Testimony Designations And, In The Alternative, Motion In Limine to Preclude Reliance Upon Those Designations As Substantive Evidence Pursuant To RCFC 32(a), [367] Notice (Other), [366] Response to Motion,,, Defendant's Testimony Designations (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Mills Yankee 1# (2) Affidavit Mills Yankee 2# (3) Affidavit Mills Yankee 3# (4) Affidavit Mills Yankee 4# (5) Affidavit Mills PG&E 1# (6) Affidavit Mills PG&E 2# (7) Affidavit Mills PG&E 3# (8) Affidavit Mills PG&E 4# (9) Affidavit Mills PG&E 5# (10) Affidavit Mills NSP# (11) Affidavit Mills SFI - 1# (12) Affidavit Mills SFI 2# (13) Affidavit Morgan NSP 1# (14) Affidavit Morgan NSP 2# (15) Affidavit Counter 1# (16) Affidavit Counter 2# (17) Affidavit Counter 3# (18) Affidavit Counter 4# (19) Affidavit Counter 5# (20) Affidavit Counter 6# (21) Affidavit Counter 7# (22) Affidavit Counter 8# (23) Affidavit Counter 9# (24) Affidavit Counter 10# (25) Affidavit Counter 11# (26) Affidavit Counter 12# (27) Affidavit Counter 13# (28) Affidavit Counter 14# (29) Affidavit Counter 15# (30) Affidavit Counter 16# (31) Affidavit Counter 17)(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 367 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007
                                                                                                    NOTICE, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY of Counter-Designations to Defendant's Designations of Deposition Testimony of Mr. Billy Cole (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A# (2) Attachment B)(Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 366 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007
                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [362] MOTION re [290] MOTION to Strike [256] Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Deposition And Trial Testimony Designations And, In The Alternative, Motion In Limine to Preclude Reliance Upon Those Designations As Substantive Evidence Pursuant To RCFC 32(a) MOTION re [290] MOTION to Strike [256] Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Deposition And Trial Testimony Designations And, In The Alternative, Motion In Limine to Preclude Reliance Upon Those Designations As Substantive Evidence Pursuant To RCFC 32(a) MOTION re [290] MOTION to Strike [256] Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Deposition And Trial Testimony Designations And, In The Alternative, Motion In Limine to Preclude Reliance Upon Those Designations As Substantive Evidence Pursuant To RCFC 32(a), filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Reply due by 11/13/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Attachment A# (2) Appendix Attachment B)(Griffiths, Jay)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 365 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                        POST TRIAL ORDER: (1)The parties shall comply with the schedule set forth in the Joint Stipulation, filed October 26, 2007;(2) By a subsequent order, oral argument will be scheduled for a date and time convenient to all concerned during the period of May 5 - 16, 2008, and by April 21, 2008, counsel should confer and notify Ms. Eddins (202-357-6613), as to their availability for a specific date(s) in this respect; and (3) Each proposed finding of fact should be supported by citation to record evidence and counsel are requested to incorporate an overall chronological discussion or listing of all relevant events in either their proposed findings of fact or brief(s). Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 364 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007
                                                                                                          STIPULATION Regarding Post-Trial Briefing Schedule, filed by all parties. (Griffiths, Jay)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 363 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 6016-6417) held on October 15-16, 2007 before Sr. Judge James F. Merow. (dw1)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 362 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
                                                                                                              MOTION re [290] MOTION to Strike [256] Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Deposition And Trial Testimony Designations And, In The Alternative, Motion In Limine to Preclude Reliance Upon Those Designations As Substantive Evidence Pursuant To RCFC 32(a) and Federal Rul MOTION to Strike [256] Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Deposition And Trial Testimony Designations And, In The Alternative, Motion In Limine to Preclude Reliance Upon Those Designations As Substantive Evidence Pursuant To RCFC 32(a) and Federal Rul, filed by USA.Response due by 11/1/2007.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 361 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 4902-6015) held on October 9-12, 2007 before Sr. Judge James F. Merow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 360 Filed: 10/14/2007, Entered: 10/14/2007
                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Demonstratives and Related Expert Testimony, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Response due by 11/1/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1 of 5# (2) Appendix Part 2 of 5# (3) Appendix Part 3 of 5# (4) Appendix Part 4 of 5# (5) Appendix Part 5 of 5)(Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 359 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 3550-4102) held on October 1-2, 2007 before Sr. Judge James F. Merow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 358 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings 9pages 4601-4901) held on October 5, 2007 before Senior Judge James F. Merow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 357 Filed: 10/8/2007, Entered: 10/8/2007
                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Demonstratives and Any Related Testimony, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Response due by 10/25/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, Part 1 of 2# (2) Exhibit A, Part 2 of 2# (3) Exhibit B and C)(Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 356 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 4329-4600) held on October 4, 2007 before Senior Judge James F. Merow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 355 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 4103-4328) held on October 3, 2007 before Senior Judge James F. Merow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 354 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 2283-3549) held on September 24, 2007 through September 28, 2007 before Senior Judge James F. Merow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 353 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER entered granting [352] Unopposed Motion to Designate Deposition Testimony of Mr. Billy Cole. The testimony is so designated for use in this proceeding. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 352 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007, Terminated: 9/27/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to designate deposition testimony, filed by USA.Response due by 10/15/2007.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 351 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1205-2282) held on September 17, 2007 through September 21, 2007 before Judge James F. Merow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 350 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007
                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION (Joint) Regarding Accuracy of Plaintiff's Costs, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 349 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-1204) held on September 9-14, 2007 before Judge James F. Merow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 348 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [347] Motion for Authorization of Service 100+. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 347 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007, Terminated: 9/14/2007 Motion for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles, filed by USA.Response due by 10/1/2007.(Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 346 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007
                                                                                                                                              MOTION Regarding Admission of Exhibits at Trial, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Response due by 9/27/2007.(Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 345 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Defendant's Pretrial Motion Regarding Exhibits, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 344 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007
                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit List (Second Revised Appendix A, Paragraph 16 Exhibit List), filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1))(Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 343 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Defendant's Revised Appendix A, Paragraph 16 Exhibit List, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A)(Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 342 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007
                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION Overrule Plaintiff's Objections to Defendant's Exhibits, filed by USA.Response due by 9/24/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Letters)(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 341 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 340 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007
                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit List Revised, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1))(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 338 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007
                                                                                                                                                            Objection to Exhibit List, filed by USA. Related document: [326] Exhibit List filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix List of Government Objections to Plaintiff Exhibits)(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 339 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-90) held on August 29, 2007 before Senior Judge James F. Merow. (dw1) Modified on 9/4/2007 (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 337 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION Regarding Exhibits, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Response due by 9/14/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1 of 6# (2) Appendix Part 2 of 6# (3) Appendix Part 3 of 6# (4) Appendix Part 4 of 6# (5) Appendix Part 5 of 6# (6) Appendix Part 6 of 6)(Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 336 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re Mr. William Peterson's submissions of July 23, 2007. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 335 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2007 10:30 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 334 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/16/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER entered:(1)Defendant's Contractors Motion is DENIED without prejudice to renewal during, or after trial, as set forth in the order, to the extent a contractor document is proposed for admission, or cited as support for a proposed finding; (2) Defendant's Supko Motion is DENIED without prejudice; (3) Defendant's Cost of Capital Motion is DENIED; and (4) Defendant's deposition and Trial Testimony Designations Motion is GRANTED in part, DENIED in part and DEFERRED as set forth in the order. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 333 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: 8/13/2007
