ALASKA CENTRAL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:01-cv-00401-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALASKA CENTRAL EXPRESS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Paul Silverberg +1 202 944 2339
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank Jefferson Hughes +1 202 305 3067 +1 202 514 8640 jeff.hughes@usdoj.gov
No Logo Northern Air Cargo, Inc., Movant
Officially listed as "NORTHERN AIR CARGO, INCORPORATED"

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Thomas Kragie +1 202 626 6830
Office COFC
Filed 7/10/2001
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 138 - Contract - (Pre Award) Injunctions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 10/30/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 44 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 CAFC Mandate Dismissing
MANDATE of CAFC dismissing [43] Notice of Appeal filed by ALASKA CENTRAL EXPRESS, INC. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001 Terminated:
    CAFC Case Number Re: [43-1] appeal by ALASKA CENTRAL. CAFC NUMBER: 02-5043. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 43 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: 12/14/2001, Terminated: 3/20/2003 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by ALASKA CENTRAL. Copy to Defendant, Intervenor, Judge Christine Odell Cook Miller and to CAFC. FILING FEE $ 105.00; RECEIPT # 052898. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 42 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001 Published DecisionCourt Filing
        PUBLISHED DECISION denying [37-1] motion to maintain preliminary injunction pending appeal (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 41 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
          REPLY by ALASKA CENTRAL to responses to [37-1] motion to maintain preliminary injunction pending appeal. Service by hand: 12/5/01 (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 39 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/5/2001 Response to Motion
            RESPONSE by NORTHERN AIR CARGO (Service: 11/30/01 ) to [37-1] motion to maintain preliminary injunction pending appeal filed [by leave of the judge]. Reply due: 12/5/01 (DS)
              LREF
              Blank 40 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/5/2001 Response to Motion
              RESPONSE by USA (Service by hand: 11/30/01) to [37-1] motion to maintain preliminary injunction pending appeal. Reply due: 12/5/01 (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 38 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER Response to [37-1] motion to maintain preliminary injunction pending appeal reset to 11/30/01 , and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 12/5/01 for [37-1] motion to maintain preliminary injunction pending appeal (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). FILINGS TO BE DONE BY HAND DELIVERY. Copy to parties. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 37 Filed: 11/21/2001, Entered: 11/26/2001 Terminated:
                  MOTION by ALASKA CENTRAL (Service: 11/21/01) to maintain preliminary injunction pending appeal . Response due: 12/10/01. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 36 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER denying [31-1] motion for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [29-1] order (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 35 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/15/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                      RESPONSE by NORTHERN AIR CARGO (Service by hand: 11/9/01) to [32-1] motion for Leave to an amended complaint and [31-1] motion for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [29-1] order. Reply due: 11/21/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 34 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/14/2001 Response to Motion
                        RESPONSE by USA (Service by hand: 11/9/01) to [31-1] motion for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [29-1] order. Reply due: 11/21/01. (LTD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 33 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER Response to [32-1] motion for Leave to an amended complaint reset to 11/9/01 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 30 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 10/30/2001
                            JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. No costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 10/30/2001
                              Case closed (LD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 32 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 Terminated:
                                MOTION by ALASKA CENTRAL (Service : 10/29/01 ) for Leave to an amended complaint . Response due: 11/15/01 (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 31 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001, Terminated: 11/16/2001 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by ALASKA CENTRAL (Service: 10/29/01) for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [29-1] order . Response due: 11/15/01. (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                    Deadline updated; Response to [31-1] motion for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [29-1] order reset to 11/15/01 . (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 29 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                      PUBLISHED DECISION granting [21-1] motion to Dismiss, and the Clerk of the Court shall dismiss the complaint without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 28 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001 Transcript
                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume (53 pages), at Washington, D.C., for date of October 10, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 27 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/11/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                          RESPONSE by NORTHERN AIR CARGO to [25-1] motion response by ALASKA CENTRAL. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/9/01. (LTD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 26 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                            REPLY by USA to response to [21-1] motion to Dismiss. Service by hand: 10/5/01. (LTD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 25 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: 10/2/2001 Terminated:
