OMAHA PUBLIC POWER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:01-cv-00115-SGB
District Judge Susan G. Braden, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo OMAHA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marian Elizabeth Sullivan +1 202 307 0365 +1 202 307 2503 marian.sullivan@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/2/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 8/11/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, SNF
  Entries (204) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 188 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 Court Filing
ORDER Directing the Clerk to Return Mr. Peterson's Motion to Intervene Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (gbb)
    LREF
    Legal Document 187 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 Court Filing
    ORDER RETURNING MOTION TO INTERVENE Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (gbb)
      LREF
      Legal Document 186 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006
      STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT, USA.. (Chu, Jack)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006 Terminated Case - Public
        Complaint dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls )
          LREF
          Legal Document 185 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Court Filing
          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 5/8/2006 11:00 AM before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (sf2, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 184 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 Court Filing
            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 3/28/06 at 11:00 AM before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (sf2, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 183 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Court Filing
              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Status Conference rescheduled from 2/13/06 to 2/14/06 at 11:00am before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (sf2, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 182 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Court Filing
                PUBLISHED OPINION on [48] Motion to Dismiss filed by USA. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden.(sf2, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 181 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Court Filing
                  ORDER STAYING CASE. The court will convene a telephone status conference on 2/13/06 at 2:00 p.m. E.S.T. to reschedule a trial date at the parties convenience. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden.(sf2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005
                    ORDER Striking [180]. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (sf2, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 180 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Court Filing
                      ORDER STAYING CASE. The court will convene a telephone status conference on 2/13/06 at 2:00 p.m. E.S.T. to reschedule a trial date at the parties convenience. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (sf2, ) STRICKEN PER ORDER OF NOVEMBER 18, 2005. Modified on 11/18/2005 (dls, ).
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 179 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005
                        NOTICE, filed by USA of Filing of Proposed Order (Sullivan, Marian)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 178 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Court Filing
                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 11/15/05 4:00 PM before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (sf2, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 177 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Marian Elizabeth Sullivan for USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                              *** Attorney Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr terminated. (dls )
                                LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 176 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                **SEALED**NOTICE of Filing Expert Reports, filed by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT. Service: 10/18/2005.(mb2, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 175 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Court Filing
                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:A telephone status conference will be held before Judge Susan G. Braden.on September 13, 2005 at 2 p.m., EST. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cw2, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 174 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting [173] Motion for Leave to File Expert Reports Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cw2, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 173 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005, Terminated: 9/8/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                      MOTION for Leave to File Expert Reports Under Seal and Request for Order Preserving Post-Trial Damages filed by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT. Response due by 9/19/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1 - SMUD Order)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 172 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Yee-Chieh Chu (Chu, Jack)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 171 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005 Court Filing
                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Close of fact discovery 4/1/06; close of expert discovery 4/1/06; plaintiff to provide expert report by 9/1/05; defendant to provide expert report by 1/13/06; rebuttal expert reports by 2/1/06; meeting of counsel 4/13/06; plaintiff memorandum of contentions of law and fact 5/1/06; defendant's responsive memorandum 5/31/06; pretrial conference 6/30/06; trial 7/10-21/06. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden.(ec1,)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005 Set/Reset Hearings
                                            Set/Reset Hearings: pretrial conference set for 6/30/2006 and trial set for 7/10/2006 - 7/21/06. (jat, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                              Set/Reset Deadlines:fact discovery - 4/1/06; expert discovery 4/1/06; plaintiff's expert report - 9/1/05; defendant's expert report - 1/13/06; rebuttal expert reports - 2/1/06; plaintiff's memorandum of contentions of law and fact - 5/1/06; and defendant's responsive memorandum - 5/31/06. (jat, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 170 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Telephone Status Conference set for 3/15/2005 05:00 PM EST before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1,)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 169 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Court Filing
                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Telephone Status Conference set for 3/7/2005 03:30 PM before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1,)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 168 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005 Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [165] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden.(ec1,)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 167 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [165] Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1,)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 166 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005