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Additional Authority Regarding Claim for Prejudgment Interest (Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 332 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER entered granting [328] Motion for an Order Setting a Final Pretrial Conference Date. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 331 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [328] MOTION For An Order Setting A Final Pretrial Conference Date, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Griffiths, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 330 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [328] MOTION For An Order Setting A Final Pretrial Conference Date, filed by USA.Reply due by 8/13/2007. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 329 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY re [257] Witness List , of Plaintiff's Removal of Certain Persons From Its Witness List (Griffiths, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 328 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007, Terminated: 8/3/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION For An Order Setting A Final Pretrial Conference Date, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Response due by 7/30/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 327 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's ANSWER to Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint, filed by USA.JPSR due by 8/16/2007.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 326 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit List (Revised Appendix A, Paragraph 16 Exhibit List), filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A)(Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 325 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                        SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 324 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [312] Motion for Leave. Plaintiff shall now file its Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint. Defendant is GRANTED LEAVE to undertake whatever reasonable discovery is required for the development of its response(s) to plaintiff's updated claimed cost items. To any extent required, both parties are GRANTED LEAVE for amended or supplemental pretrial submissions to reflect the updated costs involved and responses thereto. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 323 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007, Terminated: 8/3/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Revised Appendix A, Paragraph 16 Exhibit List, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Response due by 6/8/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A)(Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 322 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [312] MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 5/25/2007. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 321 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [312] MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint, filed by USA.Reply due by 5/25/2007. (Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 320 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [318] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [312] MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint Response due by 5/11/2007 with no further enlargements of time for this response to be requested. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 319 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [318] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, Letter from R. Oehler, Perkins Coie, to H. Lester, DOJ (Mar. 9, 2007))(Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 318 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007, Terminated: 5/8/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/11/2007 to File Response or Reply as to [312] MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 5/14/2007.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 317 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007, Terminated: 5/23/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/11/2007 to File Answer re [312] MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 5/14/2007.(Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 316 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RETURNING UNFILED: Motion to Intervene, Memorandum, Complaint and Certificate of Service received April 17, 2007. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 315 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Mr. William (Bill) Peterson's Motion To Intervene And Complaint, dated April 7, 2007, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 314 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                **SEALED**REPLY to Response to Motion re [285] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim for Prejudgment Interest, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 313 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Ann Snyder for USA. (Snyder, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 312 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: 4/10/2007, Terminated: 6/7/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Response due by 4/27/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A, Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint# (2) Attachment A, Exhibit 1, Standard Contract between DOE and WE# (3) Attachment B, March 9, 2007 Letter from Oehler to Lester & Sullivan)(Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 311 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [290] MOTION to Strike [256] Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Deposition And Trial Testimony Designations And, In The Alternative, Motion In Limine to Preclude Reliance Upon Those Designations As Substantive Evidence Pursuant To RCFC 32(a) and Federal Rul MOTION to Strike [256] Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Deposition And Trial Testimony Designations And, In The Alternative, Motion In Limine to Preclude Reliance Upon Those Designations As Substantive Evidence Pursuant To RCFC 32(a) and Federal Rul, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 310 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [308] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 309 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re [308] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to "Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim for Weighted Average Cost of Capital Damages." Reply due by 4/16/2007. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 308 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007, Terminated: 5/23/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/16/07 to File Response or Reply as to [300] Response to Motion [Dispositive], Response to Motion [Dispositive], filed by USA.Response due by 4/9/2007.(Donahue, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 307 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [278] MOTION in Limine to Exclude from Trial Exhibits Prepared by Government Contractors, filed by USA. (Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 306 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [280] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Ms. Eileen Supko, Regarding the Effect of the Rate of Acceptance Under the Standard Contract, filed by USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 305 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [304] Motion for Extension of Time. Reply to"Plaintiff's Response To Defendant's Motion To Strike Plaintiff's Notice Of Deposition And Trial Testimony Designations And, In The Alternative, Motion In Limine To Preclude Reliance Upon Those Designations As Substantive Evidence Pursuant To RCFC 32(a)and Federal Rule of Evidence 801(d)(2)."is due March 26, 2007. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 304 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007, Terminated: 3/12/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until March 26, 2007 to, filed by USA.Response due by 3/29/2007.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 303 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 302 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        **SEALED**PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [285] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim for Prejudgment Interest, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Oehler, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 301 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          **SEALED**RESPONSE to [286] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.(Oehler, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 300 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            **SEALED**RESPONSE to [285] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim for Prejudgment Interest, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Reply due by 3/26/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1# (2) Appendix Part 2# (3) Appendix Part 3# (4) Appendix Part 4)(Oehler, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 299 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [298] Motion for Extension of Time to File defendant's replies supporting its motions in limine to exclude the use of contractor documents as trial exhibits and to exclude certain expert opinion testimony offered by Eileen M. Supko. Replies due by 3/16/2007. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 298 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007, Terminated: 3/6/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until March 11, 2007 to File Response or Reply supporting motions in limine to exclude the use of contractor documents as trial exhibits and to exclude certain expert opinion testimony offered by Eileen M. Supko, filed by USA.Response due by 3/22/2007.(Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 297 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [296] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response (Opposition to the Government's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim for Prejudgment Interest) was filed. Response due by 3/9/2007. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 296 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007, Terminated: 3/1/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply to the Government's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim for Prejudgment Interest, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Response due by 3/19/2007.(Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 295 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [290] Motion to Strike, Plaintiff's "Notice of Deposition and Trial Testimony Designations", filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 294 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [288] Motion to Stay. The pretrial conference scheduled for March 2, 2007 is canceled. The trial, scheduled to commence on March 27, 2007 shall, instead commence on September 10, 2007, and proceed to conclusion by October 16, 2007. