MCMILLAN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:01-cv-00711-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RONNIE MCMILLAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ralph O. Scoccimaro +1 229 432 9310
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Mercurio
Office COFC
Filed 12/21/2001
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/3/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002
    Case closed (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER directing the clerk to dismiss this case. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by RONNIE MCMILLAN, USA . Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(ii). Copy to parties. (DS)
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Remark
          Settlement Agreement filed. (DS)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Terminated Case
            Case closed (DS)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
              STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due 7/5/02 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER directing parties to notify the Court of any changes in status immediately (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER, re: settlement (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges) Copy to parties. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER Parties Status Report due 6/4/02 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER - Counsel are responsible for agreeing on a time for the status conference within three weeks after the answer is filed, and notifying the court (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to answer the complaint Answer deadline to 4/19/02 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002, Terminated: 2/21/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                          MOTION by USA (Service: 2/14/02) to Extend Time to answer the complaint until 4/19/02. Response due: 3/4/02. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/22/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Patrick Mercurio. Service :1/17/02. (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Court Filing
                              Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001
                                COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #052932. Answer due on 2/19/02. (FE)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 164 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?