LOEH v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:01-cv-00486-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROBERT LOEH, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John N. Maher
Office COFC
Filed 8/21/2001
Jury Demand
Demand $1000000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 6/28/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 43 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [36] Unpublished Decision directing judgment. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002 Terminated:
    CAFC Case Number Re: [42-1] appeal by ROBERT LOEH CAFC NUMBER: 02-5161 (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 42 Filed: 8/9/2002, Entered: 8/12/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by ROBERT LOEH. Copy to Judge Christine O.C. Miller, Defendant and to CAFC. Fee not submitted with the appeal. Plaintiff filed motion to proceed in forma pauperis with the complaint on 8/21/02. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 41 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/29/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
        RESPONSE by ROBERT LOEH (Service: 7/17/02) to [39-1] motion for Publication of the decision issued on 6/28/02, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 7/29/02. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 40 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 Court Filing
          PUBLISHED DECISION (Reissuance of Order filed June 28, 2002, for publication). ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 39 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 Terminated:
            MOTION by USA (Service : 7/8/02 ) for Publication of the decision issued on 6/28/02. Response due: 7/25/02 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 38 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER re: Plaintiff's motion received on 7/2/02, shall be returned unfiled because judgment was entered on 6/25/02 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 37 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002
                JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. No costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 36 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002 Court Filing
                  UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting defendant's motion to dismiss and directing hte clerk to dismiss the complaint without prejudice for lack of jurisdcition. No costs. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (LD)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002
                    Case closed (LD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 35 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002 Terminated:
                      MOTION by USA (Service : 6/21/02 ) to amend supplemental brief of 5/22/02, surreply of 5/23/02 , and to supplement surreply of 5/30/02. Response due: 7/8/02 (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 35 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002 Terminated:
                        RESPONSE by USA to [23-1] response by ROBERT LOEH. Service: 6/21/02. First of two event within one document. (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 34 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [32-1] motion to supplement information provided in plaintiff's 5/7/02, sur-reply Defendant's response to Plaintiff's amendments due 6/21/02 (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 06/10/2002
                            LREF
                            Blank 33 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [30-1] motion to Amend [23-1] supplemental brief (signed by Acting Chief Judge Nancy B. Firestone for Judge Christine O.C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 06/10/2002
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 5/31/2002
                              ORDER granting [32-1] motion to supplement information provided in plaintiff's 5/7/02, sur-reply (signed by Acting Chief Judge Nancy B. Firestone for Judge Christine O.C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 32 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: 5/31/2002, Terminated: 6/5/2002 Terminated:
                                MOTION by ROBERT LOEH (Service: 5/28/02) to supplement information provided in plaintiff's 5/7/02, sur-reply . Response due: 6/14/02. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 31 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002
                                  SUR-REPLY by ROBERT LOEH re: the Argall and White-Asberry declarations contained within Defendant's supplemental brief filed on 5/10/02. Service: 5/22/02. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 30 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002, Terminated: 5/31/2002 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                    MOTION by ROBERT LOEH (Service: 5/7/02) to Amend [23-1] supplemental brief . Response due: 3/25/02. (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 29 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER Plaintiff's sur-reply due 5/28/02 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 28 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Affidavit
                                        DECLARATION of Sheila White-Asberry. (LTD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 27 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Terminated:
                                          RESPONSE (supplemental brief) by USA to [22-1] order. Service: 5/10/02. (LTD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 26 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [24-1] motion for Leave to file facsimile signature and to substitute original when received (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 25 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 5/13/02) for Leave to file substitute original . Response due: 5/30/02. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 24 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002, Terminated: 5/14/2002 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 5/10/02) for Leave to file facsimile signature and to substitute original when received . Response due: 5/28/02. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Terminated:
                                                  Supplemental Brief by ROBERT LOEH pursuant to [22-1] order. Service: 5/6/02 (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
                                                    UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting [13-1] motion to Dismiss, as to all of plaintiff's claims except those under 10 U.S.C. Section 623 and 642 (2000); and directing parties to file supplemental briefs by 5/10/02 . ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002, Terminated: 6/28/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                      REPLY by ROBERT LOEH to [18-1] motion reply by USA. Service: 3/19/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD) Modified on 04/05/2002
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                        ORDER to file Plaintiff's reply to Defendant's reply to Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 04/05/2002
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by ROBERT LOEH (Service: 3/25/02) to supplement information provided in plaintiff's reply to defendant's 3/11/02 reply to opposition to motion to dismiss . Response due: 4/11/02 (DS)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [13-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 3/11/02. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002, Terminated: 6/28/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                              RESPONSE by ROBERT LOEH (Service: 3/1/02 ) to [15-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion to dismiss. Reply due: 3/11/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [15-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion to dismiss Reply to Response to Motion reset to 3/11/02 for [13-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002, Terminated: 2/25/2002 Terminated:
                                                                  [out of time] MOTION by USA (Service: 2/22/02) to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion to dismiss , (until March 11, 2002). (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/30/2002 Terminated:
                                                                    RESPONSE by ROBERT LOEH (Service: 1/25/02) to [13-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 2/11/02. (LTD)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 1/17/2002, Entered: 1/17/2002, Terminated: 4/23/2002 Description not available
                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 1/17/02) to Dismiss . Response due: 2/19/02. (LTD)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to answer the complaint Answer to complaint due 1/22/02 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: 12/28/2001 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by ROBERT LOEH (Service: 12/21/01) for judgment by default . Response due: 1/7/02. [Second of two actions in one document.] (HW)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: 12/28/2001 Terminated:
                                                                            RESPONSE by ROBERT LOEH (Service: 12/21/01 ) to [10-1] motion to Extend Time to answer the complaint. Reply due: 1/10/02. [First of two actions in one document.] (HW)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001, Terminated: 1/3/2002 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 12/21/01) to Extend Time to answer the complaint until 2/19/02. Response due: 1/7/02. (LTD)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/14/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                RESPONSE by ROBERT LOEH (Service: 10/23/01) to [5-1] motion to Extend Time to answer the complaint. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 11/5/01. (LTD)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/30/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                  RESPONSE by ROBERT LOEH (Service: 10/23/01) to [5-1] motion to Extend Time to answer the complaint. Reply due: 11/6/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 10/26/2001, Entered: 10/29/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION by ROBERT LOEH (Service: 10/24/01) For reconsideration of [6-2] order under Rule 83.2 . Response due: 11/13/01. (LTD)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/26/2001, Entered: 10/29/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                      Deadline updated; Response to [7-1] motion For reconsideration of [6-2] order under Rule 83.2 reset to 11/13/01 . (LTD)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to answer the complaint Answer deadline to 12/21/01 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001, Terminated: 10/18/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 10/17/01) to Extend Time to answer the complaint until 12/21/01. Response due: 11/5/01. (LTD)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/10/2001
                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John N. Maher. Service: 9/7/01. (LTD)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001, Terminated: 6/28/2002 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                                                              MOTION by ROBERT LOEH (Service: 8/21/01) to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001
                                                                                                  COMPLAINT filed. Answer due on 10/22/01. (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 176 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?