PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:01-cv-00551-BAF
District Judge Bohdan A. Futey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PSEG NUCLEAR, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo Public Service Electric And Gas Company, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew P. Averbach +1 202 353 0527 +1 202 305 2118 andrew.averbach@usdoj.gov
No Logo Alabama Power Company, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Balch & Bingham LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Stanford Blanton +1 205 226 3417 +1 205 488 5879 sblanton@balch.com
No Logo Georgia Power Company, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Balch & Bingham LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Stanford Blanton +1 205 226 3417 +1 205 488 5879 sblanton@balch.com
No Logo Southern Nuclear Operating Company, Inc., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Balch & Bingham LLP - Bir

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Stanford Blanton +1 205 226 3417 +1 205 488 5879 sblanton@balch.com
Office COFC
Filed 9/26/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '05-5162'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags AUTO, ECF, SNF
  Entries (197) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 184 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
RESPONSE to Motion To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY. (Chu, Jack)
    LREF
    Legal Document 183 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
    MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
      LREF
      Legal Document 182 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Court Filing
      ORDER granting [181] Motion Signed by Sr. Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1)
        LREF
        Legal Document 181 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008, Terminated: 6/16/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
        Joint MOTION for Entry of E-mail Preservation Order, filed by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY.Response due by 6/30/2008. (Attachments: # (1) November 8, 2001 Coordinated Discovery E-mail Order, # (2) October 26, 2001 Defendants Motion for the Court to Adopt Defendants E-Mail Plan, # (3) March 5, 2002 Order)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
          LREF
          Legal Document 180 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Court Filing
          ORDER granting [179] Motion Signed by Sr. Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1)
            LREF
            Legal Document 179 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008, Terminated: 6/3/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
            Joint MOTION for Order an Order Regarding Discovery of Draft Expert Reports, filed by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY.Response due by 6/19/2008.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
              LREF
              Legal Document 178 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Court Filing
              SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 disclosures due 3/14/08, Plaintiffs Expert Report due 8/1/08, Defendants Expert Report due 2/13/09, Discovery due 4/24/09, Exchange of witness and exhibit lists, meeting of counsel, file any motions in limine and pre-trial motions due 5/1/09, Plaintiff's memorandum of fact and law and final exhibit and witness list due 5/15/09, Defendant's memorandum of fact and law and final exhibit and witness list due 6/19/09, a pre-trial conference shall be held on 7/1/09, a trial date will be determined during the pre-trial conference Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1)
                LREF
                Legal Document 177 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008
                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 176 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008 Court Filing
                  ORDER LIFTING STAY. The parties are directed to provide a proposed pre-trial schedule and tenative trial date or dates by 2/5/08. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 175 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008
                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 174 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Court Filing
                      STATUS REPORT ORDER concerning the arbitration ruling in the New Jersey state court and further proceedings in this case due 1/23/08. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Pursuant to [174] Order, Joint Status Report due by 1/23/2008 (hw1, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 173 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Court Filing
                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Status Conference set for 12/6/2007 02:30 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Sr. Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 172 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Court Filing
                            STATUS REPORT ORDER, Stay is continued for 90 Days Status Report due by 1/23/2008 Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (ky)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 171 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007
                              STATUS REPORT, filed by all plaintiffs. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 170 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Court Filing
                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/24/2007 02:30 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Sr. Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 169 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 Court Filing
                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Status Conference set for 9/19/2007 02:30 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Sr. Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 168 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007 Court Filing
                                    STATUS REPORT ORDERStatus Report due by 10/25/2007 or within 30 days of decision of related court cases. Stay is continued for 90 days. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 167 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007
                                      STATUS REPORT, filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1 - Arbitration Award# (2) Attachment 2 - Motion for Leave to Intervene for Limited Purpose# (3) Attachment 3 - PSEG Opposition to Motion to Vacate Arbitration Ruling# (4) Attachment 4 - Government Response to Motion to Vacate Arbitration Ruling)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 166 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Court Filing
                                      ORDER Plaintiff shall file a report within 30 days of the decision of the arbitration in Delmarva Power & Light Company, No. 04-0034C. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 165 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007
                                        STATUS REPORT, filed by all plaintiffs. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 164 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: 4/25/2007 Court Filing
                                          ORDER Clerk is directed to return the proffered submission of motion to intervene by Mr. William Peterson Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1)
                                            LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document 163 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007
