NEBRASKA PUBLIC v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:01-cv-00116-FMA
District Judge Francis M. Allegra, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Nebraska Public Power District, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr. +1 202 616 0478 +1 202 307 2503 harv.lester@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/2/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '07-5083'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, IAPPEAL, SNF
  Entries (252) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 230 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
RESPONSE to [229] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by NEBRASKA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Chu, Jack)
    LREF
    Legal Document 229 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
    MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
      LREF
      Legal Document 228 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007, Terminated: 1/30/2008 Motion to InterveneCourt Filing
      MOTION to Intervene, filed by William D. Peterson(filed by leave of the Judge).Response due by 8/27/2007.(mij, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2007 (mij, ).
        LREF
        Legal Document 227 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Court Filing
        ORDER Denying Motion to Intervene Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis)
          LREF
          Legal Document 226 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007
          RESPONSE to Mr. William (Bill) Peterson's Motion To Intervene And Complaint, dated April 7, 2007, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
            LREF
            Legal Document 225 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 CAFC Case Number
            CAFC Case Number 07-5083 for [224] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by NEBRASKA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT. (hw1, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 224 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: 3/13/2007 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal
              NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL, filed by NEBRASKA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 066261. Copies to opposing party, judge and CAFC. (hw1, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 223 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: 3/13/2007 CAFC Order
                Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit ORDER granting permission to file an interlocutory appeal. (hw1, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 222 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Court Filing
                  PUBLISHED ORDER on [214] MOTION to Certify Interlocutory Appeal filed by NEBRASKA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006
                    ORDER: a status conference that was scheduled for Thursday, December 21, 2006, at 10:00 a.m. (EST) has been cancelled. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 221 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006 Court Filing
                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/21/2006 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 220 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006
                        RESPONSE to [214] MOTION to Certify Interlocutory Appeal and defendant's motion to suspend briefing on unavoidable delays, filed by USA.Reply due by 12/26/2006. (Lo Re, Alan)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 219 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 Court Filing
                          ORDER granting [218] MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/11/2006 to File Response or Reply as to [214] MOTION to Certify Interlocutory Appeal. Response due by 12/11/2006. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 218 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006, Terminated: 12/1/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                            MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/11/2006 to File Response or Reply as to [214] MOTION to Certify Interlocutory Appeal, filed by USA.Response due by 12/18/2006.(Lester, Harold)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 217 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 216 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 Court Filing
                                ORDER granting [215]Motion for Extension of Time. Brief on the unavoidable delays clause due by 12/11/2006. Response to defendant's brief due by 1/5/2007. Reply to plaintiff's response due by 1/26/2007. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 215 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006, Terminated: 11/21/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/11/2006 to To File The Government's Brief In Response To The Court's October 31, 2006 Order, filed by USA.Response due by 12/7/2006.(Lester, Harold)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 214 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006, Terminated: 12/19/2006 Motion to Certify Interlocutory Appeal
                                    MOTION to Certify Interlocutory Appeal, filed by NEBRASKA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT.Response due by 11/30/2006.(Chu, Jack)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 213 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Court Filing
                                      PUBLISHED OPINION. Defendant brief on unavoidable dealys clause due by 11/20/2006. Plaintiff response to defendant's brief due by 12/15/2006. Defendant reply to plaintiff's response due 1/5/2007. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 212 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006, Terminated: 1/30/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                        MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority, filed by USA.Response due by 10/30/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of supplemental authority)(Averbach, Andrew)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 211 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006
                                          RESPONSE to [208] Supplemental Brief in Response to the Court's Order of June 2, 2006, filed by NEBRASKA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 210 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006
                                            RESPONSE to [209] Supplemental Brief, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 209 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006
                                              SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: [204] Scheduling Order, filed by NEBRASKA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 208 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006
                                                SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: [204] Scheduling Order, filed by USA. (Averbach, Andrew)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 207 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006, Terminated: 7/7/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/12/2006 to File Response or Reply as to [204] Scheduling Order (Paragraph (1)(a) & (1)(b)), filed by USA.Response due by 7/24/2006.(Lester, Harold)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006