                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [120] Cross Motion For Partial Summary Judgment On The Acceptance Rate filed by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Appendix To Plaintiff's Reply In Support of Its Cross-Motion For Partial Summary Judgment On The Acceptance Rate)(Chu, Jack)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 165 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005, Terminated: 2/18/2005 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit
                                                          MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Plaintiff's Reply In Support Of Its Cross-Motion For Partial Summary Judgment On The Acceptance Rate by 35 pages by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT. Response due by 3/4/2005 (Chu, Jack)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 164 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005
                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: [161] Order, Dated December 22, 2004 by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5))(Lester, Harold)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 163 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [162] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's supplemental brief on the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance issue is now due on or before February 1, 2005. Plaintiff's reply brief is now due on or before February 15, 2005. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1,)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's supplemental brief on the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance issues due by 2/1/2005. Plaintiff's reply to defendant's supplemental brief due by 2/15/2005. (jat, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 162 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005, Terminated: 2/1/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                First MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/1/2005 to File Defendant's Supplemental Brief Relating To The Rate Of Spent Nuclear Fuel Acceptance, Pursuant To The Court's December 22, 2004 Order by USA. Response due by 2/14/2005 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 161 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004 Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER setting schedule for supplemental briefing on motion and cross motion for summary judgment on rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance. Defendant's supplemental brief due on 1/28/05. Plaintiff's supplemental brief due on 2/11/05. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1,)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's Supplemental Reply Brief due by 2/11/2005. Defendant's Supplemental Response Brief due by 1/28/2005. (dw1)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 160 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004 Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER AFFIRMING THAT STAY HAS BEEN LIFTED. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1,)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 159 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: 12/13/2004 Court Filing
                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Telephone Status Conference set for 12/14/2004 03:30 PM before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1,)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 158 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: 12/9/2004 Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER. Pursuant to Rule 40.1(c) of the Rules of the Court of Federal Claims and a random selection determined by the Office of the Clerk of the Court, this case is hereby reassigned to Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (sms)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 157 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004
                                                                            NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jcp, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004
                                                                              ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES [151] Dft's Second Motion to Renew its Motion toConsolidate as well as its previous motions relating to consolidation. The Court further LIFTS THE STAY of the remainder of the cases to which the Order of 4/16/2003, applied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket this Order in this case with an entry noting the same on the dockets of the remaining SNFcases captioned in Dft's instant motion, with a courtesy copy to all SNF parties and presiding SNF judges of the Court. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 156 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                NOTICE of Counsel for Dft's Change of Telephone and Facsimile Numbers by USA. Service: 12/2/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 155 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER re: all filings in this case relating to issues of consolidation shall be captioned solely in the name of this case and shall show the name of the presiding judge in this case. A courtesy copy of any such filing relating to issues of consolidation shall be provided to the Clerk's Office for transmission to the Chief Judge. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (jat, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 154 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                    REPLY to Pltfs' Responses to [151] Dft's Second MOTION to the Chief Judge to Renew Consideration of Dft's Motion to Consolidate, filed by USA. Service: 9/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 153 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [152] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Responses to [151] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate. Reply due by 9/3/2003. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (jcp, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 152 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003, Terminated: 9/10/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Response to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA.Service: 9/3/03. Response due by 9/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                          MOTION to the Chief Judge for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C]Service: 8/26/03. Response due by 9/12/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                            OPPOSITION to [151] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate filed by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT. [Original document located in Case No. 98-483C] Reply due by 8/29/2003. Service: 8/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003
                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/15/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Remark
                                                                                                Dft's Motion to the Chief Judge for Leave to Correct Certificate of Service and to Waive Requirements of RCFC 5.3 Regarding "Dft's Second Motion [to the Chief Judge] to Renew its Motion to Consolidate." (Original Motion located in Case No. 98-126C) (jcp, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 151 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                  SECOND MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate by USA. [COPY] (Original Document in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 7/29/03 by hand. Response due by 8/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 150 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [147] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by 50 pages. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (hw1, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 149 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                      RESPONSE re [120] Cross Motion for partial summary judgment on the acceptance rate (together with separate appendix) filed by The United States. Reply due by 4/28/2003. Service: 4/11/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 148 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003
