TURNER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:01-cv-00677-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo SILVIA I. TURNER, Plaintiff

Represented by Jones Blechman Woltz & Kelly PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Russell Wayne Woodlief +1 757 873 8000
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy Paul McIlmail +1 202 616 0342 +1 202 514 7965 timothy.mcilmail@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/3/2001
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 4/5/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: status conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of April 2, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/12/2002
    CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT dated April 8, 2002, forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 11 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002
      JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58, that (a) plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $38,276.98, inclusive of attorney fees and expenses; (b) the military records of Sergeant Turner are corrected to reflect that Sergeant Turner elected a full spousal survivor benefit; and (c) a survivor annuity is to be paid to Mrs. Turner to begin effective April 1, 2002. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (DS)
        LREF
        Blank 10 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002 Court Filing
        ORDER directing the Clerk to enter judgment in accordance with the parties' stipulation for entry of judgment. (signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn) Copy to parties. (DS)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002
          Case closed (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: 4/4/2002
            Stipulation by SILVIA I. TURNER and USA for entry of judgment. (AB)
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002 Court Filing
              ORDER Parties stipulation for entry of judgment due 4/5/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Status Conference
                Status Conference held ( Transcript due 5/2/02 ) (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: 4/1/2002 Terminated:
                  MOTION by USA (Service: 3/29/02) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint until 4/8/02. Response due: 4/15/02. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 Status Conference
                    Status Conference set at 10:30 a.m. on 4/2/02 (DS)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Terminated:
                      SECOND MOTION by USA (Service: 2/26/02) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint , (until April 1, 2002). (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: 1/25/2002 Court Filing
                        ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint Response to complaint due 3/1/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/25/2002, Terminated: 1/25/2002 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service: 1/24/02) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint , (until March 1, 2002). (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Timothy Paul McIlmail. Service: 12/14/01. (LTD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                              Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #052843. Answer due on 2/1/02. (FE)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 182 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?