HOLLAND v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:01-cv-00717-FMA
District Judge Francis M. Allegra, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DONALD RAY HOLLAND, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas David Dinackus +1 202 307 6289 +1 202 514 7969 thomas.dinackus@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/26/2001
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 7/24/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '03-5170'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 32 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 CAFC Mandate Dismissing
MANDATE of CAFC dismissing [30] Notice of Appeal filed by DONALD RAY HOLLAND (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 31 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 Terminated:
    CAFC Case Number 03-5170 for [30] Notice of Appeal filed by DONALD RAY HOLLAND. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 30 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Terminated:
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by DONALD RAY HOLLAND. Filing fee $ 105, receipt number 058801. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 29 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Judgment*
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (lld, )
          LREF
          Blank 28 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 Court Filing
          UNPUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION granting the Defendant's cross motion for judgment on the administrative record and orders the Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing the complaint. No costs. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (bb1, )
            LREF
            Blank 27 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER, re: further proceedings. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (lrd)
              LREF
              Blank 26 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Terminated:
              MOTION to Stay proceedings until the Court has ruled on the pending cross-motions for judgment upon the administrative record, by The United States. Service: 4/10/03. Response due 4/28/2003. (lrd)
                LREF
                Blank 25 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003 ResponseCourt Filing
                RESPONSE to Defendant's supplemental brief pursuant to the 1/31/03 Court Order, filed by DONALD RAY HOLLAND. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/21/03.(lrd)
                  LREF
                  Blank 24 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Terminated:
                  MOTION trial by DONALD RAY HOLLAND. Service: 3/25/03. Response due by 4/11/2003.(dw1, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003
                    Oral Argument re: [14-1] cross motion by DONALD RAY HOLLAND ( Transcript due 4/9/03 ), [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment upon the Administrative Record by USA ( Transcript due 4/9/03 ) (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 23 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Response
                      RESPONSE by USA pursuant to [19-2] order. Service: 3/7/03. (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 22 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Transcript
                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of January 31, 2003. Notice to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 21 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 Response to Motion
                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/24/03) to [20-1] motion for Oral Argument. Reply due: 3/10/03. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 20 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Terminated:
                            MOTION by DONALD RAY HOLLAND (Service: 2/6/03) for Oral Argument . Response due: 2/24/03 (LTD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 19 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER Plaintiff's response to Defendant's memorandum due 3/21/03 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 18 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Thomas David Dinackus. Service: 1/13/03. (LTD)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 17 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. on 1/31/03 for [14-1] cross motion and [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment upon the Administrative Record (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 16 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                    REPLY by DONALD RAY HOLLAND to response to [14-1] cross motion. Service: 8/30/02. (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 15 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 7/31/2002 Response to Motion
                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/29/02 ) to [14-1] cross motion. Reply due: 8/15/02 (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 14 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/16/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                        CROSS MOTION by DONALD RAY HOLLAND (Service: 7/1/02) and RESPONSE to [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment upon the Administrative Record by USA. Response due: 7/29/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/16/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                          Deadline updated; Response to [14-1] cross motion due 7/29/02 . (LTD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 13 Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 6/10/02) for Summary Judgment upon the Administrative Record , filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 7/10/02. (HW) Modified on 06/12/2002
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 12 Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                                              STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/10/02. (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 11 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: 5/31/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                NOTICE of review of administrative record by DONALD RAY HOLLAND. Service: 5/23/02. (LTD)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002
                                                  Administrative record filed by USA. (LTD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002
                                                    NOTICE of filing of the administrative record by USA. Service: 4/29/02. (LTD)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002 Court Filing
                                                      SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER of Judge Francis M. Allegra. Copy to parties. (HW) Modified on 06/25/2002
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 4/10/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER Defendant's administrative record due 5/10/02 , Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due 6/10/02 , Plaintiff's response to the Motion for Summary Judgment and cross motion due 7/10/02 , Defendant's reply to the Motion for Judgment on the administrative record and response to Plaintiff's cross-motion due 7/29/02 and Plaintiff's reply to cross-motion due 9/4/02 (signed by Judge Francis Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 4/10/02 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 Memorandum
                                                            MEMORANDUM by DONALD RAY HOLLAND in response to [7-1] memorandum by USA. Service: 3/1/02 (DS)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002 Memorandum
                                                              MEMORANDUM by USA pursuant to [4-1] order filed 1/14/02, re: Intent to proceed by motion in lieu of an answer to the complaint. Service: 2/12/02. (LTD)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to file a memorandum identifying the factual and/or legal bases upon which the proposed dispositive motion will be based Parties shall schedule a preliminary status conference by 4/11/02 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002, Terminated: 2/7/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 2/5/02) to Extend Time to file a memorandum identifying the factual and/or legal bases upon which the proposed dispositive motion will be based , (until March 28, 2002). (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                    SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER of Judge Francis M. Allegra directing parties to confer with chambers and arrange for preliminary status conference; identifying timing and filing requirements for conference (with special requirements if defendant intends to proceed by motion in lieu of answer); precluding the filing of dispositive motions until the conference has been held; and establishing special procedures regarding, inter alia,mandatory disclosure, limitations on discovery, enlargements and the content of the joint preliminary status report. Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Virginia Marie Lum. Service: 1/11/02. (LTD)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: 12/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge Francis M. Allegra. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: 12/26/2001
                                                                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #052943. Answer due on 2/25/02. (FE)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 144 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?