                                            **SEALED**NOTICE, filed by USA re [162] Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Document (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10))(Finn, Stephen)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 162 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting [161] Motion for leave to file under seal, electronically a copy of Plaintiffs' Surreply In Response to the United States February 28, 2007 Reply to Delmarva Power and Light Company's Response to Defendant's Motion to Consolidate or, in the alternative, for Issuance of a Summons Pursuant to RCFC 14(a) and Notice Pursuant to RCFC 14(b) filed in Delmarva Power and Light Company v. United States Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 161 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007, Terminated: 3/20/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal, Electronically, A Copy Of "Plaintiffs' Surreply In Response To The United States' February 28, 2007 Reply To Delmarva Power And Light Company's Response To Defendant's Motion To Consolidate Or, In The Alternative, For Issuance Of A Summons Pursuant To RCFC 14(a) And Notice Pursuant To RCFC 14(b)" Filed In Delmarva Power And Light Company v. United States, filed by USA.Response due by 4/6/2007.(Finn, Stephen)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 160 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007 Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [151] Motion to Stay for 90 days to allow for completion of the pending binding arbitration between Plaintiffs and the plaintiffs in Delmarva Power & Light Company, No. 04-0034C (Fed. Cl.)Status Report due on or before 6/6/2007 Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Sealed Legal Document 159 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007
                                                    **SEALED**RESPONSE to [151] MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings Pending Completion Of Binding Arbitration, filed by USA.Reply due by 3/14/2007.(Finn, Stephen)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 158 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007 Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [157] Motion for Leave to file, under seal, electronically, Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion To Stay Further Proceedings Pending Completion Of Binding Arbitration. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 157 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: 2/27/2007, Terminated: 2/28/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                        MOTION for Leave to File "Defendant's Response To Plaintiffs' Motion To Stay Further Proceedings Pending Completion Of Binding Arbitration" Under Seal, filed by USA.Response due by 3/16/2007.(Finn, Stephen)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 156 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007 Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [155] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Response due by 2/27/2007. A telephonic conference is scheduled for 3/6/07. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 155 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: 2/15/2007, Terminated: 2/16/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 02/27/07 to File Response or Reply as to [151] MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings Pending Completion Of Binding Arbitration, filed by USA.Response due by 3/5/2007.(Finn, Stephen)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 154 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007
                                                              NOTICE, filed by USA re [153] Order on Motion for Leave to File, of filing document (Attachments: # (1))(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 153 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [152] Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Consolidate Or, in the Alternative, For Issuance of a Summons Pursuant to RCFC 14(a) and Notice Pursuant to Notice 14(b) from Delmarva Power and Light Company v. United States Nos. 04-34C, 04-36C Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 152 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007, Terminated: 2/12/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File a copy of "Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Consolidate or, in the Alternative, for Issuance of a Summons Pursuant to RCFC 14(a) and Notice Pursuant to RCFC 14(b)" from Delmarva Power and Light Company v. United States, Nos. 04-34C, 04-36C (Fed. Cl.), filed by USA.Response due by 2/26/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 151 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007, Terminated: 3/6/2007 Motion to Stay
                                                                    **SEALED** MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings Pending Completion Of Binding Arbitration, filed by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY.Response due by 2/20/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part I# (2) Appendix Part II# (3) Appendix Part III)(Chu, Jack)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 150 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [149] Motion for Leave to File Response UNDER SEAL Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 149 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007, Terminated: 1/31/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Electronically, filed by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY.Response due by 2/20/2007.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 148 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [146] MOTION to Consolidate Cases 04-0034C with this case, [147] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/31/2007 to File Response or Reply as to [146] MOTION to Consolidate Cases 04-0034C with this case Response due by 1/31/2007.Reply due by 2/7/2007. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 147 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: 1/17/2007
                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/31/2007 to File Response or Reply as to [146] MOTION to Consolidate Cases 04-0034C with this case, filed by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY.Response due by 2/5/2007.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 146 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007
                                                                              MOTION to Consolidate Cases 04-0034C with this case, filed by USA.Response due by 1/22/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1# (2) Appendix Part 2)(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006
                                                                                Deadlines set pursuant to [145] Order: Defendant may file a motion to consolidate the present case with 04-36 and 04-34; and in addition, defendant shall propose a schedule of further proceedings concerning libility by 1/5/2007. Plaintiffs shall file their responses to defendant's motion by 1/17/2007. (hw1, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 145 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 12/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting [144] Motion for Extension of Time to file a motion to consolidate and propose schedule by 1/5/07, plaintiff's responses due 1/17/07, defendant's reply due 1/24/07. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 144 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006, Terminated: 12/27/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/5/2007 to To File Motion For Consolidation And Proposed Schedule Regarding Liability, Pursuant To The Court's December 14, 2006 Order, filed by USA.Response due by 1/8/2007.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006
                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: pursuant to [143] Scheduling Order, Motion(s) due by 12/22/2006. Reply due by 1/10/2007. Response due by 1/3/2007. (hw1, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 143 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/14/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant may file a motion to consolidate file and a proposed schedule by 12/22/06, plaintiffs shall file their response by 1/3/07, and defedant shall reply by 1/10/07. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 142 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P. Averbach for USA. (Averbach, Andrew)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 141 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/14/2006 02:30 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Sr. Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 140 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006 CAFC Mandate Reversing
