POWER AUTHORITY, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00703-EJD
District Judge Edward J. Damich, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo POWER AUTHORITY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott D. Slater +1 202 616 0467 scott.slater@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/20/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, SNF
  Entries (261) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 232 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
RESPONSE to [226] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by POWER AUTHORITY.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Chu, Jack)
    LREF
    Legal Document 231 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008 Court Filing
    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/30/2008 at 2:30 PM before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
      ORDER granting [230] Motion to Lift Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
        LREF
        Legal Document 230 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008, Terminated: 9/8/2008 Motion to Lift Stay
        MOTION to Lift Stay, filed by POWER AUTHORITY.Response due by 9/22/2008.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
          LREF
          Legal Document 229 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008
          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008
            ORDER granting [228] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before September 3, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
              LREF
              Legal Document 228 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008, Terminated: 8/28/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/03/2008 to file Joint Status Report, filed by POWER AUTHORITY.Response due by 9/15/2008.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008
                ORDER granting [227] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. The parties shall file the Joint Status Report on or before August 27, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 227 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008, Terminated: 8/26/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 08/27/2008 to file Joint Status Report, filed by POWER AUTHORITY.Response due by 9/11/2008.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 226 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
                    MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/25/2008. (jt1)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008
                        ORDER granting [225] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before August 25, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 225 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008, Terminated: 8/11/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/25/2008 to To File Joint Status Report Concerning Further Proceedings In This Case, filed by USA.Response due by 8/25/2008.(Moses, Anthony)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008
                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/11/2008. (jt1)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008
                              ORDER granting [224] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before August 11, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 224 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008, Terminated: 8/6/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until August 11, 2008 to File Joint Status Report, filed by USA.Response due by 8/21/2008.(Slater, Scott)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008
                                  ORDER granting [223] Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for an Enlargement of Time. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before August 4, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (ahb)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 223 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008, Terminated: 7/8/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/4/2008 to File Joint Status Report, filed by POWER AUTHORITY.Response due by 7/24/2008.(Chu, Jack)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008
                                      ORDER: Stay extended until 7/7/2008. Status report due by 7/7/2008. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 222 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008
                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 221 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008
                                          Joint MOTION to Stay Case, filed by POWER AUTHORITY, USA.Response due by 1/25/2008.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 220 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Slater for USA. (Slater, Scott)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 219 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007 Court Filing
                                              ORDER RETURNING UNFILED: William D. Peterson renewed Motion to Intervene, received July 23, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 218 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting [217] Joint Motion to Continue Stay: the stay in this case is continued indefinitely; the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before January 7, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 217 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007, Terminated: 7/16/2007 Motion to Stay
                                                  Joint MOTION to Stay, filed by POWER AUTHORITY, USA.Response due by 7/16/2007.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 216 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007
                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 215 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: 5/10/2007 Court Filing
                                                      ORDER RETURNING UNFILED: William Peterson Motion to Intervene as Intervenor-Defendant, received April 17, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 214 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007
                                                        RESPONSE to Mr. William (Bill) Peterson's Motion To Intervene And Complaint, dated April 7, 2007, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: 1/9/2007
                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/30/2007. (mb2, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 213 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [212] Joint Motion to Continue Stay:Joint Status Report due on or before June 30, 2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 212 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007, Terminated: 1/8/2007 Motion to Continue
                                                              Joint MOTION to Continue Stay, filed by POWER AUTHORITY, USA.Response due by 1/22/2007.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 211 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007
                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by POWER AUTHORITY, USA. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006
                                                                  ORDER STAYING CASE: the parties' Joint Status Report of 6/30/2006 included a "motion" for an extension of the stay in this case. However, as previously noted in the court's Order of 10/05/2005, such motion MUST be filed separately from a status report; otherwise, it is not recorded in the electronic case management system. Nonetheless, the court hereby orders this case stayed indefinitely. On or before 01/02/2007, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report addressing with specificity how they propose the case should proceed. The parties are on notice that the court will not entertain any future "motion" purportedly incorporated within status reports. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 210 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT And Motion To Continue Stay, filed by POWER AUTHORITY, USA. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005
                                                                      ORDER STAYING CASE: the parties' joint status report of 9/26/05 included a motion for an extension of the stay in this case (although the motion should have been separately entered). The court hereby grants a stay until 6/30/06. On or before that date, the parties shall file a joint status report addressing with specificity how the case should proceed. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 209 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005
                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT AND MOTION TO CONTINUE STAY by all parties. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005
                                                                          ORDER STAYING CASE: this case is stayed through 30 days after the date the Federal Circuit issues a decision in Indiana Michigan; the parties shall file a joint status report on 12/15/2005 or within 15 days after the decision in Indiana Michigan, whichever is earlier. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 208 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005
                                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 207 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 206 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Yee-Chieh Chu (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 205 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER STAYING CASE. This case is hereby stayed; the status conference set for February 1, 2005, is canceled. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before 7/15/2005 (or within 30 days of a decision by the Federal Circuit in Indiana Michigan, CFC #98-486C). Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2005 (dls, ).
