ROBERTS, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00757-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROB W. ROBERTS, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brent M. McBurney +1 202 307 0277 brent.mcburney@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/15/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 2/8/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 33 Filed: 6/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 CAFC Mandate Dismissing
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated June 6, 2002 dismissed [31-1] appeal by USA. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank 32 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 Notice of Change of Address
    NOTICE of change of address by ROB W. ROBERTS (HW)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002 CAFC Case Number
      CAFC Case Number Re: [31-1] appeal by USA CAFC NUMBER: 02-5105 (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 31 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: 4/10/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
        NOTICE OF APPEAL by USA. Copy to ROB W. ROBERTS, Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., and to CAFC. Fee not required. (HW) Modified on 04/10/2002
          LREF
          Blank 30 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002 Notice of Change of Address
          NOTICE of change of address by ROB W. ROBERTS. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 29 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: 2/11/2002
            CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated February 8, 2002, forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 28 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002
              JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $5,635.08. No costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                LREF
                Blank 27 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 Court Filing
                UNPUBLISHED DECISION directing the clerk to enter judgmennt for plaintiff in the amount of $5,635.08. No costs. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (LD)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002
                  Case closed (LD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 26 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001 Transcript
                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume (28 pages), at Washington, D.C., for date of October 4, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 25 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: 9/20/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                      RESPONSE by ROB W. ROBERTS to [23-1] response by USA. Service: 9/10/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 24 Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER re: Counsel for defendant and plaintiff should agree upon a time within the next two weeks to discuss the issue of Mr. Robert's decision to voluntarily have pay and allowances sent to his family (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 23 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001 Terminated:
                          REPLY by USA to [22-2] order. Service: 8/27/01. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 22 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER Defendant's response to back pay argument is due by 8/27/01 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 21 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 7/31/2001 Terminated:
                              ANSWER by ROB W. ROBERTS to [20-2] order. Service: 7/27/01. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 20 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER Plaintiff must demonstrate that he raised the ex post facto claim before the military tribunals, or show good cause for failing to raise the issue; and plaintiff should respond by 8/3/01 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 19 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: 5/21/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                  REPLY by USA to response to [13-1] motion to Dismiss and [13-2] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 5/18/01. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 18 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: 5/8/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                    STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by ROB W. ROBERTS. Service: 5/2/01. (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 17 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: 5/8/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by ROB W. ROBERTS. Service: 5/2/01. (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 16 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: 5/8/2001 Terminated:
                                        RESPONSE by ROB W. ROBERTS (Service: 5/2/01) to [13-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 5/16/01. (LTD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 15 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/19/2001 Administrative Record
                                          Administrative record filed by USA. Service: 4/18/01. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 14 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [11-1] motion for Leave to file the administrative records and granting [11-2] motion for Waiver of Duplication (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 13 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 4/16/01) to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment . Response due: 5/17/01. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 12 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 4/16/01. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001, Terminated: 4/18/2001 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 4/16/01) for Leave to file the administrative records and for Waiver of Duplication . Response due: 5/3/01. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/22/2001 Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint Answer deadline to 4/16/01 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Status Report
                                                      STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 3/20/01. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 3/15/2001, Entered: 3/15/2001 Court Filing
                                                        ORDER re: Defendant's motion cannot be addressed because it does not represent that plaintiff has consented, if DOJ cannot reach plaintiff through it's own Bureau of Prisons or otherwise, it should seek assistance from the Court ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: 3/13/2001, Terminated: 3/22/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 3/13/01) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint , (until April 16, 2001). Response: 3/30/01. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001 Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint Answer deadline to 3/16/01 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001, Terminated: 1/25/2001 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 1/24/01) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint , (until March 16, 2001). Response due: 2/12/01. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                NOTICE of change of address by ROB W. ROBERTS. (HW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Brent McBurney. Service: 1/2/01. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Court Filing
                                                                    Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000
                                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #050936. Answer due on 2/13/01. (FE)
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 128 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?