                                                                                              MANDATE of CAFC. The Court of Federal Claims has jurisdiction under the Tucker Act to hear PSEG's breach of contract. REVERSED. (hw1, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 139 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit ORDER. IT IS ORDERED THAT: (1) Florida Power's motion to have its name removed from the caption as a petitioner is granted. The revised official caption is reflected above; (2) PSEG's petition for permission to appeal is granted; and (3) PSEG's motion for summary vacatur is denied. (hw1, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 138 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 9/2/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                  CAFC Case Number 05-5162 for [137] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C. (hw1, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 137 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: 8/12/2005, Terminated: 11/20/2006 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number 063408. (hw1, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 136 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/12/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                      Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit ORDER re: petition for permission file an interlocutory appeal. (hw1, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 135 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER STAYING CASE Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 134 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/20/2005
                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 133 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                            UNPUBLISHED OPINION & ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER. Status Report due by 5/20/2005. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 132 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Yee-Chieh Chu (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 131 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005
                                                                                                                NOTICE by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY Of Federal Circuit Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Petition For Permission To Appeal (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (March 25, 2005 Federal Circuit Order))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 130 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [126] MOTION for Reconsideration re [124] Published Opinion, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 129 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER for defendant to respond to plaintiff's motion for reconsideration by March 23, 2005. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005
                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 3/23/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 128 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/7/2005 02:00 PM in Chambers before Sr. Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 127 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 126 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005, Terminated: 4/22/2005 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration re [124] Published Opinion,, by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 125 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Reassignment to Senior Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (dls )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005
                                                                                                                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to RCFC 40.1(c), for the efficient administration of justice, this case is reassigned to Judge Bohdan A. Futey for all further proceedings. Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 124 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  PUBLISHED OPINION. Transferring plaintiffs Florida Power and Duke Power's breach of contract claims to the D.C. Circuit, dismissing plaintiffs Nebraska Public Power and PSEG Nuclear's breach of contract claims for lack of jurisdiction, certifying this opinion so that the parties may bring an interlocutory appeal to the Federal Circuit pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(c)(1); and staying plaintiffs' remaining claims pending resolution of the jurisdictional issues raised in this opinion on appeal. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (wf1, ) Modified on 2/4/2005 to include interlocutory appeal language. (dls ).
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 123 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE TO [118] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Brief in response to petition for writ of cert in Consolidated Edison v. US# (2) Appendix Petition for writ of cert in US v. Northern States Power)(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 122 Filed: 12/30/2004, Entered: 12/30/2004, Terminated: 1/4/2005 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration re [121] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by USA. Response due by 1/18/2005 (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 121 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [120] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's response to plaintiffs' responses to the court's October 14, 2004 show cause order due by 1/4/2005. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt.(wf1, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 120 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004, Terminated: 12/27/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [119] Response to Order to Show Cause,until 1/14/2005, by USA. Response due by 1/3/2005 (Lester, Harold) Modified on 12/17/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 119 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE TO [118] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix To Plaintiffs' Response To The Court's October 14, 2004 Order To Show Cause)(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 118 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why complaint should not be dismissed or transferred to the D.C. Circuit for lack of jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 11/12/2004. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (wf1, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 117 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004
                                                                                                                                              ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES [108] Dft's Second Motion to Renew its Motion toConsolidate as well as its previous motions relating to consolidation. The Court further LIFTS THE STAY of the remainder of the cases to which the Order of 4/16/2003, applied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket this Order in this case with an entry noting the same on the dockets of the remaining SNFcases captioned in Dft's instant motion, with a courtesy copy to all SNF parties and presiding SNF judges of the Court. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 116 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/9/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Service: 12/23/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 115 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/9/2004 Order on Motion Lifting StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The purpose of the amendment is procedural only -- to add pltf's predecessor-in-interest, Public Service Electric and Gas Company, as a party. [114] Pltf's Motion for Leave to Lift the Stay in This Case Temporarily is granted. Upon filing the first amended complaint, the stay shall resume. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 114 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003, Terminated: 1/6/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Lift Stay to File First Amended Complaint by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C. Service: 12/23/03. Response due by 1/9/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 113 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Counsel for Dft's Change of Facsimile Number by USA. Service: 12/1/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 112 Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that all filings in this case relating to issues of consolidation shall be captioned solely in the name of this case and shall show the name of the presiding judge in this case. A courtesy copy of any such filing relating to issues of consolidation shall be provided to the Clerk's Office for transmission to the Chief Judge. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 111 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Pltfs' Responses to [108] Dft's Second MOTION to the Chief Judge to Renew Consideration of Dft's Motion to Consolidate filed by USA, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 9/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 110 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [109] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltf's Opposition to [108] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate. The reply is filed by leave of the court. Reply due by 9/3/2003. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 109 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003, Terminated: 9/23/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA.Service: 9/3/03. Response due by 9/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to the Chief Judge for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C]Service: 8/26/03. Response due by 9/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION to [108] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate filed by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C. [Original document located in Case No. 98-483C] Reply due by 8/29/2003. Service: 8/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/15/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                      Dft's Motion to the Chief Judge for Leave to Correct Certificate of Service and to Waive Requirements of RCFC 5.3 Regarding "Dft's Second Motion [to the Chief Judge] to Renew its Motion to Consolidate." (Original Motion located in Case No. 98-126C) (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 108 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                        SECOND MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate by USA. [COPY] (Original Document in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 7/29/03 by hand. Response due by 8/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 106 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by The United States. Service: 4/11/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 105 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re [77] Cross Motion filed by The United States together with separate appendix. Reply due by 5/1/2003. Service: 4/17/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 104 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [103] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 107 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 103 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003, Terminated: 4/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Reply Brief by 30 pages by The United States.Service by hand: 4/11/03. Response due by 4/25/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 101 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: further proceedings. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 100 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 99 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                        Response by USA to [78-1] proposed findings by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C. Service: 3/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 98 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [10-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. Service: 3/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 97 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [96-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 96 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003, Terminated: 3/13/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 3/10/03) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 3/27/03. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 95 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: See order [612-1] dated 3/7/03, in case 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 94 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [93-1] motion for Leave to remove filings from under seal (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 93 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003, Terminated: 3/6/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C. (Service : 2/27/03 ) for Leave to remove filings from under seal . Response due: 3/17/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 92 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 91 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 89 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/22/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C. (Service : 2/10/03 ) for Leave to file INSTANTER Sur-reply in response to defendant's motion to compel . Response due: 2/27/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 102 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [80] Motion for Extension of Time to file its reply to plaintiff's response to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment regarding the rate of acceptance of spent nuclear fuel (Rate Brief) by due by 4/11/2003 Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 88 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 87 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 86 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [9-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of the complaint. Service: 1/30/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 85 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 84 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER - see 98-126 C for order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 83 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [80-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion for summary judgment, reply to the motion for summary judgment and reply to the motion to dismiss. Service: 1/21/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 82 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C. (Service: 1/15/03) to [80-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion for summary judgment, reply to the motion for summary judgment and reply to the motion to dismiss. Reply due: 1/30/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 80 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003, Terminated: 2/5/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 1/10/03) to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion for summary judgment, reply to the motion for summary judgment and reply to the motion to dismiss until ? Response due: 1/27/03 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 90 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [75-1] motion for Leave to place filings under seal temporarily. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 81 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 79 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C. to [15-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 12/16/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 78 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C. Service: 12/16/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 77 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CROSS MOTION by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C. ( Service: 12/16/02 ) and RESPONSE to [14-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment by USA (together with a separate appendix). Response due: 1/16/03. (HW) Modified on 01/06/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [72-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Deadline updated; Response to [77-1] cross motion reset to 1/16/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 75 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/3/2003, Terminated: 1/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C. (Service : 12/30/02 ) for Leave to place filings under seal temporarily . Response due: 1/13/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 74 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE, with appendix, by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C. (Service: 12/16/02) to [10-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. Reply due: 1/2/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 73 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C. (Service: 12/16/02 ) to [9-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of the complaint. Reply due: 1/10/03 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 72 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002, Terminated: 1/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C. (Service: 