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 293 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [288] MOTION to Stay Proceedings, filed by USA. (Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 292 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [280] Motion in Limine, To Exclude The Expert Testimony Of Ms. Eileen M. Supko, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1# (2) Appendix Part 2)(Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 291 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [278] Motion in Limine To Exclude From Trial Exhibits Prepared By Government Contractors, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 290 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007, Terminated: 8/16/2007 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike [256] Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Deposition And Trial Testimony Designations And, In The Alternative, Motion In Limine to Preclude Reliance Upon Those Designations As Substantive Evidence Pursuant To RCFC 32(a) and Federal Rule of Evidence 801(d)(2), filed by USA.Response due by 2/26/2007. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 289 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: 2/7/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [288] Motion to Stay, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Letter (Feb. 1, 2007))(Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 288 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007, Terminated: 2/23/2007 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Stay Proceedings, filed by USA.Response due by 2/22/2007.(Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 287 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [279] Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 286 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        **SEALED**PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [285] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim for Prejudgment Interest, filed by USA. (Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 285 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007, Terminated: 8/16/2007 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          **SEALED** MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim for Prejudgment Interest, filed by USA.Response due by 3/5/2007. (Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 284 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER entered: Defendant's motion, filed February 2, 2007, for leave to file corrected motion, is GRANTED and upon its filing, the corrected motion is GRANTED to the extent that Confidential Material, as defined in any protective order applicable to this litigation, may be filed in this matter electronically under seal. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 283 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007, Terminated: 2/2/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Motion (Expedited), filed by USA.Response due by 2/20/2007.(Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 282 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007, Terminated: 2/2/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Electronically (Expedited), filed by USA.Response due by 2/20/2007.(Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 281 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [279] MOTION for Extension of Time until February 5, 2007 to file its motions in limine and summary judgment motions, and an enlargement of time to February 9, 2007, within which to file its response to plaintiff's deposition and trial testimony design, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Reply due by 2/15/2007. (Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 280 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007, Terminated: 8/16/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Ms. Eileen Supko, Regarding the Effect of the Rate of Acceptance Under the Standard Contract, filed by USA.Response due by 2/20/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix # (4) Appendix # (5) Appendix # (6) # (7))(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 279 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007, Terminated: 2/2/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until February 5, 2007 to file its motions in limine and summary judgment motions, and an enlargement of time to February 9, 2007, within which to file its response to plaintiff's deposition and trial testimony designations and any applicable motion for leave pursuant to RCFC App. A, para. 15(b), filed by USA.Response due by 2/20/2007.(Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 278 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007, Terminated: 8/16/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Exclude from Trial Exhibits Prepared by Government Contractors, filed by USA.Response due by 2/20/2007.(Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 277 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by USA. (Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 276 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [272] Motion for Extension of Time: Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 1/30/2007. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 275 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [272] Motion for Extension of Time, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 274 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit List, filed by USA. (Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 273 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection to Exhibit List, filed by USA. Related document: [271] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File.(Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 272 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007, Terminated: 1/30/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until January 30, 2007 to file its RCFC Appendix A, paragraph 14(b) memorandum of contentions of fact and law, filed by USA.Response due by 2/12/2007.(Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 271 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [269] Motion for Extension of Time: Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law and Exhibit List due by 1/26/2007. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 270 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [269] MOTION for Extension of Time until January 26, 2007 to file its RCFC Appendix A, paragraph 14(b) memorandum of contentions of fact and law and its paragraph 16 exhibit list, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Reply due by 2/7/2007. (Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 269 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007, Terminated: 1/25/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until January 26, 2007 to file its RCFC Appendix A, paragraph 14(b) memorandum of contentions of fact and law and its paragraph 16 exhibit list, filed by USA.Response due by 2/12/2007.(Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 268 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Witness List, filed by USA. (Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 267 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORRECTION TO ORDER FILED JANUARY 19, 2007: The docket entry for the January 19, 2007 Order incorrectly links to the wrong order document. The correct order document is linked to this entry. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 266 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [264] Motion for Extension of Time and granting [265] Motion for Extension of Time. (Defendant shall serve its Response to Plaintiff's Deposition and Trial Testimony Designations and any applicable motion for leave (RCFC App. A, para. 15(b)) on or before February 2, 2007. Defendant's Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, witness list, and exhibit list are due to be filed by 1/24/2007.) Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 265 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007, Terminated: 1/19/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until February 2, 2007 to serve its Response to Plaintiff's Deposition and Trial Testimony Designations and any applicable motion for leave pursuant to RCFC App. A, para. 15(b), filed by USA.Response due by 2/5/2007.(Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 264 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007, Terminated: 1/19/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until January 24, 2007 to file its RCFC Appendix A, paragraph 14(b) memorandum of contentions of fact and law, its paragraph 15 witness list, and its paragraph 16 exhibit list, filed by USA.Response due by 2/5/2007.(Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2007 01:00 PM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge James F. Merow. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 263 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: 1/17/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [262] Motion request to establish three new deadlines and reschedule the pretrial conference The pretrial conference is rescheduled for March 2, 2007 at 1:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 262 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: 1/17/2007, Terminated: 1/17/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION To Revise Pretrial Scheduling Order, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Response due by 2/5/2007.(Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 261 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: 1/17/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY , of Plaintiff's First Supplemental Deposition and Trial Testimony Designations (Attachments: # (1) Plaintiff's First Supplemental Deposition and Trial Testimony Designations)(Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 260 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: 12/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit List (First Supplement), filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 259 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: 12/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Witness List, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 258 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit List, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit List)(Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 257 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Witness List, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 256 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY (Attachments: # (1) Deposition and Trial Testimony Designations)(Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 255 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/14/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [254] Motion for Extension of Time Plaintiff's Appendix A Filings due by 12/18/2006. Supplemental Appendix A filings, if any, are due 12/29/06. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 254 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006, Terminated: 12/14/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until December 18, 2006 and December 29, 2006 to File Plaintiff's Appendix A, Paragraph 15 and 16 Submissions, and Any Supplements Thereto Relating to NRC Issues, respectively,, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Response due by 1/1/2007.(Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 253 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [252] Motion for Extension of Time. (Appendix A Filings)Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 1/19/2007; Exhibit List due by 1/19/2007; and Witness List due by 1/19/2007. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 252 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006, Terminated: 12/7/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until January 17, 2007 to file RCFC Appendix A, paragraph 14(b) memorandum of contentions of fact and law, paragraph 15 witness list, and paragraph 16 exhibit list, filed by USA.Response due by 12/26/2006.(Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 251 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection to Exhibit List, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. Related document: [214] Order on Motion to Amend Schedule. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A, Objection List)(Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 250 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 249 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Plaintiff's motion, filed by leave of the court on September 18, 2006, shall be GRANTED; and the Appendix A, sections 13(a) and (b) information exchange for both parties shall be enlarged to and including September 18, 2006. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 248 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006, Terminated: 9/18/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time which to exchange its Appendix A contained in the Court's December 20, 2005 scheduling order until 9/18/2006 to , filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY (by leave of the judge). Service: 9/18/2006 9/15/2006.Response due by 10/5/2006.(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 247 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [246] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Expert discovery is to be completed on or before August 25, 2006. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 246 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006, Terminated: 7/18/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until August 25, 2006 to Complete Expert Discovery, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Response due by 8/4/2006.(Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 245 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: 6/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part [243] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's motion, filed June 26, 2006, is GRANTED to the extent that the material covered, except Mr. Hamal's expert report, shall be actually made available to opposing counsel by no later that 12:00 noon EDT on June 30, 2006, and Mr. Hamal's report shall be so made available by 12:00 noon EDT on June 29, 2006; and (2) that except to the extent granted by (1), defendant's motion, filed June 26, 2006 is, otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 244 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [243] MOTION for Extension of Time until June 30, 2006 to serve (1) expert reports, (2) submissions responding to plaintiff's damages schedules, and (3) responses and objections to plaintiff's third set of production requests, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Reply due by 7/10/2006. (Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 243 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006, Terminated: 6/27/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until June 30, 2006 to serve (1) expert reports, (2) submissions responding to plaintiff's damages schedules, and (3) responses and objections to plaintiff's third set of production requests, filed by USA.Response due by 7/13/2006.(Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 242 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Pursuant to the unopposed Motion for Entry of Order Regarding Proprietary Documents and Security Materials, filed June 9, 2006, the May 31, 2006 Order granting additional protection to the computer software program developed by Holtec International, Inc. ("Holtec") is hereby VACATED. Additionally, paragraph 7 of the Protective Order, entered in this case on May 9, 2002, is amended with the addition of the following text to provide special protection regarding the proprietary documents developed and created by Holtec (collectively, the "Proprietary Documents") and to provide special protection to the secured information in documents provided by the Nuclear Regulatory Commission (collectively, the "Security Materials"). Thus, it is ORDERED that:(1)Defendant's unopposed motion, filed June 9, 2006, is GRANTED; (2) In order to protect the information in the Proprietary Documents and Security materials, any expert or consultant that views or uses the Proprietary Documents or Security Materials must execute an acknowledgment in the form of one of the two attachments hereto affirming that: a.the expert or consultant will use the Proprietary Documents and/or Security Materials solely for consideration in connection with the instant action (Wisconsin Electric Power Company v. United States, 00-697C); b. the expert or consultant will not disclose the Proprietary Documents and/or Security Materials to any third party or make any other use of the Proprietary Documents and/or Security Materials, including any commercial use; and c. upon final resolution of the action Wisconsin Electric Power Company v. United States, 00-697C, the Proprietary Documents must be provided back to plaintiff, Wisconsin Electric Power Company, for return to Holtec; the Security Materials must be provided back to the Government; the Proprietary Documents must be removed from the computers and from any other data recording devices used by the Government and its expert or consultants; the Security Materials must be removed from the computers and from any other data recording devices used by the WEPCO and its expert or consultants. (3) The parties will provide copies of each of the executed acknowledgments to opposing counsel within ten days of execution; (4) Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Entry of Order Regarding Protection of Proprietary Documents, filed June 5, 2006, is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (Attachments: # (1) # (2)) (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 241 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006, Terminated: 6/13/2006 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Proprietary Documents and Security Materials, filed by USA.Response due by 6/26/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Sample Acknowledgment# (2) Exhibit Sample Acknowledgment# (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 240 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [239] Motion for Extension of Time (1) expert reports due 6/26/06; (2) submissions responding to plaintiff's damages schedules due 6/26/06; and (3) responses and objections to plaintiff's third set of production requests due 6/26/06. It is further ordered that the period for expert discovery be enlarged through 8/18/06. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 239 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006, Terminated: 6/7/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until June 26, 2006 to serve defendant's (1) expert reports, (2) submissions responding to plaintiff's damages schedules, and (3) responses and objections to plaintiff's third set of production requests, and corresponding enlargement of time for expert discovery through August 18, 2006, filed by USA.Response due by 6/26/2006.(Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 238 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006, Terminated: 6/13/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Order Regarding Protection of Proprietary Documents, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Response due by 6/22/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment# (2) Attachment)(Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 237 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROTECTIVE ORDER: Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (Attachment # 1)(lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 236 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/26/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [235] Motion for Extension of Time. Responses and objections to plaintiff's third set of production requests to be served June 12, 2006.Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 235 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006, Terminated: 5/26/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until June 12, 2006 to respond to plaintiff's third set of production requests, filed by USA.Response due by 6/12/2006.(Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 234 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006, Terminated: 5/31/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Entry of Order Regarding Protection of Proprietary Software Program, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Response due by 6/12/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1# (2) Attachment 2)(Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 233 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [232] Motion for Extension of Time. Responses and Objections to Defendant's Fifth Set of Requests for Production of Documents due: May 8, 2006. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 232 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006, Terminated: 5/3/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until May 8, 2006 to Serve WE's Responses and Objections to Defendant's Fifth Set of Requests for Production of Documents, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Response due by 5/19/2006.(Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 231 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by USA. JPSR due by 6/12/2006. (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 230 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 229 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [228] Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall serve expert reports on or before May 8, 2006 and defendant shall serve expert reports on or before June 12, 2006. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 228 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006, Terminated: 4/7/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until May 8, 2006 to Service of Plaintiff's Expert Reports and Corresponding Enlargement of Time for the Service of Defendant's Expert Reports, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 227 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER entered re pending motions (for reconsideration, for enlargement, and for leave). It is ORDERED that: (1) Upon reconsideration, the trial perimeter set forth in the Order, filed August 30, 2005 shall be VACATED and, instead, trial proceedings in this matter shall be confined to damages incurred by plaintiff through December 2005, with any future damages to be addressed in a subsequent action(s) to be filed after such damages have been incurred; (2) Plaintiff's motion, filed February 6, 2006, to file an Amended and Supplemental Complaint is GRANTED and the Amended and Supplemental Complaint attached as Attachment A to plaintiff's motion, shall now be filed electronically by plaintiff with defendant's response to be filed in accordance with RCFC 15(a); (3) Defendant's motion for an enlargement of time, filed March 3, 2006, shall be GRANTED with the Becka, Meils and Straub depositions to be time-limited as agreed and the remaining depositions to be each completed in a seven-hour day or less, with the option of counsel by agreement to extend the durations and to substitute RCFC 30(b)(6) depositions for any of those named above. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 226 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [220] MOTION for Extension of Time,until Friday, May 5, 2006, to Complete Discovery, filed by USA. (Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 225 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [215] MOTION for Leave to File Amended and Supplemental Complaint, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 224 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [222] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re [215] MOTION for Leave to File Amended and Supplemental Complaint. Reply due by 3/21/2006. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 223 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [220] MOTION for Extension of Time,until Friday, May 5, 2006, to Complete Discovery, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. Reply due by 3/31/2006. (Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 222 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006, Terminated: 3/20/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until March 21, 2006 to File Response or Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File its Amended and Supplemental Complaint, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. Response due by 4/3/2006. (Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 221 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [215] Motion for Leave to File,, filed by USA. (Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 220 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006, Terminated: 4/6/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time,until Friday, May 5, 2006, to Complete Discovery, filed by USA. Response due by 3/20/2006. (Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 219 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [218] Motion for enlargement of time to and including March 20, 2006, within which to serve responses and objections to the Government's Second Set of Requests for Admission, Fourth Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Fourth Set of Interrogatories. Responses and objections due to be served on or before March 20, 2006. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 218 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006, Terminated: 2/24/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until March 20, 2006 to Serve Responses and Objections to Defendant's Second Set of Requests for Admission, Fourth Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Fourth Set of Interrogatories, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. Response due by 3/13/2006. (Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 217 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [216]Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [215] MOTION for Leave to File Amended and Supplemental Complaint. Response due by 3/10/2006. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 216 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006, Terminated: 2/22/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until March 10, 2006 to File Response or Reply as to [215] MOTION for Leave to File Amended and Supplemental Complaint, filed by USA. Response due by 3/13/2006. (Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 215 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006, Terminated: 4/6/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Amended and Supplemental Complaint, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. Response due by 2/23/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A, Amended and Supplemental Complaint# (2) Attachment A, Exhibit 1, Standard Contract between DOE and WE)(Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Appendix A Filings due by 10/27/2006. Completion of expert discovery due by 7/7/2006. completion of Fact Discovery due by 3/3/2006..Opposing Appendix A Filings due by 12/8/2006. Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2007 before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Trial (three weeks) set for 3/27/2007 -4/16/2007 before Senior Judge James F. Merow. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 214 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [213] Joint Motion to Revise the Court's Pretrial Scheduling Order. The proposed schedule is hereby adopted. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 213 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005, Terminated: 12/20/2005 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Amend Schedule (to Revise the Court's Pretrial Scheduling Order), filed by USA. Response due by 1/5/2006. (Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 212 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005, Terminated: 2/8/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Third MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/21/2005 to serve responses and objections to plaintiff's second set of production requests, filed by USA. Response due by 1/3/2006. (Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 211 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Poulin, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 210 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [209] Motion for Extension of Time to and including December 14, 2005, within which to serve defendant's responses and objections to plaintiff's second set of production requests. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 209 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005, Terminated: 11/30/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/14/2005 to serve responses and objections to plaintiff's second set of production requests, filed by USA. Response due by 12/19/2005. (Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 208 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [197] MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's August 30, 2005 Order in Light of Subsequent Binding Precedent and Motion for Expedited Consideration, filed by USA. (Lo Re, Alan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 207 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Lo Re, Alan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 206 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [197] MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's August 30, 2005 Order in Light of Subsequent Binding Precedent and Motion for Expedited Consideration, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. Reply due by 11/21/2005. (Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 205 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [203] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant requests an enlargement of time of 30 days, to and including November 30, 2005, within which to serve its responses and objections to plaintiff's second set of production requests. Second set of production requests due by 11/30/2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 204 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [202] Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time of thirty days to and including December 2, 2005, within which to serve responses and objections to defendant's third set of interrogatories and third set of requests for production of documents. Counsel for defendant has represented that it does not oppose plaintiff's motion. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 203 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005, Terminated: 10/28/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/30/05 to serve responses and objections to plaintiff's second set of production requests, filed by USA. Response due by 11/14/2005. (Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 202 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005, Terminated: 10/28/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until December 2, 2005 to answer and object to Defendant's Third Set of Interrogatories and Third Set of Requests for the Production of Documents, filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. Response due by 11/14/2005. (Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 201 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE CALL AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that counsel submit a proposed revised pre-trial schedule(s) on or before November 14, 2005 or, alternatively, then submit a status report(s) indicating when a proposed revised schedule may be expected. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 200 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER:(1) Defendant's [194] motion, filed September 23, 2004, for an enlargement of time is GRANTED; (2) Defendant's [196] Motion for Leave to Conduct More Than Ten Depositions is GRANTED;(3) Counsel shall confer and by telephone conference call or status report indicate, on or before October 21, 2005, the extent, if any, the November 4, 2005 deadline, and any other interim deadline, should be relaxed so that the fact discovery contemplated can be feasibly accomplished. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 199 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [194] MOTION for Extension of Time until October 21, 2005 to answer and object to plaintiff's third set of interrogatories filed by USA. (Lo Re, Alan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Compliance due by 10/21/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 198 Filed: 10/10/2005, Entered: 10/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [196] MOTION for Discovery (for Leave to Conduct More Than Ten Depositions and Motion for Expedited Consideration) filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. Reply due by 10/24/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 197 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005, Terminated: 4/6/2006 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's August 30, 2005 Order in Light of Subsequent Binding Precedent and Motion for Expedited Consideration filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 196 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005, Terminated: 10/11/2005 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Discovery (for Leave to Conduct More Than Ten Depositions and Motion for Expedited Consideration) filed by USA. Response due by 10/20/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 195 Filed: 9/25/2005, Entered: 9/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [194] MOTION for Extension of Time until October 21, 2005 to answer and object to plaintiff's third set of interrogatories filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. Reply due by 10/11/2005. (Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 194 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005, Terminated: 10/11/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until October 21, 2005 to answer and object to plaintiff's third set of interrogatories filed by USA. Response due by 10/11/2005. (Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 193 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [180] Motion: (1) This matter shall proceed to trial with evidence as to damages accrued prior to 1998 and subsequent thereto until 2010 to be admissible in evidence under applicable legal standards; (2) Defendant's cross-motion, filed April 11, 2005 shall be DENIED; (3) Plaintiff's motion, filed February 22, 2005, is GRANTED in that this action shall be limited to evidence of damages accrued through December 31, 2010, and any impact therefrom through December 31, 2015, with any post 2015 impact and additional claim(s) for breach(es) of contract, should DOE not commence performance by the end of 2010, to be reserved for assertion as a separate cause of action at that time. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 192 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER:[191]the joint motion, filed August 18, 2005 is GRANTED, so that in this case no party shall be required to produce any draft (including copies) of any expert report prepared in connection with this case or any spent nuclear fuel case that is or was pending before this court. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 191 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005, Terminated: 8/19/2005 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Discovery Order Regarding Discovery of Draft Expert Reports filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. Response due by 9/6/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 190 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [189] Motion for Extension of Time. The Joint Motion to Revise the Court's Pretrial Scheduling Order was filed. Parties request that the court revise items (2) through (5) of the Order filed November 24, 2004. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the joint motion, filed May 27, 2005, is GRANTED and that items (2) through (5) of the Order of November 24, 2004 are revised as set forth in the motion. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 189 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005, Terminated: 5/27/2005 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [179] Pretrial Order filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. Response due by 6/13/2005. (Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 188 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [180] MOTION For an Order Regarding Subsequent Damages Actions and Request for Expedited Consideration and [183] Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Pre-Breach and Future Damages filed by USA. (Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 187 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [186] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re cross-motion for summary judgment regarding pre-breach and future damages. Reply due by 5/5/2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 186 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005, Terminated: 4/29/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to cross-motion for summary judgment regarding pre-breach and future damages (until 5/5/2005) filed by USA. (Crawford, Kevin) Modified on 4/29/2005 (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 185 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [180] MOTION For an Order Regarding Subsequent Damages Actions and Request for Expedited Consideration by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 184 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [182] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 183 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [180] MOTION For an Order Regarding Subsequent Damages Actions and Request for Expedited Consideration and Opposition to Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Pre-Breach and Future Damages filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Reply to response to cross-motion due by 4/28/05) (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Cover Sheet# (2) Appendix Documents)(Carney, Donald) Modified on 4/12/2005 to add reply deadline (jat, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to response to cross-motion due by 4/28/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 182 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [180] MOTION For an Order Regarding Subsequent Damages Actions and Request for Expedited Consideration to Accompany Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Pre-Breach and Future Damages by USA. (Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 181 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [180] MOTION For an Order Regarding Subsequent Damages Actions and Request for Expedited Consideration and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Pre-Breach and Future Damages filed by USA. Response and Reply due by 4/11/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Cover & Tables# (2) Appendix)(Crawford, Kevin) Modified on 3/18/2005 (jat, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/18/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: response and reply due by 4/11/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 180 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005, Terminated: 8/30/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION For an Order Regarding Subsequent Damages Actions and Request for Expedited Consideration by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. Response due by 3/11/2005 (Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 179 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Completion of Fact Discovery: 10/17/2005. Completion of Expert Discovery: 2/15/2006. Pltf's Appendix A Submission: 4/14/2006. Dft's Appendix A Submission: 5/12/2006. Pretrial Conference: 6/16/2006 before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Time to be set by further order. Trial to commence: 7/14/2006 before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Time and duration to be set by further order. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 178 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to [1] Complaint by USA. JPSR due by 1/10/2005.(Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 177 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Pretrial Order Plaintiff's Proposed Pretrial Schedule by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 176 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT with Proposed Pre-Trial Schedule in Response to the Court's 10/8/2004 order by USA. (Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 175 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [174] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 11/19/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 174 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004, Terminated: 11/12/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 11/19/2004 by USA. Response due by 11/29/2004 (Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 173 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/8/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) Counsel shall promptly confer with a goal of reaching agreement on a schedule for the pretrial submissions set out in Appendix A, which schedule shall include the submission, audit examination, and exchanges with respect to all items and figures from books and records to be utilized as evidence in this matter as detailed in the Order filed November 8, 2002;(2) On or before November 12, 2004, counsel shall file a status report(s) proposing a schedule(s) for all necessary pretrial activity in the case, together with a proposed trial date(s) and the estimated trial period required; (3) Leave is granted for the filing of a pleading in response to plaintiff's Complaint on or before November 12, 2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 172 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/8/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part [57] Motion to Dismiss, denying [58] Motion for Summary Judgment, denying [62] Motion for Summary Judgment, granting [153] Motion to Strike, denying as moot [156] Motion for Leave to File, terminating [163] Motion for Leave to File, granting [163] Motion to Strike, granting in part [165] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 171 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [165] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 6/21/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 170 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [166] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA filed by USA. (Crawford, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 169 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [165] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability filed by USA. Reply due by 6/21/2004. (Crawford, Kevin) Modified on 6/7/2004 to correct reply due date (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 168 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [167] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [165] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability. Response due by 6/4/2004 Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 167 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004, Terminated: 6/1/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [165] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability,until 06/04/2004, (Unopposed) by USA. Response due by 6/18/2004 (Crawford, Kevin) Modified on 6/2/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 166 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact in Support of WE's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration)(Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 165 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004, Terminated: 10/8/2004 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. Response due by 6/1/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Southern Nuclear Order (April 7, 2004))(Carney, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 164 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 163 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike pages 1774 and 1789 of Appendix to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and for Leave to File Amended Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Service: 2/18/04. Response due by 3/8/2004 (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES [157] Dft's Second Motion to Renew its Motion toConsolidate as well as its previous motions relating to consolidation. The Court further LIFTS THE STAY of the remainder of the cases to which the Order of 4/16/2003, applied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket this Order in this case with an entry noting the same on the dockets of the remaining SNFcases captioned in Dft's instant motion, with a courtesy copy to all SNF parties and presiding SNF judges of the Court. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 162 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Counsel for Dft's Change of Facsimile Number by USA. Service: 12/1/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 161 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Pltfs' Responses to [157] Dft's Second MOTION to the Chief Judge to Renew Consideration of Dft's Motion to Consolidate, filed by USA. Service: 9/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 160 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER allowing [159] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to [157] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03. Reply due by 9/3/2003. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 159 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [158] Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA.Service: 9/3/03. Response due by 9/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to the Chief Judge for Extension of Time to File Reply to [158] Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C]Service: 8/26/03. Response due by 9/12/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 158 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION to [157] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. Reply due by 8/29/2003. Service: 8/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/15/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Dft's Motion to the Chief Judge for Leave to Correct Certificate of Service and to Waive Requirements of RCFC 5.3 Regarding "Dft's Second Motion [to the Chief Judge] to Renew its Motion to Consolidate." (Original Motion located in Case No. 98-126C) (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 157 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SECOND MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate by USA. [COPY] (Original Document in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 7/29/03 by hand. Response due by 8/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 156 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: 7/23/2003, Terminated: 10/8/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Dft's Motion to Strike by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Service: 7/23/03. Response due by 8/11/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 155 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Opposition to Motion re: [153] Dft's MOTION to Strike Pages 1774 Through 1789 From Pltf's Appendix in Support of [122] Pltf's Opposition to Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding the Rate of Acceptance filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 7/16/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 154 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE/OPPOSITION to [153] Dft's MOTION to Strike Pages 1774 Through 1789 from [122] Pltf's Appendix in Support of Pltf's Opposition to Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding the Rate of Acceptance filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY. Reply due by 7/18/2003. Service: 7/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 153 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike pages 1774 through 1789 from [122] Plaintiff's Appendix in support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment regarding the rate of acceptance by UNITED STATES.Service: 6/18/03. Response due by 7/7/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 152 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 151 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: further proceedings. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 150 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [124]PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by filed The United States. Service: 3/28/03.(dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 149 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY, together with a separate volume of appendix, to Response to Motion re [62] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The United States. Service: 3/28/03.(dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 148 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [146] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 147 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [145] Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 146 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003, Terminated: 4/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of reply to the motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance by 59 pages filed by The United States. Service: 3/28/03. Response due 4/14/2003. (lrd) Modified on 4/8/2003 (dls, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 145 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003, Terminated: 3/28/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re [139] Order filed by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY.Service: 3/25/03. Response due by 4/11/2003 (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 144 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 143 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: 3/13/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [58-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. Service: 3/11/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 142 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: 3/13/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response by USA to [124-1] proposed findings by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC. Service: 3/11/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 141 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: 3/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [140-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 140 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003, Terminated: 3/12/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 3/11/03) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 3/28/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 139 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: See order [612-1] dated 3/7/03, in case 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 138 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 137 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 136 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 135 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [125-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to the motion for partial summary judgment, reply to motion for summary judgment regarding Greater-Than-Class-C radioactive waste and reply to the motion to dismiss its takings claim . (1) Takings (Count III) motions by 1/30/03 ; (2) Greater-than-Class-C radioactive waste by 3/11/03 ; and (3 irate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance by 3/28/03 ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 133 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 132 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [57-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of the complaint. Service: 1/30/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 131 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 130 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - see 98-126 C for order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 129 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [125-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to the motion for partial summary judgment, reply to motion for summary judgment regarding Greater-Than-Class-C radioactive waste and reply to the motion to dismiss its takings claim. Service: 1/21/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 128 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC (Service: 1/15/03) to [125-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to the motion for partial summary judgment, reply to motion for summary judgment regarding Greater-Than-Class-C radioactive waste and reply to the motion to dismiss its takings claim. Reply due: 1/30/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 126 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 127 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 125 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003, Terminated: 2/4/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/03) to Extend Time to reply to the motion for partial summary judgment, reply to motion for summary judgment regarding Greater-Than-Class-C radioactive waste and reply to the motion to dismiss its takings claim until ? Response due: 1/21/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 124 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC. Service: 12/16/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 123 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC to [61-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 12/16/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 122 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC (Service: 12/16/02 ) to [62-1] motion for Summary Judgment (together with separate four volume appendix). Reply due: 1/2/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 121 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [116-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 120 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC (Service: 12/16/02) to [57-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of the complaint. Reply due: 1/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 119 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC. Service: 12/16/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 118 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC to [59-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 12/16/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 117 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE, with appendix, by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC (Service: 12/16/02) to [58-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. Reply due: 1/3/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 116 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002, Terminated: 12/18/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC (Service: 12/16/02) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 1/2/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 115 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [113-1] motion for Leave to correct certificate of service (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 114 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC (Service: 11/12/02) to [109-1] motion requesting an order setting 11/25/02, as the deadline for plaintiff to respond to motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 11/26/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 113 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002, Terminated: 11/18/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 11/8/02) for Leave to correct certificate of service relating to the motion requesting an order setting 11/25/02, as the deadline for Plaintiff to respond to the motions for summary judgment. Response due: 11/25/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 112 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part, denying in part [110-1] motion for a scheduling conference Joint Preliminary Status Report due 1/10/03 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 111 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Response to [62-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 12/16/02, [58-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment reset to 12/16/02 and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 1/10/03 for [62-1] motion for Summary Judgment, reset to 1/10/03 for [58-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 110 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002, Terminated: 11/8/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC (Service: 11/1/02) for a scheduling conference . Response due: 11/18/02. (FILED WITH STATUS REPORT). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 109 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/26/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 10/24/02 ) requesting an order setting 11/25/02, as the deadline for plaintiff to respond to motion for summary judgment . Response due: 11/12/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 108 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 107 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 106 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 105 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 104 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 103 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 102 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 101 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 100 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 99 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: see order [467-1] dated 7/29/02, in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 98 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 97 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 96 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 95 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 94 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 93 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 92 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 91 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 90 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C.(signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 89 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/6/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 88 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/3/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: See [395-1] order in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 82 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 81 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 80 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 79 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 78 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 77 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: see order [344-2] dated 4/11/02 in Case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: see order in 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypotl). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 74 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying motion to preclude or, in the alternative, defer, depositions pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 73 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories until 3/8/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See Case No. 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying motion to reconsider filed 1/22/02 and granting the motion to revise dates in 9/26/01 order filed 1/24/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. See order in 98-126C filed 2/01/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 2/12/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 1/11/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 01/03/02 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [64-1] motion to schedule a status Conference for ? (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: 12/10/2001, Terminated: 12/17/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC (Service : 12/7/01 ) to schedule a status Conference for ? Response due: 12/24/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [60-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 11/28/01) for Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance, (with separate appendix). Response due: 12/31/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 11/28/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001, Terminated: 12/3/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 11/28/01) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 12/17/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service by hand: 11/27/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION, with one volume of Appendix, by USA (Service by hand: 11/27/01) for partial Summary Judgment . Response due: 12/26/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001, Terminated: 10/8/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 11/27/01) to Dismiss Count III of the complaint . Response due: 12/11/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/20/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER see order 98-126C filed 11/16/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. See 98-126 C ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to respond to motion to compel production od documents to 11/06/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: Public Service Electric and Gas motion to extend time filed on 11/2/01, within which to respond to the defendant's motion to compel is GRANTED (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein) Copy to parties. (see motion filed in 98-126C) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to complete production of documents to 11/19/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [35-1] motion for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order. Individual Judges retain the right to decide dispositive motions. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: proposed stipulated order, etc. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [36-1] motion for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. and granting Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file response to the transfer motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of supplemental certificate of service by USA. Service: 10/19/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 10/19/01) to Compel . Response due: 11/5/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Service: 10/19/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: All filings shall bear the name of the discovery Judge, all matters to be brought to the attention of the Court shall be filed with the discovery Judge only, the Clerk of the Court is directed not to accept for filing any motion by a party in one of the captioned cases for leave to file material with a Judge in an individual case ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 10/16/01) to Compel . Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/2/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/16/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file Defendant's response and Defendant's corrected certificate of service due 10/25/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: Defendant's motion to extend time filed on 10/15/01, within which to file the proposed stipulated order concerning the scheduling and conduct of depositions in the coordinated discovery proceeding, is GRANTED, see motion in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC (Service: 10/11/01) for Leave to file the Motion for Clarification . Response due: 10/29/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001, Terminated: 10/29/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 10/10/01) for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. Response due: 10/29/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001, Terminated: 11/1/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC (Service by hand: 10/9/01) for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order . Response due: 10/23/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Kevin Brooks Crawford. Service : 10/5/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [32-1] motion to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages Plan to be filed by 10/22/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001, Terminated: 10/3/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 10/1/01) to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages until 10/22/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: The Joint Motion for an Order for Consolidated Discovery filed on 7/10/01, is granted, with the exception of document production, the parties are granted an enlargement of time until 10/1/01, to submit a plan addressing the production of e-mail messages (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:30 a.m. on 9/20/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting motion for protective order in the form provided by Exhibit A of the parties 08/10/01 motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). See case number 98-126 C for motion. Protective order in 98-458 C is also granted, subject to reconsideration by assigned judge. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC to [24-2] order. Service: 8/16/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 9/11/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA to [24-2] order. Service: 8/15/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying as moot [8-1] motion to Stay (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: 7/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Designating Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein as presiding Judge over discovery and briefs from counsel are due on 8/17/01 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001, Terminated: 3/3/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC (Service: 7/13/01) for Leave to file proposed liability order . Response due: 7/30/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 7/11/01) for entry of Protective Order and stipulated order governing review of the Dept. of Energy's electronic "Record Information System" database and for Leave to file a copy of the parties "Joint Motion for an order coordinating discovery . Response due: 7/30/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Copy of Yankee Atomic's Motion for Leave to file documents relevant to the telephone conference with Judge Wiese. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER resetting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 6/14/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER scheduling Status Conference for 10:30 a.m., 6/14/01 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: On 1/8/2001, Dft filed a [7-1] Motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. part 961. The Chief Judge hereby designates Judge Wiese as the managing judge in the above cited cases for the purpose of meeting with the parties to consider whether consolidation or other joint handling of discovery or other pre-trial matters is appropriate. Judge Wiese is requested to formulate a management plan, if one is appropriate, and is authorized to make appropriate rulings with respect to this purpose. (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Judge Wiese is designated as managing judge. Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 3/17/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [7-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. part 961. Service: 2/22/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [7-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. part 961. Service: 2/16/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [14-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of the reply to opposition to the motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001, Terminated: 2/21/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 2/20/01) for Leave to file a copy of the reply to opposition to the motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. . Response due: 3/9/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/5/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC (Service by hand: 1/29/01) to [7-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. part 961. Reply due: 2/7/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [11-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of the memorandum in response to the defendant's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge, etc. (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001, Terminated: 2/2/2001 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC (Service : 1/30/01 ) for Leave to file a copy of the memorandum in response to the defendant's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge, etc. Response due: 2/16/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                See 30-1 Response to motion filed January 29, 2001, in 98-483C Florida Power & Light Company. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC (Service by hand: 1/22/01) to Extend Time to respond to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign case to a single Judge , (until January 29, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001, Terminated: 7/25/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 1/12/01 ) to Stay , pending respolution of motion to reassign to a single Judge, etc. Response due: 1/29/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001, Terminated: 5/22/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 1/8/01) to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. part 961 . Response due: 1/25/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [5-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of contract, etc. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001, Terminated: 1/10/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/01) for Leave to file a copy of the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of contract, etc. . Response due: 1/26/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. Service : 12/21/00 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: 11/17/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge James F. Merow . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: 11/17/2000 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC of related cases. (Nos. 98-484C, 98-126C, 99-447C, 98-621C, 98-485C, 98-483C, 98-429C, 98-488C, and 98-614C). (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: 11/17/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT filed. Copies (5) to defendant. FILING FEE $ 120 RECEIPT # 050790 (Answer due on 1/16/01) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 177 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?