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 204 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/26/2005
                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 203 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/1/2005 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (Attachment re draft pre-trial order: # (1)) (jsb)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 202 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER denying [81] Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Rate of Nuclear Fuel Acceptance, denying [156] Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Acceptance Rate, denying [132] Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability, and denying [135] Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 201 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [173] Defendant's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Filings Concerning the Rate of Acceptance of Spent Nuclear Fuel. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 200 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004
                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [173] MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's filings in opposition to Defendant's motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent fuel acceptance filed by USA. (Miller, Richard)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 199 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004
                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [156] Cross Motion For Partial Summary Judgment On The Acceptance Rate And Response To Defendant's Supplemental Brief filed by POWER AUTHORITY. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004
                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's document due by 5/24/2004. Pursuant to the 5/21/04 order. (dw1)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [197] Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Cross-Motion [156] for Partial Summary Judgment on the Acceptance Rate and Response to [196] Defendant's Supplemental Brief. Plaintiff's attention is directed to the Court's Order of 5/14/04, advising that, "pursuant to electronic case filing protocol, a motion for leave to file must be granted PRIOR to the filing of the document for which leave to file is sought." Accordingly, Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file separately, on or before 5/24/04, the document included in the instant motion as attachment A. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 198 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004
                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [173] MOTION to Strike PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FILINGS CONCERNING THE RATE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SPENT NUCLEAR FUEL filed by POWER AUTHORITY. Reply due by 6/3/2004. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 197 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004, Terminated: 5/21/2004 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit
                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Acceptance Rate and Response to Defendant's Supplemental Brief by 20 pages by POWER AUTHORITY. Response due by 6/7/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Reply in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on Acceptance Rate and Response to Defendant's Supplemental Brief))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004
                                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief due by 6/4/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004
                                                                                                        ORDER granting [195] Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief to Defendant's Motion [81] for Summary Judgment on Rate of Acceptance. Defendant is hereby notified for future reference that, pursuant to electronic case filing protocol, a motion for leave to file must be granted PRIOR to the filing of the document for which leave to file is sought. The Clerk's Office is directed, however, to accept [196] Defendant's Supplemental Brief as filed on May 10, 2004. Should Plaintiff desire to file a Supplemental Brief in response, leave is hereby granted and Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief shall be filed on or before June 4, 2004.Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 196 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004, Terminated: 5/14/2004 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment - supplemental brief to motion for summary judgment on rate of acceptance by USA. Response due by 6/10/2004 (Miller, Richard)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 195 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004, Terminated: 5/14/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File supplemental brief to summary judgment motion on rate of acceptance by USA. Response due by 5/27/2004 (Miller, Richard)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004
                                                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant Reply Brief re: Response to Motion to Strike due by 6/3/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 194 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER staying action until further notice on [132] Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on liability and on [135] Defendant's Cross Motion thereto. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 193 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: 1) Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's response to cross-motion for partial summary judgment on rate of acceptance due by 5/20/2004; 2) Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's motion to strike portions of Plaintiff's filings on rate of acceptance also due by 5/20/2004; 3) Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's response to motion to strike due by 6/03/2004. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 192 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER staying action until further notice re [73] Motion for Summary Judgment (Partial) filed by USA regarding Plaintiff's Greater Than Class C Radioactive Waste Arguments. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (sms)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 191 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER staying action until further notice re [72] Motion to Dismiss Count III ("Taking Without Just Compensation") filed by USA. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (sms)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 190 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 189 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT , filed by POWER AUTHORITY.(lld, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 188 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER denying motion for leave to lift the stay as moot and granting [187] Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lld, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 187 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004, Terminated: 2/19/2004 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave Lift the Stay and to File First Amended Complaint by POWER AUTHORITY (filed by leave of Judge).Service: 01/30/2004. Response due by 3/8/2004 (lld, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 186 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO LIFT THE STAY AND FILE ITS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by USA (filed by leave of Judge as Plaintiff's Motion has not yet been filed). Service: 02/17/2004.(lld, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004