                                                    ORDER granting [207] Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Briefs. Simultaneous briefs due by 7/12/2006.Simultaneous replies due by 7/31/2006. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 206 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                      CORRECTED (LIVE TAPE) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 1, 2006 before Judge Francis M. Allegra. (dw1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 205 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                        (LIVE TAPE) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 1, 2006 before Judge Francis M. Allegra. The following transcript was transcribed from a digital recording provided by the U.S. Court of Federal Claims to Heritage Reporting Corporation on June 2, 2006. (dw1) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/8/2006 (dw1, ).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 204 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006 Court Filing
                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER:Supplemental brief due by 7/7/2006; reply brief due by 7/24/2006. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 203 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006, Terminated: 5/17/2006 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                            MOTION to Amend Schedule to Defer Oral Argument Pending Federal Circuit Decision, filed by NEBRASKA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT.Response due by 6/5/2006.(Chu, Jack)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006
                                                              ORDER denying [203]Motion for Extension of Time. Oral Argument set for 6/1/2006 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 202 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006 Court Filing
                                                                ORDER Setting Hearing. Oral Argument set for 6/1/2006 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 201 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006
                                                                  RESPONSE to [199] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,, [190] Scheduling Order , titled "Defendant's Reply To Plaintiff's Response To The Court's October 14, 2005 Order", filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 200 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006
                                                                    RESPONSE to The Court's October 14, 2005 Order, filed by NEBRASKA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (PSEG 10-2005 Federal Circuit brief)# (2) Exhibit B (PSEG 1-2006 Federal Circuit brief))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 199 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [198] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [198] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/3/2006 to File Response or Reply Response due by 2/3/2006. Reply due by 2/24/2006. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 198 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006, Terminated: 1/13/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/3/2006 to File Response or Reply, filed by NEBRASKA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT. Response due by 1/30/2006. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006
                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: . Response due by 1/30/2006. (mij, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 197 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: 12/27/2005
                                                                            RESPONSE to [196] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, [190] Scheduling Order, filed by USA. (Lo Re, Alan)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 196 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005 Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [195]Motion for Extension of Time. Brief due by 12/23/2005; response due 1/20/06; reply due 2/10/2006. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005
                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 1/20/2006 and Reply due by 2/10/2006. (jat, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 195 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005, Terminated: 12/16/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/23/05 to To Respond To The Court's October 14, 2005 Order, filed by USA. Response due by 1/3/2006. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 194 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting [193]Motion for Extension of Time. Brief due by 12/15/2005; response due 1/13/2006; reply due 2/3/2006. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 1/13/2006 and Reply due by 2/3/2006. (jat, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 193 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005, Terminated: 12/12/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until December 15, 2005 to to respond to Court order, filed by USA. Response due by 12/27/2005. (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 192 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [191] Motion for Extension of Time to submit briefing. Defendant shall file a supplemental brief by 12/9/2005. Plaintiff shall file its response to defendant's supplemental brief by 1/6/06. Defendant shall file its reply brief by 1/27/06. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005
                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response due by 1/6/2006 and Defendant's reply due by 1/27/2006. (jat, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 191 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005, Terminated: 11/15/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/9/2005 to Submit Briefing In Response To The Court's Order Dated October 14, 2005, filed by USA. Response due by 12/1/2005. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 190 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Brief on mandamus issue due by 11/14/2005;Response due by 12/12/2005; Reply due by 1/3/2006. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 189 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005
                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [188] Order filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix)(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 188 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER: Counsel for defendant shall file the writ of mandamus issued by October 13, 2005. Notice of Compliance due by 10/13/2005. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005
                                                                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/11/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 187 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 8, 2005 before Judge Francis M. Allegra. (dw1)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 186 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005
                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to [179] Supplemental Brief, Regarding "Unavoidable Delays" Clause filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 185 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER rescheduling Hearing on Motion. Oral Argument set for 9/8/2005 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 184 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: 8/12/2005
