BOSWELL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:01-cv-00649-NBF
District Judge Nancy B. Firestone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES D BOSWELL, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office COFC
Filed 11/16/2001
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 8/16/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '05-5006'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 28 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [23] Unpublished Order/Opinion that directed the Clerk of the Court to enter judgment. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 26 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/19/2004, Terminated: 5/27/2005 CAFC Appeal Fees
    CAFC Appeal Fees received $255.00, receipt number 061580 re [25] Notice of Appeal filed by JAMES D BOSWELL. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 27 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004 Terminated:
      CAFC Case Number 05-5006 for [25] Notice of Appeal filed by JAMES D BOSWELL. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 25 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Terminated: Court Filing
        NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [24] Judgment by JAMES D BOSWELL. Copies to Judge Nancy B. Firestone, opposing party and CAFC. Filing fee due. (dw1) Modified on 10/14/2004 (dw1).
          LREF
          Blank 24 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. Each party to bear its own costs. (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank 23 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004 Court Filing
            ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (lld, )
              LREF
              Blank 22 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/10/2004 Response
              RESPONSE to [21] Dft's Response Dated 5/25/2004 to Show Cause Order Dated 4/19/2004, filed by JAMES D BOSWELL. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 6/5/2004.(jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 21 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004 Response
                RESPONSE to [20] Pltf's Response to the Court's 4/19/2004 Show Cause Order, filed by USA. Service: 5/24/2004.(jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 20 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Response to Order to Show Cause
                  RESPONSE TO [19] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Combined With Appendix 1, 2, and 3, filed by JAMES D BOSWELL. Service: 5/4/2004.(jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 19 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                    ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by 5/5/2004 why the court should not dismiss this case based on the Federal Circuit's December 9, 2003 decision. The government's response to plaintiff's filing shall be filed by May 25, 2004. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (lld, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                      Set/Reset Deadlines: . Response by government to plaintiff's response to show cause filing due by 5/25/2004 (lld, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nancy B. Firestone : Status Conference held on 04/15/04. (dpk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 18 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: The court hereby SCHEDULES a Status Conference on Thursday, 4/15/2004 11:00 AM before Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 17 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Status Report
                            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 3/17/2004.(jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER: The court expects that the parties will continue to comply with the US Court of Federal Claims Amended General Order No. 40, ADR Pilot Procedures. Copies of the General Order No. 40 and all of the ADR Pilot Program model orders and motions may be obtained on the court's internet website. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 15 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003 Court Filing
                                NOTICE of Reassignment to ADR Judge Marian Blank Horn. (dls, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003
                                  Case reassigned to Judge Marian Blank Horn. Judge Wilkes C. Robinson no longer assigned to the case. (dls, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER staying proceedings pending the decision of the Federal Circuit on a related matter (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                      SUPPLEMENT 1 to Statement of Case Support for Jurisdiction by JAMES D BOSWELL. Service: 2/1/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: 2/5/2002
                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: status conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of January 24, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 Response
                                          RESPONSE by USA to [9-2] order. Service: 2/1/02. (LTD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
                                            RESPONSE by JAMES D BOSWELL to [9-2] order. Service: 1/31/02. (LTD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: 1/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER Plaintiff's case support for his claim and Defendant's guidance regarding Plaintiff's petition for review due 2/1/02 (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone) Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/25/2002 Status Conference
                                                Status Conference held ( Transcript due 1/29/02 ) (DS)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 1/17/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                  RESPONSE by JAMES D BOSWELL to (intended) Motion to Dismiss "petitioner's" Motion for Discovery, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/14/02. (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: 1/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER Preliminary Status Conference set for 2:00 p.m. on 1/24/02 , Defendant's memorandum due 1/10/02 , and Plaintiff's response due 1/18/02 (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 Memorandum
                                                      MEMORANDUM by USA pursuant to the Court's order of 11/29/01. Service: 1/8/02 (LTD)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001
                                                        Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #052900. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER - "Notice of Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) Pilot Program Procedures" (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/27/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jonathan Reid Prouty. Service: 11/26/01. (LTD)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 Court Filing
                                                                Notice of assignment to Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001
                                                                  COMPLAINT, Answer due on 1/15/02. [fee not received] (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001
                                                                    CASE assigned to Sr. ADR Judge Wilkes C. Robinson . (DS)
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 156 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?