                                                                                                        RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by The United States. Service: 4/11/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 147 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003, Terminated: 4/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Reply Brief by 30 pages by The United States.Service by hand: 4/11/03. Response due by 4/25/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 146 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike portions of [120] Cross Motion by The United States.Service by hand: 4/11/03. Response due by 4/25/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 145 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER, re: further proceedings. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (lrd)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 144 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See orde rin 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 143 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003
                                                                                                                  Response by USA to [122-1] proposed findings by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER. Service: 3/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 142 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003
                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [49-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. Service: 3/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 141 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [140-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 140 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003, Terminated: 3/11/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 3/10/03) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 3/27/03. (FE)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 139 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER re: See order [612-1] dated 3/7/03, in case 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 138 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 137 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 136 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [135-1] motion for Leave to file response to the motion for leave to place filings under seal temporarily, denying [124-1] motion for Leave to place filings under seal temporarily (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 135 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003, Terminated: 2/21/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 2/14/03) for Leave to file response to the motion for leave to place filings under seal temporarily . Response due: 3/3/03. (FILED WITH RESPONSE TO THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PLACE FILINGS UNDER SEAL TEMPORARILY). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 134 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 133 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 132 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [48-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of the complaint. Service: 1/30/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 131 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 130 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER - see 98-126 C for order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 129 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER (Service: 1/15/03) to [126-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion for summary judgment, reply to the motion for summary judgment regarding Greater-Than-Class-C radioactive waste and reply to the motion to dismiss its takings claim. Reply due: 1/21/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 128 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [126-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion for summary judgment, reply to the motion for summary judgment regarding Greater-Than-Class-C radioactive waste and reply to the motion to dismiss its takings claim Defendant's reply to motion to dismiss takings claim due 1/30/03 , Defendant's reply to Plaintiffs' response to its Greater-Than-Class C radioactive waste brief due 3/11/03 , Defendant's reply to responses to the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance summary judgment motion due 3/28/03 , and Defenant's reply and response its cross-motions regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance due 4/11/03 (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 127 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 126 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003, Terminated: 1/14/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/03) to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion for summary judgment, reply to the motion for summary judgment regarding Greater-Than-Class-C radioactive waste and reply to the motion to dismiss its takings claim until? Response due: 1/21/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 125 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/6/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER to response to [107-1] motion for the government to acknowledge its liability on the issue of partial breach of contract. Service: 12/30/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 124 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/3/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER (Service : 12/30/02 ) for Leave to place filings under seal temporarily . Response due: 1/13/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 123 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [112-1] motion for Leave to File Missing Appendix Table of Contents. ( signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 122 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, re: Greater than Class C radioactive waste arguments by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER. Service: 12/16/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 121 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FaCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Response by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER to [50-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 12/16/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 120 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                CROSS MOTION, with appendix, by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER (Service: 12/13/02) and RESPONSE to [56-1] motion for partial summary judgment by USA. Response due: 1/14/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 119 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [110-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 118 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                    Response by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER to [57-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 12/13/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 117 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact in support of its cross-motion for partial summary judgment on the acceptance rate by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER. Service: 12/13/02. (LTD) Modified on 12/19/2002
