PATRIARCH, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00709-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Patriarch, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE MARTIN LAW FIRM, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Allen Martin +1 703 918 0350 +1 703 918 0386 Ken@martin-lawfirm.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/22/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 12/28/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: 1/2/2001 Notice of Appearance/
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gregory Thomas Jaeger. Service: 12/28/00. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 18 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: 1/2/2001 Transcript
    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of November 28, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000
      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Court Filing
        UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting [9-1] cross motion, denying [7-1] motion for Summary Judgment and directing the clerk to enter judgment accordingly. No costs. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ). Copy to parties. (LD)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000
          Case closed (LD)
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 12/27/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Transcript
            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: hearing (one volume), taken at Washington, DC, on December 21, 2000. Notice to parties. (DS)
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Memorandum
              Defendant's CORRECTED Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Service by hand: 12/19/00 (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [11-1] motion for Leave to file corrected brief. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Evidentiary Hearing
                  Evidentiary Hearing held ( Transcript due 1/22/01 ) (DS)
                    LREF
                    Blank 12 Filed: 12/20/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Terminated:
                    RESPONSE by PATRIARCH, INC. (Service by fax: 12/20/00; Service by hand: 12/21/00) to [9-1] cross motion. (DS)
                      LREF
                      Blank 11 Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000, Terminated: 12/21/2000 Terminated:
                      MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 12/19/00 ) for Leave to file corrected brief . (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 10 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Statement of Facts
                        COUNTER-STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service by fax: 12/18/00; Service by hand: 12/19/00 (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Terminated:
                          CROSS MOTION by USA (Service by fax: 12/18/00; Service by hand: 12/19/00) and RESPONSE to [7-1] motion for Summary Judgment by PATRIARCH, INC. Response due: 12/20/00 (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 8 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Statement of Facts
                            STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by PATRIARCH, INC. [by leave of the judge]. Service by fax: 12/8/00; Service by hand: 12/11/00 (DS)
                              LREF
                              Blank 7 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Terminated:
                              MOTION by PATRIARCH, INC. (Service by fax: 12/8/00; Service by hand: 12/11/00) for Summary Judgment filed [by leave of the judge]. Response due: 12/18/00 (DS)
                                LREF
                                Blank 6 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: 12/12/2000 Administrative RecordCourt Filing
                                Administrative record filed by PATRIARCH, INC., by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/6/00. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 5 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: 12/12/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                  NOTICE of filing administrative record by PATRIARCH, INC., by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/6/00. FILED UNDER SEAL (FE) Modified on 12/12/2000
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 4 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 12/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's motion for protective order. Set administrative record filing deadline to 12/6/00 ; set Plaintiff's dispositive motion filing deadline to 12/8/00 ; set Defendant's response due 12/18/00; set Plaintiff's reply due 12/20/00 ; and set oral argument for 10:00 a.m., 12/21/00. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Status Conference
                                      Status Conference held ( Transcript due 12/28/00 ) (DS)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Status Conference
                                        Status Conference set at 2:00 p.m. on 11/28/00 (DS)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 11/22/2000, Entered: 11/22/2000, Terminated: 11/29/2000 Motion for Protective Order
                                          MOTION by PATRIARCH, INC. (Service: 11/22/00) for Protective Order Response due: 12/11/00. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 11/22/2000, Entered: 11/22/2000 Court Filing
                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 11/22/2000, Entered: 11/22/2000
                                              COMPLAINT filed UNDER SEAL, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #050830. Answer due on 1/21/01. (FE) Modified on 11/22/2000
                                                LREF

                                                Space Space

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 120 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?