ONTARIO POWER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00761-FMA
District Judge Francis M. Allegra, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
No Logo HIGHLANDS COAL SALES COMPANY, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenebaum, Doll & McDonald, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark F. Sommer +1 502 587 3570 mfs@gdm.com
No Logo Mingo Logan Coal Company, Third Party Defendant
Officially listed as "MINGO LOGAN COAL CO."

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Allen Kleban +1 314 259 2000 kkleban@bryancave.com
Office COFC
Filed 12/15/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '03-5161'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (154) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 180 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: the Clerk is hereby directed to enter judgment in this case in favor of defendant. No costs. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
    LREF
    Blank 178 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/29/2012 at 2:00 PM (EDT)before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
      LREF
      Blank 176 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER: On or before June 22, 2012, the parties may file a stipulation of dismissal that preserves plaintiffs right to appeal. Stipulation of dismissal due by 6/22/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
        LREF
        Blank 175 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 171 First MOTION for Summary Judgment: Telephonic Oral Argument set for 6/6/2012 at 2:00 PM (EDT) before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
          LREF
          Legal Document 143 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008
          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stoddart, Robert)
            LREF
            Legal Document 142 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008
            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stoddart, Robert)
              LREF
              Legal Document 141 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008
              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stoddart, Robert)
                LREF
                Legal Document 140 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008
                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stoddart, Robert)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 139 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stoddart, Robert)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 138 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007
                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stoddart, Robert)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 137 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007
                      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stoddart, Robert)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 136 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stoddart, Robert)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 135 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007
                          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stoddart, Robert)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 134 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007
                            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stoddart, Robert)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 133 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006
                              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stoddart, Robert)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 132 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006
                                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stoddart, Robert)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 131 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Court Filing
                                  STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 9/15/2006, and every 63 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, ) Modified on 9/3/2008 (dls).
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 130 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006
                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stoddart, Robert)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 129 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006
                                      NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 128 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006 Court Filing
                                        ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (mb2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 127 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                          STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 7/14/2006. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 126 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/18/2006 Joint Status Report
                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. Service: 4/14/2006.(mb2, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 125 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Joint Status Report
                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. Service: 1/12/2006.(mb2, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 124 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER: Setting the New Caption. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (mb2, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 123 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Order on Motion to Dismiss - Rule 41(a)Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [120] Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss - Rule 41(a) RIVERTON COAL SALES, INC. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (mb2, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 122 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Order on Motion to Dismiss - Rule 41(a)Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [121] Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss - Rule 41(a) ASHLAND COAL, INC., ARCH COAL SALES, INC. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (mb2, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 121 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005, Terminated: 11/21/2005 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(a), filed by ASHLAND COAL, INC., ARCH COAL SALES, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 11/4/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 11/21/2005.(mb2, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 120 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005, Terminated: 11/21/2005 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(a) , filed by RIVERTON COAL SALES, INC. Service: 10/31/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 12/1/2005.(mb2, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 119 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005
                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven Harlan Becker. Service: 10/18/2005.(hw1, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 118 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motion(s) due by 11/10/2005. Joint Status Report due by 1/13/2006. Additional Joint Status Report due by 4/14/2006. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (mb2, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 117 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER: Regarding the Dismissal of Ontario Power Generation, Inc. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (mb2, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 116 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE RESCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference reset for 10/7/2005 at 10:00 AM before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (mb2, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 115 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/22/2005 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference re-set for 9/28/2005 at 2:00 PM before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (mb2, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 114 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/28/2005 02:00 PM before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Francis M. Allegra. (mb2, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 113 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Joint Status Report
                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. Service: 7/11/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 112 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [111] Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss - Rule 41(a) Alliance Coal LLC's third-party complaint, with each party to bear its own costs, attorney's fees and expenses, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (lld, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 111 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005, Terminated: 6/13/2005 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(a) filed by ALLIANCE COAL LLC.Service: 5/31/05. Dispositive Motion Response due by 7/1/2005. (dw1)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 110 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Joint Status Report
                                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 4/11/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/11/2005 (mb2, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 109 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by all defendants. Filed by leave of the Judge. Status Report due by 4/18/2005 Service: 01/10/05.(mb2, ) Modified on 1/19/2005 (mb2, ).