                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES [179] Dft's Second Motion to Renew its Motion toConsolidate as well as its previous motions relating to consolidation. The Court further LIFTS THE STAY of the remainder of the cases to which the Order of 4/16/2003, applied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket this Order in this case with an entry noting the same on the dockets of the remaining SNFcases captioned in Dft's instant motion, with a courtesy copy to all SNF parties and presiding SNF judges of the Court. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 185 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Counsel for Dft's Facsimile Number by USA. Service: 12/1/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 184 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Directly Related Case [03-2627C] by POWER AUTHORITY. Service: 11/5/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 183 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that all filings in this case relating to issues of consolidation shall be captioned solely in the name of this case and shall show the name of the presiding judge in this case. A courtesy copy of any such filing relating to issued of consolidation shall also be provided to the Clerk's Office for tranmission to the Chief Judge in his capacity as Chief Judge of the Court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 182 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Pltfs' Responses to [179] Dft's Second MOTION to the Chief Judge to Renew Consideration of Dft's Motion to Consolidate filed by USA. Service: 9/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 181 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER: On August 26, 2003, Dft filed a motion, directed to the Chief Judge, for an extension of time, to and including September 3, 2003, to reply to the responses of certain SNF Pltfs to Dft's second motion to renew its motion to consolidate. Dft's motion for enlargement, as well as its second motion to renew its motion to consolidate, is captioned in the name and case number of all 21 of the SNF cases presently before the CFC. The Court hereby GRANTS Dft's Motion for Enlargement to the limited extent that enlargment is requested for Dft's reply to the response of the above-captioned Pltf, Power Authority of the State of New York, and ORDERS that Dft's reply shall be filed on or before September 3, 2003. Reply due by 9/3/2003. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to the Chief Judge for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C]Service: 8/26/03. Response due by 9/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION to [179] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate filed by POWER AUTHORITY. [Original document located in Case No. 98-483C] Reply due by 8/29/2003. Service: 8/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 180 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: 8/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Counsel for the parties in this action previously have been informed by the Clerk that, on September 8, 2003, this case will be converted to electronic case filing. After that date, except in the highly limited circumstances authorized by General Order 2003-42, the Court will not accept the hard-copy filing of any document in this matter. Accordingly, if counsel has not done so already, he or she shall act forthwith to be registered and trained in preparation for the September 8, 2003, deadline. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/15/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                      Dft's Motion to the Chief Judge for Leave to Correct Certificate of Service and to Waive Requirements of RCFC 5.3 Regarding "Dft's Second Motion [to the Chief Judge] to Renew its Motion to Consolidate." (Original Motion located in Case No. 98-126C) (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 179 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                        SECOND MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate by USA. [COPY] (Original Document in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 7/29/03 by hand. Response due by 8/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 178 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 177 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response re: [135] Cross Motion for summary judgment upon liability filed by The United States. Service: 4/16/03.(hw1, ) Modified on 3/31/2004 to correct docket entry relationship from 156 to 135 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 176 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re [156] Cross Motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance (together with a separate appendix) filed by The United States. Reply due by 4/25/2003. Service: 4/11/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 175 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [171] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 172 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by The United States. Service: 4/11/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 174 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [170] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to the cross-motion for summary judgment on liability. Reply due 4/16/2003. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 173 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/18/2003, Terminated: 9/30/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike portions of plaintiff's filings concerning the rate of acceptance of spent Nuclear fuel by The United States.Service: 4/11/03 by hand. Response due by 4/25/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 171 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003, Terminated: 4/15/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Reply Brief by 30 pages by The United States.Service by hand: 4/11/03. Response due by 4/25/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 170 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003, Terminated: 4/14/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [135] Cross Motion, (until April 16, 2003), by The United States.Service: 4/11/03. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 169 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: further proceedings. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 168 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by The United States.Service: 3/10/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 167 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion, re [73] Motion for Summary Judgment, re: Greater Than Class C Radioactive Waste Arguments filed by The United States.Service: 3/10/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 166 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [164] Motion for Leave exceed the page limitation for the reply to the motion for partial summary judgment, re: Greater Than Class C radioactive waste arguments. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 165 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 164 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003, Terminated: 3/19/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 3/10/03) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 3/27/03. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 163 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: See order [612-1] dated 3/7/03, in case 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 162 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [161-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to the cross-motion for summary judgment Response to [135-1] cross motion due 4/11/03 (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 161 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003, Terminated: 3/6/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 3/4/03) to Extend Time to file reply to the cross-motion for summary judgment until 4/11/03. Response due: 3/21/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 160 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by POWER AUTHORITY (Service: 2/20/03) to [72-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of complaint. Reply due: 3/10/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 159 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                Response by POWER AUTHORITY to [74-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 2/20/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 158 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact regarding Plaintiff's Greater Than Class C Radioactive Waste Arguments by POWER AUTHORITY. Service: 2/20/03 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 157 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [72-1] motion to Dismiss Counts III of