12/16/02) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 1/2/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 71 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying as moot [69-1] motion for Reconsideration of [68-2] order (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 70 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Response to [14-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment due 12/16/02, [10-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment due 12/16/02, [9-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of the complaint due 12/16/02 , and Reply Response to Motion due 1/10/03 for [14-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment, due 1/10/03 for [10-1] for partial Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 69 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002, Terminated: 11/19/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C. (Service: 11/12/02) for Reconsideration of [68-2] order . Response due: 11/26/02 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 68 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [67-1] motion requesting an order setting 11/25/02 as the deadline for plaintiff to respond to motion for summary judgment . Response to [14-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment reset to 11/25/02, [10-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment reset to 11/25/02, [9-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of the complaint reset to 11/25/02 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/26/2002, Terminated: 10/30/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 10/24/02 ) requesting an order setting 11/25/02 as the deadline for plaintiff to respond to motion for summary judgment . Response due: 11/12/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 66 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: see order [467-1] dated 7/29/02, in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: 7/24/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of reassignment to Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt . Copy to parties. (DS) Modified on 07/24/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER; re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER - see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C.(signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, Re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/6/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/3/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: See [395-1] order in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: orl argument, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of March 5, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: see order in 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 7/24/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMICUS BRIEF filed by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, ALABAMA POWER CO, GEORGIA POWER CO. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER removing this case from the "ADR" Pilot Program and granting [26-1] motion for leave by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, ALABAMA POWER CO, GEORGIA POWER CO to file Amicus Brief (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Oral Argument re: [22-1] motion to defer briefing on Government Motions by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C., [16-1] motion for removal from ADR Pilot Program and assignment to coordinated discovery by USA ( Transcript due 4/4/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/22/02) to [26-1] motion for leave by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, ALABAMA POWER CO, GEORGIA POWER CO to file Amicus Brief. Reply due: 3/8/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: 2/12/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 3/5/02 for [22-1] motion to defer briefing on Government Motions and [16-1] motion for removal from ADR Pilot Program and assignment to coordinated discovery (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: 2/11/2002, Terminated: 3/5/2002 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION (Service by hand: 2/8/02) for leave by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, ALABAMA POWER CO, GEORGIA POWER CO to file Amicus Brief . Response due: 2/22/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/11/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C. to response to [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability. Service: 2/8/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/23/02) to [22-1] motion to defer briefing on Government Motions. Reply due: 2/4/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/22/02) to [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability. Reply due: 2/5/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002, Terminated: 11/17/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C. (Service: 1/18/02) to defer briefing on Government Motions . Response due: 2/4/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [16-1] motion for removal from ADR Pilot Program and assignment to coordinated discovery. Service: 1/14/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/5/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C. (Service: 1/3/02 ) to [16-1] motion for removal from ADR Pilot Program and assignment to coordinated discovery. Reply due: 1/17/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: 1/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [18-1] motion to Extend Time to file a response to the Motion for partial Summary Judgment Response to [14-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment, [10-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment and [9-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of the complaint due 1/25/02 (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001, Terminated: 1/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C. (Service: 12/21/01) to Extend Time to file a response to the Motion for partial Summary Judgment until 1/25/02. Response due: 1/7/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/26/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C. (Service: 12/19/01) for Summary Judgment on liability , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/21/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/18/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 12/17/01) for removal from ADR Pilot Program and assignment to coordinated discovery . Response due: 1/4/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact filed by USA. Service by hand: 11/28/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION, together with a separate volume of appendix, by USA (Service by hand: 11/28/01) for Partial Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance. Response due: 12/28/01 (DS) Modified on 12/04/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [12-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001, Terminated: 11/30/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/28/01) For leave to exceed the page limitation , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 12/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service by hand: 11/27/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION, with one volume of Appendix, by USA (Service by hand: 11/27/01) for partial Summary Judgment . Response due: 12/26/01 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: Concerning ADR Pilot Procedures (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to answer the complaint Answer deadline to 11/28/01 (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 11/27/01) to Dismiss Count III of the complaint . Response due: 12/11/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/27/2001, Terminated: 11/28/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 11/26/01) to Extend Time to answer the complaint until 11/28/01. Response due: 12/13/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: Special Procedures (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Heide Lynn Herrmann. Service: 10/17/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by PSEG NUCLEAR, L.L.C. of related cases. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of assignment to Judge James T. Turner. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #052471. Answer due on 11/25/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE assigned to ADR Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 196 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?