KING v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:01-cv-00318-ECH
District Judge Emily C. Hewitt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES G. KING, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/25/2001
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 516 - Miscellaneous - Damages
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 6/6/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '03-5081'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 CAFC Case Number
CAFC Case Number 03-5081 for [9] Notice of Appeal filed by JAMES G. KING. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Notice of Appeal
    NOTICE OF APPEAL by JAMES G. KING. Filing fee $ 105, receipt number 056886. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/26/2001
      MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated November 23, 2001 affirmed [4-1] judgment order (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 6/26/2001, Entered: 6/27/2001 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gregory Thomas Jaeger. Service: 6/26/01. (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001 CAFC Case Number
          CAFC Case Number Re: [5-1] appeal by JAMES G. KING. CAFC NUMBER: 01-5113. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 6 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER directing Clerk of the Court to return Plaintiff's documents unfiled (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: 6/14/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
              NOTICE OF APPEAL by JAMES G. KING. Copy to Judge Emily C. Hewitt, C.A.F.C. and defendant. FILING FEE $ 105. RECEIPT # 051893. (FE) Modified on 06/14/2001
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001
                JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Court of Federal Claims. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001 Court Filing
                  ORDER directing the clerk to dismiss the complaint for lack of jurisdiction pursuant to Rule 41(b). ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (LD)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001
                    Case closed (LD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 Court Filing
                      Notice of assignment to Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001
                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #051814. Answer due on 7/24/01. (FE)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 44 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?