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 116 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER. Service: 12/13/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 115 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FaCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Response by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER to [50-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 12/13/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 114 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE, with appendix, by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER (Service: 12/13/02) to [49-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. Reply due: 12/30/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; Response to [120-1] cross motion 1/14/03 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 113 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/16/02) to [107-1] motion for the government to acknowledge its liability on the issue of partial breach of contract. Reply due: 1/2/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 112 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002, Terminated: 12/19/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER (Service : 12/16/02 ) for Leave to File Missing Appendix Table of Contents. Response due: 1/2/03 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 111 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER (Service: 12/13/02 ) to [48-1] motion to Dismiss COunt III of the complaint. Reply due: 12/30/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 110 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002, Terminated: 12/17/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER (Service: 12/13/02) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 12/30/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 109 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/20/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER (Service: 11/15/02) to [104-1] motion for an order setting 11/25/02, as the deadline for plaintiff to respond to the government's summary judgment motions. Reply due: 12/2/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 108 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part, denying in part [104-1] motion for an order setting 11/25/02, as the deadline for plaintiff to respond to the government's summary judgment motions; directing plaintiff to respond to [49-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment and [56-1] motion for partial summary judgment by 12/16/02 ; defnedant to file its replies to responses to [49-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment and [56-1] motion for partial summary judgment by 1/10/03 ; defendant to respond to [107-1] motion for the government to acknowledge its liability on the issue of partial breach of contract and file a Notice (and any dispositive motion) re: issue of plaintiff's standing to bring suit by 12/16/02 . ( signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 107 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                            RENEWED MOTION for partial summary judgment on liability by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER filed [by leave of the judge] as RENEWED MOTION (Service: 11/8/02) for the government to acknowledge its liability on the issue of partial breach of contract . Response due: 11/25/02 (included in plaintiff's status report) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 107 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 11/8/02 (also includes renewed motion) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 106 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. . Service: 11/1/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 105 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Service : (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 104 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002, Terminated: 11/14/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 11/1/02) for an order setting 11/25/02, as the deadline for plaintiff to respond to the government's summary judgment motions . Response due: 11/18/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 103 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 102 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126c (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 97 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 95 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 94 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: see order [467-1] dated 7/29/02, in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 91 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 90 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER - see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C.(signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, Re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/6/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/03/03. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 80 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: See [395-1] order in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: see order [344-2] dated 4/11/02 in Case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: see order in 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying motion to preclude or, in the alternative, defer, depositions pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion to extend time to respond to interrogatories until 3/8/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See Case No. 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying motion to reconsider filed 1/22/02 and granting the motion to revise dates in 9/26/01 order filed 1/24/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. See order in 98-126C filed 2/1/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 2/12/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 1/11/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 01/03/02 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: 1/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying as moot [58-1] motion to Extend Time to file a response to the Motion for partial Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001, Terminated: 1/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER (Service: 12/21/01) to Extend Time to file a response to the Motion for partial Summary Judgment until 1/25/02. Response due: 1/7/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact filed by USA. Service by hand: 11/28/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION, together with a separate volume of appendix, by USA for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance. Response due: 1/17/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [52-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [53-1] motion for a status conference and staying Plaintiff's response to dispositive motions (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001, Terminated: 12/19/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER (Service: 12/14/01) for a status conference . Response due: 1/2/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001, Terminated: 12/20/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/28/01) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 12/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Bryant Steven Banes Service : 11/28/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact regarding plaintiff's greater than Class C radioactive waste arguments filed by USA. Service by hand: 11/27/01. (LTD) Modified on 12/16/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION, with one volume of Appendix, by USA (Service by hand: 11/27/01) for partial Summary Judgment regarding plaintiff's greater than Class C radioactive waste arguments. Response due: 12/26/01. (LTD) Modified on 12/16/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/28/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/27/01) to Dismiss COunt III of the complaint . Response due: 12/26/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/20/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER see order 98-126C filed 11/16/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. See 98-126 C ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to respond to motion to compel production of documents to 11/06/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: Public Service Electric and Gas motion to extend time filed on 11/2/01, within which to respond to the defendant's motion to compel is GRANTED (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein) Copy to parties. (see motion filed in 98-126C) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to complete production of documents to 11/19/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [25-1] motion for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order. Individual Judges retain the right to decide dispositive motions. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: proposed stipulated order, etc. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [26-1] motion for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. and granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file copies of response to the transfer motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of supplemental certificate of service by USA. Service: 10/19/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 10/19/01) to Compel . Response due: 11/5/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Service: 10/19/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: All filings shall bear the name of the discovery Judge, all matters to be brought to the attention of the Court shall be filed with the discovery Judge only, the Clerk of the Court is directed not to accept for filing any motion by a party in one of the captioned cases for leave to file material with a Judge in an individual case ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 10/16/01) to Compel . Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/2/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/16/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file Defendant's response and Defendant's corrected certificate of service due 10/25/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: Defendant's motion to extend time filed on 10/15/01, within which to file the proposed stipulated order concerning the scheduling and conduct of depositions in the coordinated discovery proceeding, is GRANTED, see motion in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: 10/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [27-1] motion for Leave to file motion that the utility plaintiff's have filed with the discovery Judge (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: 10/16/2001, Terminated: 10/15/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER (Service by hand: 10/10/01) for Leave to file motion that the utility plaintiff's have filed with the discovery Judge , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 10/24/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001, Terminated: 10/29/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 10/10/01) for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. Response due: 10/29/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001, Terminated: 11/1/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER (Service by hand: 10/9/01) for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order . Response due: 10/23/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages Plan is to be filed by 10/22/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001, Terminated: 10/3/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 10/1/01) to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages until 10/22/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: The Joint Motion for an Order for Consolidated Discovery filed on 7/10/01, is granted, with the exception of document production, the parties are granted an enlargement of time until 10/1/01, to submit a plan addressing the production of e-mail messages (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: The parties shall file a STATUS REPORT 30 days after the conclusion of discovery (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER setting Status Conference for 4:00 p.m. on 9/20/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 9/4/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER to [13-2] order. Reply due: 9/14/01. Service: 8/31/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting motion for protective order in the form provided by Exhibit A of the parties 08/10/01 motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). See case number 98-126 C for motion. Protective order in 98-458 C is also granted, subject to reconsideration by assigned judge. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA to [13-2] order of August 7, 2001. Service: 8/20/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 9/11/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein, Discovery Judge). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT MOTION for an order for coordinated discovery . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION (Service: 7/9/01) for Leave to file proposed order concerning liability in SPENT NUCLEAR FUEL cases . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [12-1] motion for Leave to file in this case a copy of filings made before Judge Wiese as managing judge, denying [5-1] motion to Stay Defendant shall show cause by 8/20/01, plaintiff shall respond by 8/31/01 and defendant shall reply by 9/14/01 , and the motion for protective order is DENIED as moot (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001, Terminated: 8/7/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER (Service: 7/13/01) for Leave to file in this case a copy of filings made before Judge Wiese as managing judge . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Copy of Yankee Atomic's Motion for Leave to file documents relevant to the telephone conference with Judge Wiese. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER resetting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 6/14/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER scheduling Status Conference for 10:30 a.m., 6/14/01 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: On 1/8/2001, Dft filed a Motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 CFR part 961. The Chief Judge hereby designates Judge Wiese as the managing judge in the above cited cases for the purpose of meeting with the parties to consider whether consolidation or other joint handling of discovery or other pre-trial matters is appropriate. Judge Wiese is requested to formulate a management plan, if one is appropriate, and is authorized to make appropriate rulings with respect to this purpose. Designating Judge Wiese as managing judge over cases involving alleges breaches of standard contract, etc. (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). See 98-126. Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 3/17/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 5/17/2001, Entered: 5/18/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER (Service: 5/17/01) to [5-1] motion to Stay. Reply due: 5/31/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [5-2] motion for Leave to file copies of pleadings related to the motion filed on 01/08/01 ( signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/3/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 4/30/01) to Stay , and for Leave to file copies of pleadings related to the motion filed on 01/08/01 . Response due: 5/17/01. (LTD) Modified on 05/03/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: 3/15/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. Service: 3/14/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: 3/2/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by OMAHA PUBLIC POWER of related cases. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: 3/2/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of assignment to Judge Lynn J. Bush. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: 3/2/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #051315. Answer due on 5/1/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 208 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?