NORTH COUNTY LEGION v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:01-cv-00034-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo NORTH COUNTY LEGION CHARITIES, INC., Plaintiff

Represented by Law Offices of Thomas E. Moseley

v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Charles Rapp +1 202 307 0503 william.c.rapp2@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/18/2001
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 202 - Tax - Declaratory Judgment 28:1507
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/1/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/2/2002 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal by NORTH COUNTY LEGION and USA. Complaint dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(ii). Copy to parties. (AB)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/2/2002 Terminated Case
    Case closed (AB)
      LREF
      Blank 19 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [18-1] motion to Extend Time to file Motion for Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment due 4/24/02 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
        LREF
        Blank 18 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002, Terminated: 3/26/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
        MOTION by NORTH COUNTY LEGION (Service: 3/21/02) to Extend Time to file Motion for Judgment until 4/24/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 17 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Extend Time to file motion for judgment Motion Filing deadline to 3/25/02 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 16 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002, Terminated: 2/27/2002 Terminated:
            MOTION by NORTH COUNTY LEGION (Service: 2/21/02) to Extend Time to file motion for judgment , (until March 25, 2002). Response due: 3/11/02. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 15 Filed: 12/27/2001, Entered: 1/23/2002 ~Notice (other)
              NOTICE of no objection to the administrative record by NORTH COUNTY LEGION Service: 12/19/01 (AB)
                LREF
                Blank 14 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/20/2001 Administrative Record
                Administrative record, consisting of one volume, filed by USA. Service: 11/9/01 (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 13 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time to file the Administrative Record Administrative Record due 11/16/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 12 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001, Terminated: 10/18/2001 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service: 10/17/01) to Extend Time to file the Administrative Record until 11/16/01. Response due: 11/5/01 (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 11 Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: 9/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to file the Administrative Record Administrative Record is due on 10/17/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 10 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001, Terminated: 9/18/2001 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service: 9/14/01) to Extend Time to file the Administrative Record until 10/17/01. Response due: 10/1/01. (LTD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001
                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume (18 pages), at Washington, D.C., for date of July 17, 2001 Notice to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 8 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001 Court Filing
                            ORDER Administrative Record is due on 9/17/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 Status Conference
                              Status Conference held ( Transcript due 8/16/01 ) (DS)
                                LREF
                                Blank 7 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:30 a.m. on 7/17/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Joint Preliminary Status ReportCourt Filing
                                  JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT, by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: 3/20/2001 Answer
                                    ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 3/19/01 (JPSR due 5/7/01). (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William Charles Rapp. Service: 2/21/01. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 Court Filing
                                        ORDER directing parties to confer and arrange for preliminary status conference; identifying filing requirements for conference (if defendant intends to proceed by motion in lieu of an answer a memorandum shall be filed no later than 10 days before the conference); and precluding the filing of dispositive motions until after the conference has been held. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Court Filing
                                          Notice of assignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001
                                            COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #051088. Answer due on 3/19/01. (FE)
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 166 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?