DESTEFANO v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:01-cv-00470-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo DENNIS P. DESTEFANO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence Michael Lebowsky +1 310 914 7992 +1 310 914 7930 lebowsky@earthlink.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles John Crueger
Office COFC
Filed 8/13/2001
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 214 - Tax - Informer's Fees
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 3/22/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: 3/22/2002
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. No costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: 3/22/2002 Court Filing
    PUBLISHED DECISION granting [8-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and directing the clerk to dismiss the complaint without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. No costs. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: 3/22/2002
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002
        REPLY by USA to response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Service: 2/21/02. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
          RESPONSE by DENNIS P. DESTEFANO (Service: 2/11/02) to [8-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 2/25/02. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss Response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction reset to 2/11/02 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Christine O.C. Miller) Copy to parties. (LTD)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 1/30/2002, Entered: 1/30/2002, Terminated: 1/31/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
              MOTION by DENNIS P. DESTEFANO (Service: 1/29/02) to Extend Time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss until 2/11/02. Response due: 2/15/02. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to the Motion to Dismiss Response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction reset to 1/30/02 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: 1/3/2002, Terminated: 1/3/2002 Terminated:
                  MOTION by DENNIS P. DESTEFANO (Service: 12/28/01) to Extend Time to file response to the Motion to Dismiss until 1/30/02. Response due: 1/14/02. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/3/2001 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service: 11/29/01) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 12/31/01 (DS)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint Response to complaint due 11/30/01 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: 11/6/2001, Terminated: 11/6/2001 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service: 11/5/01) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to November 30, 2001). (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 10/4/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001
                          ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 11/9/01 ( signed by the Clerk ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001, Terminated: 10/4/2001 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service: 10/3/01) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to November 9, 2001). (DS)
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/19/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Charles John Crueger. Service: 9/17/01. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: 9/12/2001
                                **Not member of bar flag removed. (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001 Court Filing
                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001
                                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #052221. Answer due on 10/12/01. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001 Set/Clear Flags
                                      **Not member of bar flag set (FE)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 187 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?