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 108 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004 Joint Status Report
                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 10/12/04.(dw1)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 1/12/2005 (every 90 days). (dw1)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 107 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004 Joint Status Report
                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 7/12/04.(dw1)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 106 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004 CAFC Mandate Affirming
                                                                                        MANDATE of CAFC affirming [97] Order that directed the Clerk of the Court to dismiss the case. (hw1, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/12/2004. [Every 90 days] (dw1)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 105 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Status Report
                                                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. (every 90 days) Service: 4/12/04.(jat, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: . Joint Status Report due by 7/12/2004 (jat, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 104 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 1/12/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 103 Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by ALLIANCE COAL LLC, ARCH COAL SALES, INC., ASHLAND COAL, INC., MINGO LOGAN COAL CO., USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 10/14/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 102 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 10/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                    CAFC Case Number 03-5161 for [101] Notice of Appeal filed by ONTARIO POWER GENERATION, INC. (hw1, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 101 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: 8/26/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL by ONTARIO POWER GENERATION, INC. Filing fee $ 105, receipt number 058508. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 100 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                        Consented MOTION to Change Attorney of Record, Kenneth A. Kleban in place of Anthony S. Gasaway by ARCH COAL SALES, INC., ASHLAND COAL, INC., MINGO LOGAN COAL CO. Service: 8/14/03. (jcp, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 1/14/2004 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                          ***Attorney Kenneth Allen Kleban for MINGO LOGAN COAL CO.; ARCH COAL SALES, INC. and ASHLAND COAL, INC. added. Attorney Anthony S. Gasaway terminated. (dls)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 99 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003
                                                                                                            JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 54(b), that plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. (lld, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 98 Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 Unpublished Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              UNPUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION on [90] MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by ONTARIO POWER GENERATION, INC.. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment as there is no just reason for delay. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (lld, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 97 Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER directing the clerk to dismiss Seascape's third-party complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (lld, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 96 Filed: 7/31/2003, Entered: 8/1/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                  UNOPPOSED MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss Third-Party Complaint Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) and 41(c) Without Prejudice by SEASCAPE COAL SALES, INC. Service: 7/31/03. Response due by 9/2/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 95 Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: 7/18/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                    REPLY to Opposition to Motion re: [90] Pltf's MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by ONTARIO POWER GENERATION, INC. Service: 7/16/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 94 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by ALLIANCE COAL LLC, ARCH COAL SALES, INC., ASHLAND COAL, INC., MINGO LOGAN COAL CO., UNITED STATES, and every 90 days. Service: 7/14/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/14/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE/OPPOSITION to [90] Pltf's Untimely MOTION for Rule 54(b) Certification filed by ALLIANCE COAL LLC. Reply due by 7/25/2003. Service: 7/11/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [90] Pltf's MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by ARCH COAL SALES, INC., ASHLAND COAL, INC., MINGO LOGAN COAL CO. Reply due by 7/28/2003. Service: 7/10/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 91 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [90] Plaintiff's MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by UNITED STATES. Reply due by 7/10/2003. Service: 6/25/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 90 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by ONTARIO POWER GENERATION, INC..Service: 6/24/03. Response due by 7/25/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by The United States. Service: 4/15/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT ORDER. Defendant and third-party Defendant's Status report due 4/15/03, and every 90 days thereafter. (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copyto parties. (LTD) Modified on 7/17/2003 (dls, ).