complaint. Service: 2/27/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 156 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                      CROSS MOTION by POWER AUTHORITY ( Service: 2/20/03 ) and RESPONSE to [81-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment by USA, (together with separate appendix). Response due: 3/24/03. (HW) Modified on 03/04/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 155 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [149-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation ( signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 154 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response by POWER AUTHORITY to [80-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 2/20/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 153 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by POWER AUTHORITY. Service: 2/20/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; Response to [156-1] cross motion reset to 3/24/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 152 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 151 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 150 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by POWER AUTHORITY (Service: 2/20/03) to [135-1] cross motion, pursuant to order filed 1/23/03. Reply due: 3/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 149 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003, Terminated: 2/27/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by POWER AUTHORITY (Service: 2/20/03) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 3/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 148 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response by POWER AUTHORITY to proposed additional facts. Service: 2/20/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 147 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE, with appendix, by POWER AUTHORITY (Service: 2/20/03) to [73-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. Reply due: 3/10/03. (LTD) Modified on 02/26/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 146 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 145 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 144 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 143 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [137-1] motion for Leave to file under seal the response to the motion for summary judgment and cross-motion (signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 142 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA to [138-1] motion reply (request for status conference) by POWER AUTHORITY. Service: 1/15/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 141 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER - see 98-126 C for order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 140 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Plaintiff's Response to [135-1] cross motion due 2/20/03 (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 138 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by POWER AUTHORITY to response to [132-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 1/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 139 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 137 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003, Terminated: 1/24/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 12/20/02) for Leave to file under seal the response to the motion for summary judgment and cross-motion . Response due: 1/6/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 136 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FaCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response by USA to [131-1] proposed findings by POWER AUTHORITY, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/16/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 135 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CROSS MOTION for summary judgment on liability by USA ( Service: 12/16/02 ) and RESPONSE to [132-1] Pltf's motion for Summary Judgment by USA, (together with a separate appendix) filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/16/03. FILED UNDER SEAL. (HW) Modified on 02/24/2003 Modified on 4/29/2004 to clarify docket text (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; Response to [135-1] cross motion reset to 1/16/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 134 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [133-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the motion for summary judgment Response to [132-1] motion for Summary Judgment due 12/16/02 , and Reply to Response to Motion due 1/10/03 for [132-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent fuel acceptance (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 4/29/2004 to correct docket entry relationships for the reply (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 133 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002, Terminated: 12/12/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 12/9/02) to Extend Time to respond to the motion for summary judgment until 12/16/02. Response due: 12/26/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 132 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: 11/13/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by POWER AUTHORITY (Service: 11/8/02) for Summary Judgment on liability. Response due: 12/9/02. (LTD) Modified on 02/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 131 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: 11/13/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by POWER AUTHORITY. Service: 11/8/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 130 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER mooting [127-1] motion requesting an order setting November 25, 2002, as the deadline for plaintiffs to respond to motion for summary judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Filing deadline to 11/8/02 (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 129 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of November 1, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Status Conference held (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 128 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 10/31/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER scheduling a telephonic Status Conference for 11:30 a.m., 11/1/02 discussing defendant's motion filed 10/24/02 ( signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 127 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/26/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 10/24/02 ) requesting an order setting November 25, 2002, as the deadline for plaintiffs to respond to motion for summary judgment . Response due: 11/12/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 126 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 125 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 124 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 123 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 122 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 121 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 120 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 119 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 118 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 117 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: see order [467-1] dated 7/29/02, in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 116 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 115 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 114 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 113 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 112 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 111 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 110 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 109 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 108 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C.(signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 107 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, Re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 106 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/6/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 105 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/03/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 104 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 103 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 102 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: See [395-1] order in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 97 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 95 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 94 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: see order [344-2] dated 4/11/02 in Case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: see order in 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 91 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying motion to preclude or, in the alternative, defer, depositions pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 90 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories until 3/8/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See Case No. 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying motion to reconsider filed 1/22/02 and granting the motion to revise dates in 9/26/01 order filed 1/24/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. See order in 98-126C filed 2/1/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 2/12/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 1/11/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 01/03/02 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: 12/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying as moot [78-1] motion to Extend Time to file a response to the Motion for partial Summary Judgement (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001, Terminated: 9/30/2004 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION, with one volume of Appendix, by USA (Service: 11/28/01) for partial Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 12/31/01. (LTD) Modified on 02/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 80 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/28/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [75-1] motion to waive paragraph 6(b) of teh Court's Standard Special Procedures Order, dated December 11, 2000 and directing the Clerk's Office to file Defendant's motion for partial summary judgment (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001, Terminated: 12/26/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by POWER AUTHORITY (Service: 12/21/01) to Extend Time to file a response to the Motion for partial Summary Judgement until 1/25/02. Response due: 1/7/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by POWER AUTHORITY (Service: 12/19/01) for a status conference . Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/7/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference by 11:30 a.m., 12/21/01 ; ( signed by Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001, Terminated: 12/21/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 11/28/01) to waive paragraph 6(b) of teh Court's Standard Special Procedures Order, dated December 11, 2000 , for Leave to file three motions for partial disposition of the issues in this case , For leave to exceed the page limitation with regard to one of its partial motions for summary judgment , (by 10 pages). Response due: 12/17/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 11/27/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION, with one volume of Appendix, by USA (Service by hand: 11/27/01) for partial Summary Judgment regarding plainitff's greater than Class C Radioactive Waste Arguments. Response due: 12/26/01. (LTD) Modified on 02/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/27/01) to Dismiss Counts III of complaint . Response due: 12/11/01. (LTD) Modified on 11/29/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/20/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER see order 98-126C filed 11/16/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER See 98-126 C ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to respond to motion to compel production of documents to 11/06/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: Public Service Electric and Gas motion to extend time filed on 11/2/01, withihn which to respond to the defendant's motion to compel is GRANTED (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein) Copy to parties. (see motion filed in 98-126C) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to complete production of documents to 11/19/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [46-1] motion for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order. Individual Judges retain the right to decide dispositive motions. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: proposed stipulated order, etc. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [48-1] motion for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. and granting Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file copies of response to the transfer motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 10/26/2001, Entered: 10/29/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [45-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [44-1] motion to stay consideration of the issue of plaintiff's standing until completion of coordinated discovery. (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of supplemental certificate of service by USA. Service: 10/19/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 10/19/01) to Compel . Response due: 11/5/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Service: 10/19/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: All filings shall bear the name of the discovery Judge, all matters to be brought to the attention of the Court shall be filed with the discovery Judge only, the Clerk of the Court is directed not to accept for filing any motion by a party in one of the captioned cases for leave to file material with a Judge in an individual case signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 10/16/01) to Compel . Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/2/01. (Filed with response to third party objections. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/16/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file Defendant's response and Defendant's corrected certificate of service due 10/25/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: Defendant's motion to extend time filed on 10/15/01, within which to file the proposed stipulated order concerning the scheduling and conduct of depositions in the coordinated discovery proceeding, is GRANTED, see motion in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [49-1] motion for Leave to file Motion for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/16/2001, Terminated: 10/12/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by POWER AUTHORITY (Service: 10/10/01) for Leave to file Motion for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order . Response due: 10/29/01. FIled by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001, Terminated: 10/29/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 10/10/01) for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. Response due: 10/29/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/11/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/10/01) to [45-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories. Reply due: 10/24/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001, Terminated: 11/1/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by POWER AUTHORITY (Service by hand: 10/9/01) for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order . Response due: 10/23/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001, Terminated: 10/26/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by POWER AUTHORITY (Service: 10/9/01) to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories until 10/29/01. Response due: 10/26/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/26/2001, Terminated: 10/23/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 10/1/01) to stay consideration of the issue of plaintiff's standing until completion of coordinated discovery filed [by leave of the judge]. Response due: 10/18/01 (Contained in same document as reply to response to defendant's show cause filing) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001, Terminated: 10/23/2001 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (REPLY) by USA to [39-1] response by POWER AUTHORITY. Service: 10/1/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [42-1] motion to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages Plan is due by 10/22/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001, Terminated: 10/3/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 10/1/01) to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages until 10/22/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 4/14/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Alan Miller for The United States. Service: 9/26/01.(dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: The Joint Motion for an Order for Consolidated Discovery filed on 7/10/01, is granted, with the exception of document production, the parties are granted an enlargement of time until 10/1/01, to submit a plan addressing the production of e-mail messages (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by POWER AUTHORITY to [36-1] response by USA Service: 9/21/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Status Conference for 4:00 p.m. on 9/20/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: The Court has received the Defendant's response to the Court's 8/2/01, order, filed 9/4/01, the plaintiff is ordered to file a response in accordance with RCFC 83.2(a) and the defendant shall file a reply in accordance with RCFC 83.2(b) (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA to [33-2] order. Service: 9/4/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting motion for protective order in the form provided by Exhibit A of the parties 08/10/01 motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). See case number 98-126 C for motion. Protective order in 98-458 C is also granted, subject to reconsideration by assigned judge. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 9/11/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein, Discovery Judge) Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: 8/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Defendant shall file a motion to show cause by 9/4/01 (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 7/31/01 (JPSR due 9/17/01). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [27-1] motion for Leave to file in this case a copy of filings made before Judge Wiese as managing Judge Answer to the complaint is due on 7/31/01 (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: The suspension entered in this case on January 17, 2001 is lifted and Judge Diane G. Weinstein is hereby designated to preside over the discovery phase of the proceedings (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATED ORDER re: governing review of the Dept. of Energy's electronic "Record Information System" database ( signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER for Protective Order (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001, Terminated: 7/19/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by POWER AUTHORITY (Service : 7/13/01 ) for Leave to file in this case a copy of filings made before Judge Wiese as managing Judge . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Copy of Yankee Atomic's Motion for Leave to file documents relevant to the telephone conference with Judge Wiese. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER resetting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 6/14/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER scheduling Status Conference for 10:30 a.m., 6/14/01 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: On 1/8/2001, Dft filed a [9-1] Motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961. The Chief Judge hereby designates Judge Wiese as the managing judge in the above cited cases for the purpose of meeting with the parties to consider whether consolidation or other joint handling of discovery or other pre-trial matters is appropriate. Judge Wiese is requested to formulate a management plan, if one is appropriate, and is authorized to make appropriate rulings with respect to this purpose. (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Judge Wiese is designated as managing judge. Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 3/17/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [9-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961. Service: 2/16/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [17-1] motion for Leave to file in this case a copy of reply to motion to reassign cases involving alleged breaches, etc. ( signed by Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by "Yankee Utilities" (Service by hand: 1/29/01) to [9-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961, filed with a (1) one volume appendix. Reply due: 2/12/01. (FE) Modified on 02/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001, Terminated: 2/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [19-1] motion for Leave to file in this case a copy of "Yankee Utilities" opposition to the motion to reassign (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 02/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by POWER AUTHORITY (Service: 2/20/01) for Leave to file in this case a copy of "Yankee Utilities" opposition to the motion to reassign . Response due: 2/20/01. (FE) Modified on 02/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001, Terminated: 2/21/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 2/20/01 ) for Leave to file in this case a copy of reply to motion to reassign cases involving alleged breaches, etc. Response due: 3/9/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by POWER AUTHORITY (Service: 1/29/01 ) to [9-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961. Reply due: 2/12/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [14-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of the "Plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge the fourteen pending standard contract cases" ( signed by Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001, Terminated: 1/31/2001 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by POWER AUTHORITY (Service: 1/30/01) for Leave to file a copy of the "Plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge the fourteen pending standard contract cases" . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                See 30-1 Response to motion filed January 29, 2001, in 98-483C Florida Power & Light Company. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by POWER AUTHORITY (Service by hand: 1/22/01) to Extend Time to respond to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign cases to a single Judge , (until January 29, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Stay (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001, Terminated: 1/17/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 1/12/01 ) to Stay , pending resolution of motion to reassign to a single Judge, etc. Response due: 1/29/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/01) to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961 . Response due: 1/26/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961 (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001, Terminated: 1/9/2001 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/01) for Leave to file a copy of the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961 . Response due: 1/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/18/2000 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of change of address by Alexander D. Tomaszczuk. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: 12/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: Standard Special Procedures [revised October 19, 2000] (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/7/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. . Service: 12/5/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by POWER AUTHORITY of related cases: (99-447 C, 98-621 C, 98-154 C, 98-485 C, 98-483 C, 00-440 C, 98-486 C, 98-474 C, 98-488 C, 98-614 C, 98-126 C, 98-484 C). (FE) Modified on 11/20/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of assignment to Judge Edward J. Damich. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #050804. Answer due on 1/19/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 164 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?