                                                                                                              RESPONSE to The Court's June 21, 2005 Order And Opposition To Defendant's Motion For Partial Reconsideration Of The Court's March 30, 2005 Order; Reply In Support Of Its Cross-Motion For Partial Summary Judgment On The Acceptance Rate; Supplemental Brief In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability; And Supplemental Brief In Opposition to Defendant's Motion To Dismiss Count III Of Complaint filed by NEBRASKA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix To Plaintiff's Reply In Support Of Its Cross-Motion For Partial Summary Judgment On The Acceptance Rate And Supplemental Brief On Liability)(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [183] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 183 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005, Terminated: 8/8/2005 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit
                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Plaintiff's Brief On "Unavoidable Delays" And Supplemental Brief On Outstanding Dispositive Motions by 25 pages filed by NEBRASKA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT. Response due by 8/22/2005. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 182 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/8/2005
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [181] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,, [173] Scheduling Order , And Motion For Partial Reconsideration Of The Court's March 30, 2005 Order filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 181 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [180] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's dispositive motion and brief due by 7/8/2005. Plaintiff's response due on or before 8/12/2005. Defendant's reply due 8/26/2005. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 180 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005, Terminated: 6/21/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                        Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/8/2005 to File Briefing Regarding The "Unavoidable Delays" Clause , Correcting Motion Filed On 6/17/2005 filed by USA. Response due by 7/8/2005. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motion Response due by 8/12/2005; Reply due by 8/26/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 179 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005
                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: [107] Motion for Summary Judgment, [53] Motion for Summary Judgment, [55] Motion for Summary Judgment, [49] Motion to Dismiss , As Contemplated By The Court's May 4, 2005 Order by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 178 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005, Terminated: 7/12/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/8/2005 to File Briefing Regarding The "Unavoidable Delays" Clause , as contemplated by the Court's May 4, 2005 Order filed by USA. Response due by 7/5/2005. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 177 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005, Terminated: 7/12/2005 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [175] Order on Motion to Amend Schedule, filed by USA. Response due by 7/1/2005. (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 176 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [49] Motion to Dismiss, [53] Motion for Summary Judgment, [55] Motion for Summary Judgment, [161]MOTION for Reconsideration re [160] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, [146] MOTION to Strike, [107] Motion for Summary Judgment, [108] Motion to Stay Motion for Extension of Time to File, [121] Cross Motion: Oral Argument set for 9/8/2005 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 175 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [174] Motion for Extension of Time. On or before June 14, 2005, defendant shall file a motion on the "unavoidable delay issue" and a brief; On or before July 19, 2005 Plaintiff shall file a brief; and on or before August 2, 2005, defendant shall file a reply. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion(s) due by 6/14/2005; Brief due by 7/19/2005; Reply due by 8/2/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 174 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005, Terminated: 6/7/2005 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [173] Scheduling Order filed by USA. Response due by 6/20/2005. (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 173 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant shall file a motion on the unavoidable delay issue and a brief by June 3, 2005; plaintiff Brief due by 7/8/2005; and Defendant Reply Brief due by 7/22/2005. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Motion and Brief due by 6/3/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 172 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/3/2005 02:00 PM via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 171 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Yee-Chieh Chu (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 170 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [165]Motion for Reconsideration and vacating January 31, 2005, opinion and order entered by Judge Sypolt. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 169 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by NEBRASKA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT Of Federal Circuit Order Regarding Plaintiff's Petition For Permission To Appeal (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (March 25, 2005 Federal Circuit Order))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 168 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [165] MOTION for Reconsideration re [163] Published Opinion,, filed by USA. (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 167 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER respond to motion [165] Motion for Reconsideration. On or before March 14, 2005, defendant shall file its response to plaintiff's motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 3/14/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 166 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by NEBRASKA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 165 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005, Terminated: 3/30/2005 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration re [163] Published Opinion,, by NEBRASKA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 164 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Francis M. Allegra. (dls )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to RCRC 40.1(c), for the efficient administration of justice, this case is reassigned to Judge Francis M. Allegra for all further proceedings. Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 163 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  PUBLISHED OPINION. Transferring plaintiffs Florida Power and Duke Power's breach of contract claims to the D.C. Circuit, dismissing plaintiffs Nebraska Public Power and PSEG Nuclear's breach of contract claims for lack of jurisdiction, certifying this opinion so that the parties may bring an interlocutory appeal to the Federal Circuit pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(c)(1); and staying the plaintiffs' remaining claims pending resolution of the jurisdictional issues raised in this opinion on appeal. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (wf1, ) Modified on 2/4/2005 to include interlocutory language. (dls ). Modified on 3/30/2005 (jat, ). (VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER OF 3/30/05)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 162 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE TO [157] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Brief in opposition to petition for writ of cert in Consolidated Edison v. US# (2) Appendix Petition for writ of cert in US v. Northern States Power)(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 161 Filed: 12/30/2004, Entered: 12/30/2004, Terminated: 7/12/2005 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration re [160] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by USA. Response due by 1/18/2005 (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 160 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [159] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's response to plaintiffs' responses to the court's October 14, 2004 show cause order due by 1/4/2005. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt.(wf1, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 159 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004, Terminated: 12/27/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [158] Response to Order to Show Cause,until 1/14/2005, by USA. Response due by 1/3/2005 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 158 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE TO [157] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by NEBRASKA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix To Plaintiffs' Response To The Court's October 14, 2004 Order To Show Cause)(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 157 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why complaint should not be dismissed or transferred to the D.C. Circuit for lack of jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 11/12/2004. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (wf1, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 156 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES [150] Dft's Second Motion to Renew its Motion toConsolidate as well as its previous motions relating to consolidation. The Court further LIFTS THE STAY of the remainder of the cases to which the Order of 4/16/2003, applied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket this Order in this case with an entry noting the same on the dockets of the remaining SNFcases captioned in Dft's instant motion, with a courtesy copy to all SNF parties and presiding SNF judges of the Court. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 155 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Counsel for Dft's Change of Facsimile Number by USA. Service: 12/1/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 154 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that all filings in this case relating to issues of consolidation shall be captioned solely in the name of this case and shall show the name of the presiding judge in this case. A courtesy copy of any such filing relating to issued of consolidation shall be provided to the Clerk's Office for transmission to the Chief Judge. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 153 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Pltfs' Responses to [150] Dft's Second MOTION to the Chief Judge to Renew Consideration of Dft's Motion to Consolidate filed by USA, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 9/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 152 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [151] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltf's Opposition to [150] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate. The reply is filed by leave of the court. Reply due by 9/3/2003. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 151 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003, Terminated: 9/23/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consoldiate, until 9/3/03, by USA.Service: 9/3/03. Response due by 9/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to the Chief Judge for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C]Service: 8/26/03. Response due by 9/12/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION to [150] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate filed by NEBRASKA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT. [Original document located in Case No. 98-483C] Reply due by 8/29/2003. Service: 8/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/15/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                Dft's Motion to the Chief Judge for Leave to Correct Certificate of Service and to Waive Requirements of RCFC 5.3 Regarding "Dft's Second Motion [to the Chief Judge] to Renew its Motion to Consolidate." (Original Motion located in Case No. 98-126C) (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 150 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SECOND MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate by USA. [COPY] (Original Document in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 7/29/03 by hand. Response due by 8/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 149 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re [121] Cross Motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance rate (together with a separate appendix) filed by The United States. Reply due by 4/28/2003. Service: 4/11/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 148 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [145] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 147 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by The United States. Service: 4/11/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 146 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/18/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike portions of plaintiff's filings concerning the rate of acceptance of spent Nuclear fuel by The United States.Service: 4/11/03 by hand. Response due by 4/25/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 145 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003, Terminated: 4/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Reply Brief by 30 pages by The United States.Service by hand: 4/11/03. Response due by 4/25/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 144 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: further proceedings. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 143 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 142 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response by USA to [122-1] proposed findings by NEBRASKA PUBLIC. Service: 3/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 141 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [53-1] motion for Summary Judgment, re: Plaintiff's greater than Class C radioactive waste arguments. Service: 3/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 140 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [139-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 139 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003, Terminated: 3/13/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 3/10/03) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 3/27/03. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 138 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: See order [612-1] dated 3/7/03, in case 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 137 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [136-1] motion for Leave to remove filings under seal (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 136 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003, Terminated: 3/6/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by NEBRASKA PUBLIC (Service: 2/27/03) for Leave to remove filings under seal . Response due: 3/17/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 135 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt) . Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 134 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 132 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 131 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 130 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [49-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of the complaint. Service: 1/30/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 129 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 128 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - see 98-126 C for order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 127 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [124-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion for summary judgment, reply to the motion for summary judgment and reply to the motion to dismiss. Service: 1/21/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 126 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by NEBRASKA PUBLIC (Service: 1/15/03) to [124-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion for summary judgment, reply to the motion for summary judgment and reply to the motion to dismiss. Reply due: 1/30/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 124 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 1/10/03) to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion for summary judgment, reply to the motion for summary judgment and reply to the motion to dismiss . Response due: 1/27/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 133 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [119-1] motion for Leave to place filings under seal temporarily. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 125 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 123 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response by NEBRASKA PUBLIC to [54-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 12/16/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 122 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by NEBRASKA PUBLIC Service: 12/16/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 121 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CROSS MOTION by NEBRASKA PUBLIC (Service: 12/16/02) and RESPONSE to [55-1] motion for Summary Judgment, re: Rate of spent nuclear acceptance by USA (together with separate appendix). Response due: 1/16/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 120 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [113-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; Response to [121-1] cross motion reset to 1/16/03 . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 119 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/3/2003, Terminated: 1/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by NEBRASKA PUBLIC (Service : 12/30/02 ) for Leave to place filings under seal temporarily . Response due: 1/13/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 118 Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by NEBRASKA PUBLIC to response to [107-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability. Service: 12/26/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 117 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FaCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response by NEBRASKA PUBLIC to [52-1] proposed findings by USA (by leave of the Judge). Service: 12/16/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 116 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by NEBRASKA PUBLIC (regarding greater than class c radioactive waste arguments), by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/16/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 115 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by NEBRASKA PUBLIC (Service: 12/16/02 ) to [53-1] motion for Summary Judgment, re: Plaintiff's greater than Class C radioactive waste arguments (together with separate appendix), by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 1/2/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 114 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by NEBRASKA PUBLIC (Service: 12/16/02 ) to [49-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of the complaint. Reply due: 1/10/03 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 113 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002, Terminated: 1/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by NEBRASKA PUBLIC (Service: 12/16/02) For leave to exceed the page limitation for response to the motion for partial summary judgment. Response due: 1/2/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 112 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response by USA to [109-1] proposed findings by NEBRASKA PUBLIC. Service: 12/9/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 111 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/9/02) to [107-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability. Reply due: 12/26/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 110 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Response to [55-1] motion for Summary Judgment, re: Rate of spent nuclear acceptance due 12/16/02, [53-1] motion for Summary Judgment, re: Plaintiff's greater than Class C radioactive waste arguments due 12/16/02, [49-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of the complaint due 12/16/02 , and Reply to Response to Motion due 1/10/03 for [55-1] motion for Summary Judgment, re: Rate of spent nuclear acceptance, due 1/10/03 for [53-1] motion for Summary Judgment, re: Plaintiff's greater than Class C radioactive waste arguments, due 1/10/03 for [49-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of the complaint (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 109 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by NEBRASKA PUBLIC. Service: 11/6/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 108 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by NEBRASKA PUBLIC (Service: 11/6/02) to Stay briefing on the Government's motions until the court has ruled on liability or to Extend Time to respond to the Government's motions until 12/9/02. Response due: 11/25/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 107 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by NEBRASKA PUBLIC (Service: 11/6/02) for Summary Judgment on liability . Response due: 12/9/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 106 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow for Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 105 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 104 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 103 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 102 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 101 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 100 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 99 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 98 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 97 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: see order [467-1] dated 7/29/02, in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 96 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 95 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 94 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 93 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER; re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 92 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER - see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 91 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 90 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 89 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 88 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C.(signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, Re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/6/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/03/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 6/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [83-1] motion for Clarification of the order filed 2/14/02. The 30 day period established by the court's 2/14/02 order shall begin to run when the Discovery Judge has ruled on Plaintiff's pending Motion to Compel and defendant has produced any documents or conducted any additional depositions required by that ruling or by any other discovery rulings (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/30/2002, Terminated: 5/31/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by NEBRASKA PUBLIC (Service: 5/29/02) for Clarification of the order filed 2/14/02 . Response due: 6/17/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 82 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 81 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 80 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: See [395-1] order in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 79 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 78 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 77 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Diane Gilbert SYpolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 74 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 73 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: see order in 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying motion to preclude or, in the alternative, defer, depositions pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting motion to extend time to respond to interrogatories until 3/8/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See Case No. 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [60-1] motion to defer briefing on Government Motions. Plaintiff shall file response to the motions for summary judgment and the motion to dismiss within 30 days after it has complted discovery (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying motion to reconsider filed 1/22/02 and granting the motion to revise dates in 9/26/01 order filed 1/24/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. See order in 98-126C filed 2/1/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 2/12/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/23/02) to [60-1] motion to defer briefing on Government Motions. Reply due: 2/6/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002, Terminated: 2/14/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by NEBRASKA PUBLIC (Service: 1/18/02) to defer briefing on Government Motions . Response due: 2/4/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 1/11/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 01/03/02 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [56-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to the Motion for partial Summary Judgment Response to [53-1] motion for Summary Judgment, re: Plaintiff's greater than Class C radioactive waste arguments reset to 1/25/02 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001, Terminated: 1/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by NEBRASKA PUBLIC (Service: 12/21/01) to Extend Time to file response to the Motion for partial Summary Judgment until 1/25/02. Response due: 1/7/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION, with one volume of Appendix, by USA (Service: 11/28/01) for Summary Judgment, re: Rate of spent nuclear acceptance . Response due: 1/2/02 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, re: Rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance, by USA. Service: 11/28/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION, with one volume of Appendix, by USA (Service: 11/27/01) for Summary Judgment, re: Plaintiff's greater than Class C radioactive waste arguments . Response due: 12/28/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, re: Plaintiff's greater than Class C Radioactive Waster Arguments, by USA Service: 11/27/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [50-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation and to file an appendix in excess of 50 pages for Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgement regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance, granting [50-2] motion for Leave to file appendix in excess of 50 pages for Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgement regarding greater than Class C radioactive waste arguments (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001, Terminated: 12/11/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/28/01) For leave to exceed the page limitation and to file an appendix in excess of 50 pages for Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgement regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance and for Leave to file appendix in excess of 50 pages for Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgement regarding greater than Class C radioactive waste arguments . Response due: 12/12/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/27/01) to Dismiss Count III of the complaint . Response due: 12/26/01. (FE) Modified on 11/29/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/20/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER see order 98-126C filed 11/16/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. See 98-126 C ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to respond to motion to compel production of documents to 11/06/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: Public Service Electric and Gas motion to extend time filed on 11/2/01, within which to respond to the defendant's motion to compel is GRANTED (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (see motion filed in 98-126C) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to complete production of documents to 11/19/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [27-1] motion for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order. Individual Judges retain the right to decide on dispositive motions. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: proposed stipulated order, etc. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [28-1] motion for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. and granting the Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file copies of the response to the transfer motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of supplemental certificate of service by USA. Service: 10/19/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 10/19/01) to Compel . Response due: 11/5/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Service: 10/19/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: All filings shall bear the name of the discovery Judge, all matters to be brought to the attention of the Court shall be filed with the discovery Judge only, the Clerk of the Court is directed not to accept for filing any motion by a party in one of the captioned cases for leave to file material with a Judge in an individual case ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 10/16/01) to Compel . Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/2/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/16/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file Defendant's response and Defendant's corrected certificate of service due 10/25/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: Defendant's motion to extend time filed on 10/15/01, within which to file the proposed stipulated order concerning the scheduling and conduct of depositions in the coordinated discovery proceeding, is GRANTED, see motion in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: The plaintiff's motion for leave of Court to file a motion for clarification shall be returned unfiled for not complying with Rule 11 of the RCFC (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001, Terminated: 10/29/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 10/10/01) for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc Response due: 10/29/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001, Terminated: 11/1/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by NEBRASKA PUBLIC (Service by hand: 10/9/01) for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order . Response due: 10/23/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [25-1] motion to Extend Time to submit plan for production of e-mail messages Plan to be filed by 10/22/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001, Terminated: 10/3/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 10/1/01) to Extend Time to submit plan for production of e-mail messages until 10/22/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Heide Lynn Herrmann. Service: 9/26/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: The Joint Motion for an Order for Consolidated Discovery filed on 7/10/01, is granted, with the exception of document production, the parties are granted an enlargement of time until 10/1/01, to submit a plan addressing the production of e-mail messages (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER setting Status Conference for 4:00 p.m. on 9/20/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting motion for protective order in the form provided by Exhibit A of the parties 08/10/01 motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). See case number 98-126 C for motion. Protective order in 98-458 C is also granted, subject to reconsideration by assigned judge. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 9/11/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: 8/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: The stay entered on May 18, 2001, is lifted ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [17-1] motion for Leave to file in this case a copy of filings made before Judge Wiese as managing judge (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001, Terminated: 7/18/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by NEBRASKA PUBLIC (Service: 7/13/01) for Leave to file in this case a copy of filings made before Judge Wiese as managing judge . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Copy of Yankee Atomic's Motion for Leave to file documents relevant to the telephone conference with Judge Wiese. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER resetting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 6/14/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER scheduling Status Conference for 10:30 a.m., 6/14/01 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: On 1/8/2001, Dft filed a Motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 CFR part 961. The Chief Judge hereby designates Judge Wiese as the managing judge in the above cited cases for the purpose of meeting with the parties to consider whether consolidation or other joint handling of discovery or other pre-trial matters is appropriate. Judge Wiese is requested to formulate a management plan, if one is appropriate, and is authorized to make appropriate rulings with respect to this purpose. Designating Judge Wiese as managing Judge over cases invovling alleged breaches of the standard contract (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 3/17/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Copy of Defendant's reply to Plaintiff's response to the Motion to Reassign cases in 98-126. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Copy of Yankee Utilities' response to the Government's Motion to Reassign Cases filed in 98-126. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's response to the Motion to Reassign. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COPY OF MOTION TO REASSIGN TO A SINGLE JUDGE CASES INVOLVING ALLEGED BREACHES OF THE STANDARD CONTRACT PUBLISHED AT 10 C.F.R. PART 961 FILED IN YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC CO. (No. 98-126C). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Stay, granting [6-2] motion for Leave to file copies of pleadings related to the motion filed on 01/08/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 5/8/2001, Entered: 5/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER suspending decision on Defendant's motion filed on 5/1/01. Plaintiff not required to respond (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/3/2001, Terminated: 5/18/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 4/30/01) to Stay , and for Leave to file copies of pleadings related to the motion filed on 01/08/01 . Response due: 5/17/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: 3/20/2001 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER of Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein, directing parties to confer with each other and establishing the court's policies and procedures including, but not limited to, mandatory disclosure, limitations on discovery, enlargements of time, the content of the joint preliminary status report, and scheduling of an initial status conference. A typical schedule is provided. JPSR is due 45 days after answer is filed; and 15 days after the close of discovery, the parties shall file a JSR or dispositive motion. Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: 3/15/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. Service: 3/14/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: 3/2/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by NEBRASKA PUBLIC of related cases. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: 3/2/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of assignment to Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: 3/2/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #051316. Answer due on 5/1/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 156 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?