GLAMORGAN COAL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:01-cv-00045-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Glamorgan Coal Company, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Martin Rolfe +1 804 788 8200 rrolfe@hunton.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/22/2001
Jury Demand
Demand $428000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to U.S. Agency
County
Terminated 9/24/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/30/2003 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. Service: 9/24/03.(dw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 Court Filing
    Notice of reassignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges . Copy to parties. (DS)
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/3/2001
      AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by USA : amends [5-1] answer by USA. Service: 8/30/01. (LTD)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/3/2001 Court Filing
        ORDER granting [10-1] motion for Leave to file the separately submitted amended answer (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
          REPLY by USA to response to [10-1] motion for Leave to file the separately submitted amended answer. Service: 9/21/01. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001 Response to Motion
            RESPONSE by GLAMORGAN COAL (Service: 9/17/01) to [10-1] motion for Leave to file the separately submitted amended answer. Reply due: 10/2/01. (LTD)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001, Terminated: 10/3/2001 Motion for Leave to File
              MOTION by USA (Service: 8/30/01) for Leave to file the separately submitted amended answer (with status report). Response due: 9/17/01. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001, Terminated: 10/3/2001
                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 8/30/01. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001 Court Filing
                  STATUS REPORT by GLAMORGAN COAL. Service: 7/3/01. [Response to defendant's motion for transfer of this case to Judge Hodges and Suggestions for further proceedings] (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                    MOTION by USA (Service: 6/19/01) for transfer of this case to Judge Hodges . Response due: 7/6/01. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 Status Report
                      STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/19/01. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER staying (suspending proceedings) pending final resolution of United States c. Cyprus Amax Coal Co., No. 00-360. Parties shall file a status report every 90 days. (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                          JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: 3/20/2001 Answer
                            ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 3/19/01 (JPSR due 5/7/01). (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Charles Stoddart. Service : 2/15/01. (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Notice of Related Cases
                                NOTICE by GLAMORGAN COAL of related case: (00-148 T). (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                  Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #051123. Answer due on 3/23/01. (FE)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 165 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?