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 1/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER of Judge Francis M. Allegra. Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          PUBLISHED DECISION granting [50-2] motion to Dismiss and directing the clerk to dismiss plaintiff's complaint. On or before January 10, 2003, defendant and the third-party defendants shall file a joint status report with the court indicating how, if at all, they intend to proceed with respect to the third-party actions associated with the case. ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ). Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002
                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of September 12, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: 8/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: oral argument on 9/12/02 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER Riverton Coal Sales memorandum due 9/10/02 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 9/12/02 for [64-1] motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and for [64-2] motion for dismissal (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra) Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 80 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: 5/31/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by MINGO LOGAN COAL CO., ASHLAND COAL, INC., ARCH COAL SALES, INC, ALLIANCE COAL LLC to response to [64-1] motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, [64-2] motion for dismissal. Service: 5/28/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: 5/31/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [78-1] motion for Leave to file a reply to opposition to motion for judgment on the pleadings and for dismissal (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/30/2002, Terminated: 5/30/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by MINGO LOGAN COAL CO., ASHLAND COAL, INC., ARCH COAL SALES, INC and ALLIANCE COAL LLC (Service: 5/28/02) for Leave to file a reply to opposition to motion for judgment on the pleadings and for dismissal . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 5/21/02) for Leave to give notice of recent authority , (recent authority included in motion). Response due: 6/7/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Third-party Defendant's Brief due 5/31/02 with a motion to file out of time (signed by Acting Chief Judge Nancy B. Firestone for Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of reassignment to Judge Francis M. Allegra . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER transferring case within the Court. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [72-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file reply to plaintiff's response to motion for judgment on the pleadings and for dismissal (plaintiff's Opposition) Reply to Response to Motion reset to 5/17/02 for [64-1] motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, reset to 5/17/02 for [64-2] motion for dismissal ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002, Terminated: 4/26/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by SEASCAPE COAL SALES, RIVERTON COAL SALES, MINGO LOGAN COAL CO., ASHLAND COAL, INC., ARCH COAL SALES, INC, ALLIANCE COAL LLC (Service : 4/25/02 ) to Extend Time within which to file reply to plaintiff's response to motion for judgment on the pleadings and for dismissal (plaintiff's Opposition) , (until May 17, 2002), filed by leave of the Judge. (HW) Modified on 04/29/2002
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by ONTARIO POWER (Service: 4/18/02) to [64-1] motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, [64-2] motion for dismissal. Reply due: 5/6/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 4/17/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [69-1] motion to join third-party Defendant's Dispositive Motion, and deeming Seascape Coal Sales, Inc. to be joined to the dispositive motion filed on March 5th by Mingo Loan Coal Company, Ashland Coal, Inc. and Arch Coal Sales, Inc. (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 04/19/2002
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/17/2002, Terminated: 4/17/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by SEASCAPE COAL SALES (Service: 4/16/02) to join third-party Defendant's Dispositive Motion . Response due: 5/3/02. (LTD) Modified on 04/18/2002
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: 4/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [65-1] motion to join in Motion for Judgment on the pleadings and for dismissal, and deeming Alliance Coal LLC to be joined to the dispositive motion filed on March 5th by Mingo Loan Coal Company, Ashland Coal, Inc. and Arch Coal Sales, Inc.. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [66-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to third-party defendant's Motion for Judgment on the pleadings and dismissal Response to [64-1] motion for Judgment on the Pleadings due 4/18/02, [64-2] motion for dismissal due 4/18/02 (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: 3/29/2002, Terminated: 4/3/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by ONTARIO POWER (Service: 3/28/02) to Extend Time to respond to third-party defendant's Motion for Judgment on the pleadings and dismissal . Response due: 4/15/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: 3/29/2002, Terminated: 4/9/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by ALLIANCE COAL LLC (Service: 3/28/02) to join in Motion for Judgment on the pleadings and for dismissal . Response due: 4/15/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by MINGO LOGAN COAL CO., ASHLAND COAL, INC., ARCH COAL SALES, INC (Service: 3/4/02) for Judgment on the Pleadings and for dismissal . Response due: 4/4/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of intent to file motion for judgment on the pleadings by MINGO LOGAN COAL CO., ASHLAND COAL, INC., ARCH COAL SALES, INC. Service: 1/21/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002, Terminated: 8/14/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [50-1] motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and [50-2] motion to Dismiss. Service: 1/18/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [60-1] motion to Extend Time to file a reply to the response to the motion for judgment on the pleadings Reply to Response to Motion reset to 1/18/02 for [50-1] motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002, Terminated: 1/7/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 1/4/02) to Extend Time to file a reply to the response to the motion for judgment on the pleadings , (until January 18, 2002). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of intent to file Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by MINGO LOGAN COAL CO., ASHLAND COAL, INC. and ARCH COAL SALES, INC. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/14/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/18/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by ONTARIO POWER (Service: 12/17/01 ) to [50-1] motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, [50-2] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 1/3/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [55-1] motion to Stay Discovery and granting [55-2] motion to Extend Time to complete discovery and file joint status report (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: 12/11/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [54-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to certain third party defendants' discovery requests Response to third party defendants' discovery requests due 12/21/01 (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001, Terminated: 12/14/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by ONTARIO POWER (Service: 11/30/01) to Stay Discovery (pending resolution of dispositive motions) or, in the alternative, to Extend Time to complete discovery and file joint status report (to April 15, 2002 (discovery) and April 29, 2002 (joint status report). Response due: 12/17/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001, Terminated: 12/10/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by ONTARIO POWER (Service: 11/30/01) to Extend Time to respond to certain third party defendants' discovery requests (to December 21, 2001). (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 11/15/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [51-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the pleadings and Dismissal Response to [50-1] motion for Judgment on the Pleadings reset to 12/17/01, [50-2] motion to Dismiss reset to 12/17/01 (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/15/2001, Terminated: 11/15/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by ONTARIO POWER (Service : 11/14/01 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the pleadings and Dismissal , until December 17, 2001. Response Due by: 12/01/01. (FE) Modified on 11/15/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/20/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by HIGHLANDS COAL SALES (Service : 10/29/01 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney D. B. Kazee for HIGHLANDS COAL SALES Added Mark Francis Sommer , filed by leave of the Judge. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 10/18/01) for Judgment on the Pleadings , and to Dismiss . Response due: 11/19/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by ONTARIO POWER (Service: 10/18/01) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Bernard John Williams for ONTARIO POWER Added Stephen James Marzen . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/17/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER resetting Discovery deadline to 1/14/02 , and setting Joint Status Report is due on 1/28/02 (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: 9/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [46-1] motion to Extend Time within which to answer interrogatories, granting [45-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to request for production of document's Interrogatories deadline to 10/23/01 and Additional Documents due: 10/23/01 for ARCH COAL SALES, INC, for ASHLAND COAL, INC., for MINGO LOGAN COAL CO. (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/6/2001, Terminated: 9/7/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by ASHLAND COAL, INC., ARCH COAL SALES, INC, ALLIANCE COAL LLC (Service: 9/4/01) to Extend Time within which to answer interrogatories , (until October 23, 2001)i, filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 9/21/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/6/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by MINGO LOGAN COAL CO., ASHLAND COAL, INC., ARCH COAL SALES, INC (Service: 9/4/01) to Extend Time to respond to request for production of document's , (until October 23, 2001). Response due: 9/21/01. [by leave of the Judge] (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 9/4/2001 AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            THIRD PARTY ANSWER by ALLIANCE COAL LLC in reference to [37-1] amended complaint by ONTARIO POWER, filed by leave of the Judge. Service 8/30/01 (HW) Modified on 09/04/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [42-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the Court's Notice regarding assertion of possible claims by DTE . Deadline reset to 8/31/01 ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001, Terminated: 8/28/2001 Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by DTE COAL SERVICES (Service: 8/24/01) to Extend Time to respond to the Court's Notice regarding assertion of possible claims by DTE , (until August 31, 2001). Response due: 9/10/01. [filed by leave of the Judge] (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001 Amended Answer to ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by USA : amends [29-1] complaint answer, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/16/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    THIRD PARTY ANSWER by MINGO LOGAN COAL CO. in reference to [37-1] amended complaint by ONTARIO POWER. Service 8/17/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/7/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service by defendant's attorney showing service of Notice, by mail, on Keystone Coal Canada on 7/12/01. Notice to parties. (Answer due 8/24/01) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [35-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the Court's notice regarding assertion of possible claims by DTE DTE Coal Services response to the Court's Notice is due on 8/24/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese for Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by ONTARIO POWER (Answer due 8/17/01) amending [18-1] amended complaint by ONTARIO POWER. Service: 7/31/01. (FE) Modified on 08/16/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            "Consent to the filing of the Second Amended Complaint" by USA. Service: 7/31/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; Answer to second amended complaint deadline to 8/17/01 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001, Terminated: 7/31/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by DTE COAL SERVICES (Service: 7/27/01) to Extend Time to respond to the Court's notice regarding assertion of possible claims by DTE , (until July 24, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: 7/25/2001 Answer to Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER by USA to [27-1] third-party complaint. Service: 7/24/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: 7/25/2001 Answer to Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER by USA to [28-1] third-party complaint. Service: 7/24/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [31-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file its response by 8/17/01 (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by RIVERTON COAL SALES. Service: 7/19/01, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #052082, Answer due 9/17/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001, Terminated: 7/20/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by ALLIANCE COAL LLC (Service : 7/18/01 ) to Extend Time within which to file its response , (until August 17, 2001). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            THIRD PARTY ANSWER by MINGO LOGAN COAL CO., ASHLAND COAL, INC., ARCH COAL SALES, INC in reference to [18-1] amended complaint by ONTARIO POWER. Service 7/17/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER (Attorney ) to amended complaint (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by SEASCAPE COAL SALES (Service: 7/18/01) FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #052071. Answer due 9/17/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Returns of Service by defendant's attorney showing service of Notices, by mail, on Nicholas Clay Company, LLC, NERCO Coal Sales Company, Mapco Coal Sales Co., Inc., Massey Coal Sales Co., Inc., Midwest Energy Resources, Kennecott Energy Company, Fola Coal Company, LLC, Elk Run Coal Co. Inc., Amvest Coal Sales, Inc., Terry Eagle Coal Company, Peabody COALSALES Co., Peerless Eagle Co., Peabody Development Co., Pittston Coal Sales Corp., Powder River Coal Co., and Venture Fuels, c/o Kennecott Energy on 6/18/01. Notice to parties. (Answer due 7/31/01) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Returns of Service by defendant's attorney showing service of Notices, by mail, on High Power Mountain Corporation (HPM Corporation) on 6/19/01; and on Integrity Coal Sales (no date of service given). Notice to parties. (Answer due 8/1/01) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Returns of Service by defendant's attorney showing service of Notices, by mail, on Lodestar Energy, Inc., Gallatin Fuels, Inc., Direct Coal Sales, Inc., Anker Energy Corporation, Black Hills/Coal Network, Inc., Coal Network, Inc., and Consol, Inc. on 6/14/01. Notice to parties. (Answer due 7/27/01) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Returns of Service by defendant's attorney showing service of Notices, by mail, on Unionvale Coal Company, Triton Coal Co., LLC, RAG Coal Sales of America, Inc., Riverton Coal Sales, Inc., Tanoma Coal Sales, Inc., Nineveh Coal Company, Mingo Logan Coal Company, Greenon Coal Company, Highland Coal Sales Company, Enterprise Coal Company, Enron North America Corp., Eighty Four Mining Company, DTE Coal Services, Inc., Cyprus Cumberland Resources Corp., Consol Pennsylvania Coal Company, Coastal Coal Sales, Inc., Central Coal Company, Brooks Run Coal Company, Arch Coal Sales, Inc., and Ashland Coal, Inc., on June 15, 2001. Notice to parties. (Answer due on 7/30/01) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 6/8/2001, Entered: 6/8/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICES (49 separate) ISSUED this day and delivered to defendant's attorney for service. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 6/8/2001, Entered: 6/8/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [20-1] motion for Notice to Third Parties. (signed by Judge James T. Turner) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 6/8/2001, Terminated: 6/8/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 5/11/01) for Notice to Third Parties . Response due: 5/29/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: 4/23/2001 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER by USA to amended complaint. Service: 04/20/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/20/2001 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT by ONTARIO POWER (Answer due 5/2/01) amending [1-1] complaint. Service: 4/19/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint ( signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/19/2001, Terminated: 4/19/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by ONTARIO POWER (Service: 4/18/01) to Amend [1-1] complaint . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Discovery deadline to 9/14/01 and Joint Status Report deadline to 9/24/01 (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: 3/13/2001 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Agreed Protective Order (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [11-1] motion for Entry of an Agreed Protective Order (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001, Terminated: 3/6/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by ONTARIO POWER (Service: 3/2/01) for Entry of an Agreed Protective Order . (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 3/1/2001, Entered: 3/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting motion to Extend Time to respond to first and second sets of interrogatories and requests for production of documents until 03/02/01. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 3/1/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by ONTARIO POWER (Service: 2/28/01) to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories and request for production , (until March 2, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories and requests for production . Reset Interrogatories deadline to 2/28/01 ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001, Terminated: 2/7/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by ONTARIO POWER (Service: 2/6/01) to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories and requests for production , (until February 28, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 1/24/01 (JPSR due 3/13/01). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: Special Procedures (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Charles Stoddart. Service : 1/4/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by ONTARIO POWER of related case(s). ( 97-CV-68, 97-CV-310, 97-CV-311, 97-CV-317, 97-CV-521, and 97-CV-522). (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge James T. Turner. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #050940. Answer due on 2/13/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 154 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?