MIN, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-cv-00763-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MIN, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Kelly, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thad Stevenson Huffman +1 202 973 0200 +1 202 973 0232 tshuffman@jacksonkelly.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/15/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $2700000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 6/5/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 30 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by MIN, INC., USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day.. Service: 6/5/2008.(vro)
    LREF
    Blank 29 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007 Terminated:
    Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney Thad S. Huffman in place of Dennis J. Whittlesey , filed by MIN, INC.. Service: 1/9/07.(dls )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007 Add and Terminate Attorneys
      ***Attorney Thad Stevenson Huffman for MIN, INC. added. Attorney Dennis Jeffery Whittlesey terminated. (dls )
        LREF
        Blank 28 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006 Joint Status Report
        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. Service: 8/29/2006.(hw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004
          JUDGMENT entered, as provided in Rule 54(b), that the claims relating to taxable quarters ending March 31, 1996, September 20, 1996, through December 31, 1998,and June 30, 1999 are dismissed, with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, including any possible attorneys' fees or other expenses of litigation with respect to such claims. (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank 26 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Unpublished Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER directing the clerk to enter judgment, pursuant to Rule 54(b), as there is no just reason for delay, dismissing with prejudice plaintiff's claims relating to taxable quarters ending March 31, 1996; September 30, 1996, through December 31, 1998; and June 30, 1999, with each party to bear its own costs, including any possible attorneys' fees or other expenses of litigation with respect to such claims. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (lld, )
              LREF
              Blank 25 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 Stipulation of Dismissal
              JOINT STIPULATION for Partial Dismissal With prejudice by all parties. The taxable quarters ending March 31, 1996; September 30, 1996, through December 31, 1998; and June 30, 1999, shall be dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs, including any possible attorneys' fees and other expenses of litigation with respect to such claims. (jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 24 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER, re: further proceedings. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (lrd)
                  LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/19/2003 Joint Status Report
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by The United States. Service: 3/17/03. (lrd)
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [21-1] motion for Leave to alert the Court to new authority (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 21 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002, Terminated: 7/29/2002 Terminated:
                      MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/02) for Leave to alert the Court to new authority . Response due: 8/9/02. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/12/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                        REPLY by USA to response to [14-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. Service: 4/11/02. (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 Statement of Genuine Issues
                          STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by MIN, INC. Service: 3/26/02. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 Response to Motion
                            RESPONSE by MIN, INC. to [14-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. Reply due: 4/9/02. (LTD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the Motion for partial Summary Judgment Response to [14-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment due 3/25/02 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002, Terminated: 3/26/2002 Terminated:
                                MOTION by MIN, INC. (Service: 3/25/02) to Extend Time to respond to the Motion for partial Summary Judgment until 3/25/02. Response due: 4/11/02. (LTD)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: 12/28/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 12/26/01. (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: 12/28/2001 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 12/26/01) for partial Summary Judgment . Response due: 1/28/02. (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001
                                      AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by USA (Amends [6-1] answer by USA). Service: 8/30/01. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001 Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting [11-1] motion for Leave to file the separately submitted amended answer (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001, Terminated: 9/5/2001 Motion for Leave to File
                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 8/30/01) for Leave to file the separately submitted amended answer (with status report). Response due: 9/17/01. (LTD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001, Terminated: 9/5/2001
                                            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 8/30/01. (LTD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 10 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 Transcript
                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume (31 pages), at Washington, D.C., for date of July 19, 2001 Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001 Status Conference
                                                Status Conference held ( Transcript due 8/20/01 ) (DS)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 6/26/2001, Entered: 6/27/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                  MOTION (and STATUS REPORT) by USA (Service: 6/26/01) to Transfer Case to Judge Hodges . Response due: 7/13/01. (LTD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 6/26/2001, Entered: 6/27/2001 Status Report
                                                    STATUS REPORT (WITH MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO JUDGE HODGES) by USA. Service: 6/26/01. (LTD)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: 6/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:30 a.m. on 7/19/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/3/2001 Joint Preliminary Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                        JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT, filed by leave of the Judge. (HW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/14/2001 Answer
                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by USA Service: 2/13/01 (JPSR due 4/2/01) (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Charles Stoddart. Service : 1/4/01 (DS)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER re: Directing parties to confer and arrange for preliminary status conference (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000
                                                                NOTICE by MIN, INC. of related cases. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Court Filing
                                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000
                                                                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #050949. Answer due on 2/13/01. (FE)
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 144 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?