LORRAINE v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-vv-00556-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GLADSTONE TULLOCH, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Theodore Johni
No Logo MALICIA ANDREA LORRAINE, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Theodore Johni
No Logo NATALIA DESTINY TULLOCH, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Theodore Johni
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ann Kathleen Donohue +1 202 353 7832 +1 202 616 4310 ann.donohue@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/15/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $250000
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 4/18/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 32 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/11/2001 Satisfaction of Judgment
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $250,000.00, was mailed on August 8, 2001, to Scott T. Johni, Esquire, attorney for the petitioners. See letter in file. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 31 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/6/2001 Judgment Forwarded (Election)
    Certified copy of corrected judgment, forwarded to HHS. The only change in the corrected judgment is the case caption. The original judgment was forwarded on July 19, 2001. Persuant to the order dated August 21, 2001, the special master withdrew the August 16, 2001 order correcting the attorney fees and costs judgment of June 6, 2001. See letter in file. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 30 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 Remark
      CORRECTED JUDGMENT of April 18, 2001 per Order of August 21, 2001, which directs the clerk to correct the case caption. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 29 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001
        ORDER vacating [26-1] order of August 16, 2001, and granting [25-1] motion for relief from judgment in order to amend the caption ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ) Copy to parties. (LD)
          LREF
          Blank 28 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001
          Certified copy of corrected judgment, solely correcting the case caption of the judgment issued June 6, 2001, awarding counsel fees and expenses, forwarded to HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 27 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001
            CORRECTED JUDGMENT of June 6, 2001, to reflect Order of August 16, 2001 changing the case caption. {Vacated per order withdrawing August 16, 2001 order} (LD) Modified on 08/23/2001
              LREF
              Blank 26 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001, Terminated: 8/21/2001 Terminated:
              ORDER granting [25-1] motion for relief from judgment in order to amend the caption ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz ) Copy to parties. (LD)
                LREF
                Blank 25 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001, Terminated: 8/16/2001 Terminated:
                MOTION by MALICIA ANDREA LORRAINE (Service: 8/8/01) for relief from judgment in order to amend the caption . Response due: 8/27/01. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 24 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/7/2001
                  SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, in the amount of $11,712.00, will be mailed on July 5, 2001 to Scott T. Johni, Esq., Attorney for the Petitioners. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 23 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001
                    Certified copy of election and judgment forwarded to HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 22 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001
                      Certified copy of judgment solely awarding counsel fees and expenses, forwarded to HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 21 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001
                        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioners are awarded attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $11,712.00, in addition to the judgment of compensation of April 18, 2001. This award shall be payable jointly to petitioners and their counsel. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 20 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: 5/15/2001 Petitioner's Election
                          PETITIONER'S ELECTION to accept Judgment. Service: 5/7/01. Election(y/n): y (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 19 Filed: 5/4/2001, Entered: 5/7/2001 Published Decision of Special Master - Fees
                            Decision of Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz re: fees and costs. Copy to parties. (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 18 Filed: 5/4/2001, Entered: 5/7/2001 Published Decision of Special Master - Fees
                              Decision of Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz re: fees. Copy to parties. (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 17 Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 notice of filing
                                Notice of filing cost invoices by MALICIA ANDREA LORRAINE Service: 4/20/01 (AB)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 16 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/24/2001 notice of filing
                                  Notice of filing Supplement to Affidavit of Costs re: General Order #9 by MALICIA ANDREA LORRAINE Service: 4/17/01 (AB)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 15 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001
                                    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioners are awarded compensation in the amount of $250,000.00. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001
                                      Case closed (LD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 14 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/10/2001 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                        MOTION by MALICIA ANDREA LORRAINE (Service : 4/3/01 ) for Attorney Fees Response due: 4/20/01 (AB)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 13 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: 3/12/2001
                                          Decision of Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 12 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 Respondent's Report
                                            RESPONDENT'S REPORT. Service: 3/5/01. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 11 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001 Order
                                              ORDER reset date Respondent's Report due to 2/26/01 (signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 10 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/18/2000 notice of filing
                                                Notice of filing Exhibit 17 by MALICIA ANDREA LORRAINE, GLADSTONE TULLOCH, NATALIA DESTINY TULLOCH. Service: 12/12/00 (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: 11/29/2000 Status Report
                                                  STATUS REPORT by MALICIA ANDREA LORRAINE, GLADSTONE TULLOCH, NATALIA DESTINY TULLOCH. Service: 11/13/00. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: 11/29/2000 Additional Documentation
                                                    Additional Documentation by MALICIA ANDREA LORRAINE, GLADSTONE TULLOCH, NATALIA DESTINY TULLOCH. Service: 11/23/00 (JT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: 11/1/2000 notice of filing
                                                      Notice of filing Exhibit 15 by MALICIA ANDREA LORRAINE, GLADSTONE TULLOCH and NATALIA DESTINY TULLOCH. Service: 10/25/00. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: 11/1/2000 Scheduling Order
                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Additional Documents due: 11/27/00 for NATALIA DESTINY TULLOCH, for GLADSTONE TULLOCH, for MALICIA ANDREA LORRAINE (signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 10/6/2000 notice of filing
                                                          Notice of filing Exhibit 14 by MALICIA ANDREA LORRAINE, GLADSTONE TULLOCH, NATALIA DESTINY TULLOCH. Service: 9/26/00 (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000 Order
                                                            ORDER directing parties to confer and contact the Court 10/15/00 with date for Status Conference ( signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Ann Kathleen Donohue. Service : 9/21/00 (DS)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: 9/15/2000
                                                                NOTICE OF assignment to Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: 9/15/2000
                                                                  PETITION (Filed with 2 bound volumes containing Exhibits 1 through 13) by MALICIA ANDREA LORRAINE and GLADSTONE TULLOCH, as Legal Representatives of the Estate of NATALIA DESTINY TULLOCH. FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #050395, Vac. Date: 09/30/98 (Respondent's report due 12/14/00). (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: 9/15/2000
                                                                    CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 265 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?