HARRIS EXPORT COAL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:01-cv-00574-LJB
District Judge Lynn J. Bush, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo HARRIS EXPORT COAL CORPORATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hoyer, Hoyer & Smith, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher S. Smith +1 304 344 9821
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/5/2001
Jury Demand
Demand $378819000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 7/12/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
    LREF
    Blank 19 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Notice of Appearance/
    NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Charles Stoddart for USA. Service: 7/7/2004.(jcp, )
      LREF
      Blank 18 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
      STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties shall FILE a Joint Status Report, on or before 8/24/2004. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (jcp, )
        LREF
        Blank 17 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/26/2004 Joint Status Report
        JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 5/24/2004.(jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
          STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties shall FILE a Joint Status Report, on or before 5/24/2004. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
            STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties shall FILE a Joint Status Report, on or before 2/22/2004. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 Joint Status Report
              JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 11/25/03.(jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/29/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Motion and Stipulation or Joint Status Report due by 11/22/2003. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (dw1, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003 Status Report
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 7/15/03.(jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                    STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status report due 7/15/03 (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copyto parties. (LTD) Modified on 7/17/2003 (dls, ).
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002 Status Report
                      Joint STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 10/22/02 (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 9 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 Status Report
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 7/23/02. (LTD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert N. Dorosin. Service :6/19/02 (AB)
                            LREF
                            Blank 7 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002 Status Report
                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 4/25/02. (LTD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 6 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: 1/25/2002 Court Filing
                              ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Stay Proceedings Joint or separate Status Report due 4/25/02 (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 5 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/25/2002, Terminated: 1/25/2002 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service: 1/24/02) to Stay Proceedings . (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/3/2001 Answer
                                  ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 11/30/01 (JPSR due 1/17/02). (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Rozella Ann Oliver. Service : 10/22/01. (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: 10/5/2001 Court Filing
                                      Notice of assingnment to Judge Lynn J. Bush . Copy to parties. (VO)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: 10/5/2001
                                        COMPLAINT FILING FEE $150 RECEIPT #052533 Answer due on 12/4/01. (VO)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 191 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?