MONDAY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:01-cv-00355-LMB
District Judge Lawrence M. Baskir, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CALLIE SUE MONDAY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Farmer, Price Hornsby & Weatherford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ernest H. Hornsby +1 334 793 2424
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carolyn J. Craig +1 202 305 7562 +1 202 305 7644 carolyn.craig@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/13/2001
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/16/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ENDADR
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal by CALLIE SUE MONDAY and USA . Complaint dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(ii). Copy to parties. (AB)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002
    Case closed (AB)
      LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 Status Report
      JOINT STATUS REPORT. Service: 4/26/02. (LTD)
        LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [15-1] motion for Leave to file joint status report in a font other than that recommended by the court (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 15 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002, Terminated: 4/29/2002 Terminated:
          MOTION by USA (Service: 4/26/02) for Leave to file joint status report in a font other than that recommended by the court . (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 14 Filed: 3/14/2002, Entered: 3/15/2002 Status Report
            JOINT STATUS REPORT by CALLIE SUE MONDAY and USA. Service: 3/13/02. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002
              CASE assigned to ADR Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt . (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: 1/28/2002
                JOINT STATUS REPORT. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: 12/13/2001 Status Report
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by CALLIE SUE MONDAY and USA. Service: 12/10/01. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 Status ReportCourt Filing
                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by CALLIE SUE MONDAY and USA. Service: 10/26/01. [by leave of the Judge] (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER returning Joint Status Report and directing parties' to re-submit by 11/9/01 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 9 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: 9/20/2001 Status Report
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by CALLIE SUE MONDAY and USA. Service: 9/19/01. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: 9/17/2001 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service: 9/13/01) to Extend Time to file the Joint Status Report until 9/21/01. Response due: 10/1/01. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 7 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001
                            STATUS REPORT by USA Service: 9/5/01 (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 6 Filed: 7/23/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Stay proceedings Joint Status Report deadline to 9/14/01 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 5 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001, Terminated: 7/23/2001 Motion to Stay
                                MOTION by USA (Service: 7/20/01) to Stay proceedings until?. Response due: 8/6/01. (LTD)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                  SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Carolyn Jean Craig. Service : 7/5/01. (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: 6/13/2001 Court Filing
                                      Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: 6/13/2001
                                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #051892. Answer due on 8/13/01. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: 6/13/2001
                                          CASE assigned to Sr. ADR Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III. (FE)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 147 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?