                                              RESPONSE by ALASKA CENTRAL (Service by hand: 10/1/01) to [21-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 10/10/01. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 24 Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: 9/19/2001 Terminated:
                                                RESPONSE by NORTHERN AIR CARGO (Service: 9/18/01) in support of [21-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 10/1/01. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: 9/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [20-1] motion to Amend the scheduling order Response to [21-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 10/1/01 , and oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. 10/10/01 for [21-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: 9/19/2001 Terminated:
                                                    RESPONSE by NORTHERN AIR CARGO (Service: 9/18/01) to [20-1] motion to Amend the scheduling order. Reply due: 10/1/01. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 9/13/01) to Dismiss . Response due: 10/11/01. (HW) Modified on 09/18/2001
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001, Terminated: 9/18/2001 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by ALASKA CENTRAL (Service by hand: 9/17/01) to Amend the scheduling order . Response due: 10/1/01. (HW) Modified on 09/18/2001
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Intervene by NORTHERN AIR CARGO (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: 9/10/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                            REPLY by NORTHERN AIR CARGO to response to [16-1] motion to Intervene by NORTHERN AIR CARGO. Service by hand: 9/7/01. (HW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001, Terminated: 10/30/2001 Response to Motion
                                                              RESPONSE by ALASKA CENTRAL (Service: 9/4/01) to [16-1] motion to Intervene by NORTHERN AIR CARGO. Reply due: 9/17/01. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001, Terminated: 9/13/2001 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION (Service : 8/20/01 ) to Intervene by NORTHERN AIR CARGO . Response due: 9/7/01 (HW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001
                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Evidentiary Hearing, 1 volume (17 pages), at Washington, D.C., for date of July 17, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER re: The motion of Northern Air Cargo, Inc. for intervention received on 8/13/01 shall be returned unfiled for not complying with Rule 24(c)(2) and 81(d)(1) (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Christine O.C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001 ExhibitCourt Filing
                                                                      Exhibit list by ALASKA CENTRAL, by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/13/01. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                        NOTICE of FILING "Additional Exhibits to the Record" by ALASKA CENTRAL, by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/10/01. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                          "Objections to Defendant's Exhibit's" by ALASKA CENTRAL, by leave of the Judge. Service by hand: 8/10/01. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/7/2001 Administrative RecordCourt Filing
                                                                            Administrative record filed by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/3/01. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/7/2001 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                              NOTICE of filing the "Administrative Record" by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service by hand: 8/3/01. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER re: (1) The parties are directed to a recent Federal Circuit decision, AFL-CIO v U.S. No. 00-5090, which has bearing on the issues present in the instant case; and (2) The parties are directed to the briefs relating to cross-motions for summary judgment and transcript of proceedings in Alliant Techsystems No. 97-626C, the items are available for review and copying in the Clerk's Office, requests for obtaining the item's may be directed to Harold Wymbs at (202) 219-9630 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER Plaintiff's Motion Filing deadline to 9/21/01 , Defendant's Cross Motions deadline to 10/5/01 , Plaintiff shall reply/response by 10/17/01 , Defendant shall reply by 10/26/01 and Oral Argument on the parties' cross-motions: 10:00 a.m. 10/30/01 for USA, for ALASKA CENTRAL (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001
                                                                                    Hearing on Injunctive Relief held ( Transcript due 8/16/01 )(DS) Modified on 07/17/2001
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT Re: Declaration of Michael Bergt. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                                        ***Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA. F. Jefferson Hughes, Esquire, filed by leave of the Judge. *** (HW)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 7/11/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER scheduling a hearing on plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction at 10:00 a.m. on 7/17/01 . ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: 7/11/2001 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O. C. Miller . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: 7/11/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                              MOTION, together with a separate volume of exhibits, by ALASKA CENTRAL (Service by hand: 7/10/01) for Preliminary Injunction . Response due: 7/24/01 (DS)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: 7/11/2001 Complaint
                                                                                                COMPLAINT filed. (Copies (5) to defendant) FILING FEE $ 150 RECEIPT # 052028 Answer due on 9/10/01 (DS)
                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 81 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?