VARGAS v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-vv-00722-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PATRICIA VARGAS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Allen Thompson +1 612 571 2345
No Logo TANIA VARGAS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Allen Thompson +1 612 571 2345
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Ann Watts +1 202 616 4099 lisa.a.watts@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/1/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $250000
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 4/24/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $26,037.21, was mailed on September 10, 2001, to Paul A. Thompson, Esquire, attorney for petitioners. See letter in file. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 17 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001
    Certified copy of judgment solely awarding counsel fees and expenses, forwarded to HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 16 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001
      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded, in addition to the compensation judgment of April 24, 2001, attorneys' fees and costs in the amount of $26,037.21. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 15 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 Published Decision of Special Master - Fees
        Decision of Special Master George L. Hastings Jr. re: fees. Copy to parties. (DS)
          LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001 notice of filing
          Notice of filing Petitioner's Revised Claim for Fees and Costs by PATRICIA VARGAS. Service: 6/29/01 (AB)
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001 Status Report
            STATUS REPORT in response to amended application for fees and costs by HHS. Service: 7/3/01 (AB)
              LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/22/2001 Satisfaction of Judgment
              SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $250,000.00, was mailed on June 13, 2001 to Paul Thompson, Esquire, attorney for the petitioners. See letter in file. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 11 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001 Motion for Attorney Fees
                MOTION by PATRICIA VARGAS (Service : 6/5/01 ) for Attorney Fees Response due: 6/22/01 (AB)
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 Judgment Forwarded (Election)
                  Certified copy of election and judgment forwarded to HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 Petitioner's Election
                    PETITIONER'S ELECTION to accept Judgment. Service: 5/14/01 Election(y/n): y (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: 4/24/2001
                      JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded compensation in the amount of $250,000.00.(Signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: 4/24/2001
                        Case closed (LD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 7 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 DECISION of Special Master
                          Decision of Special Master George L. Hastings Jr. . Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 6 Filed: 3/9/2001, Entered: 3/12/2001 Respondent's Report
                            RESPONDENT'S REPORT. Service: 3/9/01. (LTD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/16/2001 notice of filing
                              Notice of filing [Petitioners exhibits 16 - 18] by PATRICIA VARGAS, TANIA VARGAS. Service: 2/12/01. (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Lisa Ann Willett. Service: 12/12/00. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: 12/13/2000 Order
                                  ORDER re: Initial Order (signed by Special Master George L. Hastings Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 12/1/2000, Entered: 12/1/2000
                                    NOTICE OF assignment to Special Master George L. Hastings Jr. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/1/2000, Entered: 12/5/2000 Petition
                                      PETITION (Filed with Exhibits 1 through 15) by PATRICIA VARGAS, as parent and natural guardian of TANIA VARGAS, deceased. FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #050862, Vac. Date: 02/18/99 (Respondent's report due 3/1/01). (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2000, Entered: 12/1/2000
                                        CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 142 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?