TOWNSEND v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:00-vv-00728-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ELIZABETH D. PRECIE, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly L. Andersen, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kelly L. Andersen +1 541 773 7000 +1 541 608 0535 kelly@andersenlaw.com
No Logo KELLY TOWNSEND, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly L. Andersen, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kelly L. Andersen +1 541 773 7000 +1 541 608 0535 kelly@andersenlaw.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tami Coette Parker +1 202 616 4122 +1 817 252 5458 tami.parker@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/4/2000
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 4/30/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 21(a)(1), that the petition is dismissed. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001
    Case closed (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001 ~Notice (other)
      NOTICE of dismissal by KELLY TOWNSEND, ELIZABETH D. PRECIE Service: 4/20/01 (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001 Order
        ORDER directing the clerk to file the copy of the letter attached and treat it as a notice of dismissal under Rule 21(a)(1). ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (LD)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 Status Report/Order
          STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 4/16/01 (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (LTD)
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001 Status Report
            STATUS REPORT by KELLY TOWNSEND, ELIZABETH D. PRECIE. Service: 2/26/01. (LTD)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Scheduling Order
              SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status Report due: 2/26/01 ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Additional Documentation
                Additional Documentation: Supplemental Medical Records (Exhibits 8-10) by KELLY TOWNSEND Service: 1/11/01 (AB) Modified on 01/17/2001
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001
                  Expert Report: Supplemental Affidavit of Michael S. Narus, M.D. (Exhibit 11) by KELLY TOWNSEND Service: 1/5/01 (AB)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001 Scheduling Order
                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status Conference set for: 2:00 p.m. 1/12/01 (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 Order
                      ORDER scheduling Status Conference for 2:00 p.m, (EST) 1/11/01 ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/2/2001
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by KELLY TOWNSEND, ELIZABETH D. PRECIE and HHS. Service: 12/20/00 (AB)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Tami Coette Parker. Service: 12/14/00. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 12/8/2000, Entered: 12/12/2000 Order
                            ORDER set joint Status Report deadline to 12/20/00. ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 12/4/2000, Entered: 12/6/2000 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                              NOTICE OF assignment to Special Master John F. Edwards. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 12/4/2000, Entered: 12/6/2000 Petition
                                PETITION by KELLY TOWNSEND as guardian ad litem for ELIZABETH D. PRECIE, a minor. FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #050868, Vac. Date: 12/02/97 (Respondent's report due 3/4/01). (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/4/2000, Entered: 12/6/2000 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                  CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 152 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?