GOAD v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:01-cv-00281-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROLAND L. GOAD, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wanda Rubianes-Collazo +1 202 616 0466
Office COFC
Filed 5/9/2001
Jury Demand
Demand $169000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 6/5/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: 6/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER denying [6-1] motion for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [3-1] order (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: 6/13/2001, Terminated: 6/21/2001 Terminated:
    MOTION by ROLAND L. GOAD (Service : 6/7/01 ) for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [3-1] order . (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 6/5/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001 Notice of Appearance/
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Wanda Rubianes-Collazo. Service: 6/5/01. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 6/5/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/5/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001
          Case closed (LD)
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER directing the clerk to dismiss the complaint. No costs. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (LD)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/21/2001
              Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 30.00 RECEIPT #051777 (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 5/9/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 5/9/2001, Entered: 5/9/2001
                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #051724. Answer due on 7/9/01. (FE)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 96 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?