JONES v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:01-cv-00719-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALBERTA ROSE JONES, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wanda Rubianes-Collazo +1 202 616 0466
Office COFC
Filed 12/28/2001
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 3/25/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '03-5112'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, NOFILINGS
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 44 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
ORDER RETURNING Motion for New Trial received 3/22/2005. The Clerk of Court shall not accept any further filings by plaintiff in regards to her claim. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
    LREF
    Blank 43 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 CAFC Mandate Dismissing
    MANDATE of CAFC dismissing [41] Notice of Appeal filed by ALBERTA ROSE JONES. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 42 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 Terminated:
      CAFC Case Number 03-5112 for [41] Notice of Appeal filed by ALBERTA ROSE JONES. (hw1,)
        LREF
        Blank 41 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 Terminated:
        NOTICE OF APPEAL by ALBERTA ROSE JONES. Filing fee $ 105, receipt number 057538. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 40 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. No costs. (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank 39 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Court Filing
            ORDER directing the Clerk to dismiss the complaint for lack of jurisdiction. No costs. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lld, )
              LREF
              Blank 38 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
              ORDER RETURNING "Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Compelling Discovery" received 3/11/03. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lrd).
                LREF
                Blank 37 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [35-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to the motion to dismiss Reply to Response to Motion due 2/25/03 for [14-1] motion to Dismiss complaint as amended for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and/or for failure to state a claim (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 36 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                  REPLY by USA to response to [14-1] motion to Dismiss complaint as amended for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and/or for failure to state a claim. Service: 2/24/03. FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 35 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003, Terminated: 2/25/2003 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service: 2/19/03) to Extend Time to file reply to the motion to dismiss until 2/25/03. Response due: 3/10/03. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 34 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [33-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss Reply to Response to Motion due 2/18/03 for [14-1] motion to Dismiss complaint as amended for lack of subject matter and/or for failure to state a claim (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 33 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003, Terminated: 2/12/2003 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service : 2/7/03 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss [until February 18, 2003]. Response due: 2/24/03 (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 32 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [31-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to the motion to dismiss Reply to Response to Motion due 2/7/03 for [14-1] motion to Dismiss complaint as amended lack of subject matter jurisdiction and/or for failure to state a claim (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 31 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003, Terminated: 1/16/2003 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service: 1/13/03) to Extend Time to file reply to the motion to dismiss until 2/7/03. Response due: 1/30/03. (LTD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 30 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 ResponseCourt Filing
                              SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE by ALBERTA ROSE JONES to [27-1] motion response by ALBERTA ROSE JONES (filed by leave of the Judge). Service: 1/6/03 (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 29 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [26-1] motion to Extend Time within which to reply to response to motion to dismiss . Reply to Response to Motion reset to 1/13/03 for [14-1] motion to Dismiss complaint as amended for lack of subject matter and/or for failure to state a claim ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 28 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                  RESPONSE by USA to Plaintiff's motion concerning post dated material. Service: 11/18/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 27 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                    RESPONSE by ALBERTA ROSE JONES (Service: 12/16/02) to [14-1] motion to Dismiss complaint as amended for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and/or for failure to state a claim. Reply due: 1/2/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 26 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002, Terminated: 12/19/2002 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 12/16/02 ) to Extend Time within which to reply to response to motion to dismiss , (until January 13, 2003). (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 25 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/23/02) to [24-1] motion to recuse Judge Bruggink. Reply due: 11/4/02. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 24 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                          MOTION by ALBERTA ROSE JONES (Service: 10/5/02) to recuse Judge Bruggink . Response due: 10/23/02. FIled by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 23 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Status Report
                                            STATUS REPORT by USA Service: 10/4/02 (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 22 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Administrative Record
                                              Administrative record filed by USA. Service: 9/16/02. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 21 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [20-1] motion for Leave to file the original administrative record under seal (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: 9/17/2002, Terminated: 9/16/2002 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 9/12/02) for Leave to file the original administrative record under seal . Response due: 9/30/02. (LTD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: 9/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting in part, denying in part [16-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss and file a supplemental complaint, granting in part, denying in part [16-2] motion for the court to respond to request for clarification, granting in part, denying in part [16-3] motion to keep the entire record under seal Response to [14-1] motion to Dismiss complaint as amended for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and/or for failure to state a due 12/6/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/13/2002 Administrative Record
                                                      Administrative record, consisting of two volumes, filed by USA. FILED UNDER SEAL. (DS)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting [15-1] motion for Leave to file the administrative record and for an order to protect thirty-five pages on the record; and directing that the entire administrative record be maintained under seal. (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: 9/10/2002, Terminated: 9/11/2002 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by ALBERTA ROSE JONES (Service: 9/6/02) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss and file a supplemental complaint (to February 10, 2003); for the court to respond to request for clarification regarding original amended complaint; and to keep the entire record under seal . Response due: 9/16/02 (DS)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002, Terminated: 9/10/2002 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 8/30/02) for Leave to file the administrative record and for an order to protect thirty-five pages on the record . Response due: 9/16/02. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 8/30/02) to Dismiss complaint as amended for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and/or for failure to state a claim . Response due: 9/30/02. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: 9/3/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                NOTICE of filing of clarification of misunderstanding regarding original complaint and supplemental complaint by ALBERTA ROSE JONES. Service: 8/21/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER reset Answer deadline to 8/30/02. ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Wanda Rubianes-Collazo. Service: 7/2/02. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                      NOTICE of change of address by ALBERTA ROSE JONES (HW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the amended complaint . Answer to Amended Complaint deadline to 8/15/02 ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 4/17/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002, Terminated: 4/18/2002 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 4/17/02) to Extend Time to respond to the amended complaint , (until August 15, 2002). (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the amended complaint Answer to amended complaint due 4/26/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 3/1/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002, Terminated: 3/4/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 3/1/02) to Extend Time to respond to the amended complaint until 4/26/02. Response due: 3/18/02. (LTD)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/30/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lee Joshua Freedman. Service: 1/29/02. (LTD)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER filing plaintiff's amended complaint by leave of the judge; and directing defendant to file its answer to the amended complaint by 3/8/02. ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002
                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT by ALBERTA ROSE JONES (Answer due 3/8/02 per court order) amending [1-1] complaint filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 12/30/01 (DS) Modified on 01/08/2002
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 12/28/2001, Entered: 12/28/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                      Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 12/28/2001, Entered: 12/28/2001
                                                                                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #052957. Answer due on 2/26/02. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 158 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?