CRAWFORD v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:01-cv-00487-ECH
District Judge Emily C. Hewitt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dentons (US) LLP, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "DAVID E. CRAWFORD"
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John N. Maher
Office COFC
Filed 8/21/2001
Jury Demand
Demand $1400000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/9/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 26 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002 Published DecisionCourt Filing
REISSUED PUBLISHED DECISION (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
    LREF
    Blank 25 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER to file and distribute corrected Opinion and Order filed 7/9/02 (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
      LREF
      Blank 24 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002
      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, without prejudice. No costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 23 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 Court Filing
        PUBLISHED DECISION granting [13-1] motion to Dismiss and plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. No costs. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ). Copy to parties. (LD)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002
          Case closed (LD)
            LREF
            Blank 22 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
            RESPONSE by DAVID E. CRAWFORD to [20-1] response by USA. Service: 6/11/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
              LREF
              Blank 21 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER to file Plaintiff's response to supplemental brief (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 20 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 Terminated:
                RESPONSE (SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF) by USA pursuant to [19-3] order. Service: 5/28/02. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                  Deadline updated; Plaintiff's response to Defnedant's supplemental brief due 6/11/02 . (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 19 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER Defendant's supplemental Brief, not to exceed 10 pages, due 5/28/02 , Defendant's reply, not to exceed 5 pages, due 6/18/02 and Plaintiff's responsive brief due 6/11/02 (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 18 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                      REPLY by USA to response to [13-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 3/15/02. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 17 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [15-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply brief Reply to Response to Motion reset to 3/19/02 for [13-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 03/11/2002
                          LREF
                          Blank 16 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 Terminated:
                          Out of time MOTION by USA (Service: 3/5/02) to Extend Time to file reply brief (to March 19, 2002). Response due: 3/22/02 (DS) Modified on 03/11/2002
                            LREF
                            Blank 15 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/11/2002, Terminated: 3/6/2002 Notice of Change of Address
                            NOTICE of change of address by DAVID E. CRAWFORD, filed by leave of the judge. (HW) Modified on 03/11/2002
                              LREF
                              Blank 14 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: 2/12/2002 Terminated:
                              RESPONSE by DAVID E. CRAWFORD (Service: 2/8/02) to [13-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 2/25/02. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 13 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service: 1/28/02) to Dismiss . Response due: 2/28/02. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 12 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER denying [11-1] motion for judgment by default, granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to answer the complaint Answer to complaint due 2/19/02 (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 11 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: 12/28/2001, Terminated: 1/8/2002 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by DAVID E. CRAWFORD (Service: 12/21/01) for judgment by default . Response due: 1/7/02. [Second of two actions within the same document.] (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 11 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: 12/28/2001, Terminated: 1/8/2002 Terminated:
                                      RESPONSE by DAVID E. CRAWFORD (Service: 12/21/01 ) to [10-1] motion to Extend Time to answer the complaint. Reply due: 1/10/02. [First of two actions within the same document.] (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 10 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 12/21/01) to Extend Time to answer the complaint until 2/19/02. Response due: 1/7/02. (LTD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER denying [8-1] motion For reconsideration of [7-2] order under Rule 83.2 (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt) Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001, Terminated: 12/20/2001 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by DAVID E. CRAWFORD (Service : 10/28/01 ) For reconsideration of [7-2] order under Rule 83.2 . (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 7 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to answer the complaint Answer deadline to 12/21/01 (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 6 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001, Terminated: 10/18/2001 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 10/17/01) to Extend Time to answer the complaint until 12/21/01. Response due: 11/5/01. (LTD)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/10/2001
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John N. Maher. Service: 9/7/01. (LTD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: 9/6/2001 Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [1-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001 Court Filing
                                                      Notice of assignment to Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001
                                                        COMPLAINT filed. Answer due on 10/22/01. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001, Terminated: 9/6/2001 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                          MOTION by DAVID E. CRAWFORD (Service: 8/21/01) to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (FE)
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 101 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?