JACKSON v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:01-cv-00632-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo SARAH S JACKSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by louisvillelaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Lee Stevens +1 502 244 3153 +1 502 244 9743 stevens@Louisvillelaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Sean Dufault +1 202 616 0471 +1 202 353 7988 michael.dufault@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/8/2001
Jury Demand
Demand $100000
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 1/13/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003
    Case closed (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 24 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Published DecisionCourt Filing
      PUBLISHED DECISION granting [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and directing the clerk to dismiss the complaint without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 23 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY by USA to response to [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Service: 12/16/02 (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 22 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [21-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply brief. Reply to Response to Motion reset to 12/16/02 for [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller) Copy to parties. (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 21 Filed: 12/11/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002, Terminated: 12/16/2002 Terminated:
            MOTION by USA (Service : 12/11/02 ) to Extend Time to file reply brief (until December 16, 2002). (HW) Modified on 12/19/2002
              LREF
              Blank 20 Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [19-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to dismiss Reply to Response to Motion reset to 12/11/02 for [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 19 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/23/2002, Terminated: 11/21/2002 Terminated:
                MOTION by USA (Service : 11/20/02 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to dismiss , (until December 11, 2002) (HW)
                  LREF
                  Blank 18 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: 11/13/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                  RESPONSE by SARAH S JACKSON (Service: 11/4/02) to [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 11/21/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 17 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss Response to [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction due 11/4/02 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 16 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002, Terminated: 9/10/2002 Terminated:
                      MOTION by SARAH S JACKSON (Service: 8/29/02) to Extend Time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss (60 days). Response due: 9/16/02. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 15 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER filing by leave and granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's Response to [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction reset to 9/3/02. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 14 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002, Terminated: 7/9/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                          MOTION by SARAH S JACKSON (Service : 6/25/02 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss [until September 3, 2002]. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 7/12/02 (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 13 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Terminated:
                            MOTION by SARAH S JACKSON (Service : 6/25/02 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss [until September 3, 2002]. Response due: 7/12/02 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 12 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service: 5/15/02) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Response due: 6/17/02 (DS)
                                LREF
                                Blank 11 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint Answer to complaint due 5/15/02 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 10 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002, Terminated: 5/14/2002 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 5/13/02) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint , (until May 15, 2002). (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 9 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002 Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint Response to complaint due 5/13/02 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002, Terminated: 4/23/2002 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 4/22/02) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to May 13, 2002). (DS)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. reset Answer deadline to 4/22/02 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 6 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002, Terminated: 2/28/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 2/28/02) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint , (until April 22, 2002). (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 5 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint Response to complaint due 3/8/02 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 4 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002, Terminated: 1/8/2002 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 1/7/02) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to March 8, 2002). (DS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 3 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Michael Sean Dufault. Service: 11/30/01. (LTD)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 Court Filing
                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O. C. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001
                                                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #052687. Answer due on 1/7/02. (FE)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 110 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?