CHARLES v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:01-cv-00177-MCW
District Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DIANE CHARLES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KATOR, PARKS & WEISER, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Kator +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 mkator@katorparks.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lauren Springer Moore +1 202 616 0333 +1 202 514 8640 lauren.moore@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/27/2001
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 118 - Contract - Other (CDA)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 12/6/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (67) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 63 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls )
    LREF
    Blank 62 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [61] Motion for Extension of Time. Status Report due by 11/18/2005. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
      LREF
      Blank 61 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005, Terminated: 11/16/2005 Terminated:
      MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/18/2005 to File Joint Status Report , filed by DIANE CHARLES. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 11/4/2005. Response due by 11/21/2005. (mb2, )
        LREF
        Blank 60 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [59] Motion for Extension of Time. Status Report due by 11/4/2005. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
          LREF
          Blank 59 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005, Terminated: 10/26/2005 Terminated:
          MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/20/2005 to File Joint Status Report , filed by DIANE CHARLES. Service: 10/20/2005. Response due by 11/7/2005. (mb2, )
            LREF
            Blank 58 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
            STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 10/21/2005. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
              LREF
              Blank 57 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Joint Status Report
              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 10/6/2005.(mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 56 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 10/7/2005. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 55 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 Status Report
                  STATUS REPORT by DIANE CHARLES. Service: 9/23/05.(dw1)
                    LREF
                    Blank 54 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                    STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 9/23/2005. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 53 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Status Report
                      STATUS REPORT, filed by DIANE CHARLES. Service: 8/18/2005.(mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 52 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Springer Moore for USA. Service: 3/16/2004.(jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 51 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [50] Pltf's Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings for 60 days. If the parties fail to reach agreement, pltf will have 30 days from the expiration of the stay to file her opposition to dft's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 50 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004, Terminated: 2/5/2004 Terminated:
                            CONSENT MOTION to Stay Proceedings by DIANE CHARLES.Service: 1/28/2004. Response due by 2/17/2004. (jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 49 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [48] Motion to Stay. Plaintiff shall file her opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment 30 days after the stay has ended. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jat, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 48 Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: 10/24/2003, Terminated: 10/22/2003 Terminated:
                                CONSENT MOTION to Stay Proceedings by DIANE CHARLES.Service: 10/20/03. Response due by 11/6/2003.(jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 47 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                  NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 46 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to Rule 40.1(c) of the RCFC, which permits the Chief Judge to reassign any case if necessary for the efficient administration of justice, the Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign the above captioned case to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Judge John P. Wiese no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 45 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                      ORDER that [44] Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time, to and including 10/28/03, within which to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment is ALLOWED. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss due by 10/28/2003. (jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 44 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Terminated:
                                          CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/28/03 to file Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by DIANE CHARLES.Service: 6/20/03. Response due by 7/7/2003 (jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 43 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER denying [39] Motion to Strike the declarations of Susan Sherer and William Thompson from the [36] Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment for the reasons stated in the Defendant's June 9, 2003, opposition to Plaintiff's motion. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John P. Wiese : Telephone Conference held on 6/16/03. (jwg)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 42 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Response to Motion
                                                RESPONSE to [39] MOTION to Strike [36] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES. Reply due by 6/23/2003. Service: 6/9/03.(dw1, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/12/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment due by 8/29/2003 and Discovery shall be completed by 7/30/2003. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jat, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/6/2003 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                    STATUS REPORT by DIANE CHARLES, by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/23/03.(dw1, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003, Terminated: 6/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION to Strike declarations of Sherer and Thompson from [36] MOTION for Summary Judgment by DIANE CHARLES.Service: 5/23/03. Response due by 6/13/2003 (hw1, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Extending Discovery until 5/23/2003. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (hw1, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by The United States. Service: 4/25/03.(hw1, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment (together with a separate appendix) by The United States.Service: 4/25/03. Response due by 5/27/2003 (hw1, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 11, 2003 before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: 3/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER Defendatn's Motion for Summary Judgment due 4/25/03 , and Plaintiff's Status Report due 5/9/03 (signed by Judge John Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 3/11/03 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                    ANSWER by USA to amended complaint. (HW)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 2/12/03) for Leave to file answer to amended complaint out of time. (HW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Amended Complaint
                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT by DIANE CHARLES amending [1-1] complaint. Service: 1/30/03. (LTD)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [27-1] motion for Leave to file amended complaint (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003, Terminated: 1/30/2003 Terminated:
                                                                            MOTION by DIANE CHARLES (Service: 1/28/03) for Leave to file amended complaint . Response due: 2/14/03. (LTD)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Nancy Myung-Jin Kim. Service: 11/13/02. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [24-1] joint motion for a joint proposed scheduling order. Reset Discovery deadline to 12/20/02. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002, Terminated: 10/8/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                  JOINT MOTION by DIANE CHARLES, USA for a joint proposed scheduling order . (HW)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 7/31/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Ada Elise Bosque. Service: 7/29/02. (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Transcript
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: status conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of April 9, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER for Protective Order (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [19-1] motion for Protective Order (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002, Terminated: 5/6/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 4/26/02) for Protective Order . Response due: 5/13/02 (DS)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER Discovery deadline is 10/18/02 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                JOINT Proposed scheduling order from DIANE CHARLES and USA Service: 4/19/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                                  Status Conference held ( Transcript due 5/9/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/15/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 4/9/02 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: 3/14/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: status conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 14, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/15/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER directing parties to contact the court within the next 30 days to schedule a status conference. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002
                                                                                                          Status Conference held ( Transcript due 3/18/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests Response to discovery requests due 2/1/02 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 1/17/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002, Terminated: 1/18/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 1/17/02) to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests (to February 1, 2002). (DS)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: 12/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to request for production of documents and interrogatories Response to Interrogatories due 1/17/02 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001, Terminated: 12/6/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 12/5/01) to Extend Time to respond to request for production of documents and interrogatories , (until January 17, 2002). (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/12/2001 Transcript
                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume (26 pages), at Washington, D.C., for date of August 14, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER setting Discovery deadline to 2/14/02 , and setting Status Conference for 10:30 a.m. on 2/14/02 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER scheduling Status Conference for 10:30 a.m., 8/14/01 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001
                                                                                                                          JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/31/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 5/29/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 4/12/2001, Entered: 4/13/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Matthew Patrick Reed. Service: 4/12/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: 3/29/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER (i) Directing parties to confer and arrange for preliminary status conference (ii) Identifying filing requirements for conference (iii) Precluding filing of dispositive motions until after ocnference has been held (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 3/27/2001, Entered: 3/28/2001 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 3/27/2001, Entered: 3/28/2001 Complaint
                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #051483, Answer due on 5/29/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2001, Entered: 3/28/2001 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                                                                                      (FE)
                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 81 times.

                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?