MCCANN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-cv-01346-LSM
District Judge Lawrence S. Margolis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo THOMAS J. MCCANN, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Warren Walluk +1 210 226 4384 +1 210 226 4526 awalluklaw@hotmail.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Opher Shweiki +1 202 353 8822 opher.shweiki@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/7/2002
Jury Demand
Demand $100000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 5/14/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that judgment is in favor of defendant and the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Court Filing
    UNPUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION granting [6] Motion to Dismiss filed by The United States. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendant. No costs. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003
      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/19/2003. (vp1, )
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
        ORDER Setting Hearing on [6] Motion to Dismiss: Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2003 at 10:00 AM before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lrd)
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003 Description not available
          REPLY to Response to Motion, re [6] Motion to Dismiss filed by The United States. Service: 3/27/03. (lrd)
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003
            RESPONSE by THOMAS J. MCCANN JR.(Service: 3/10/03 ) to [6-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 3/27/03 (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the motion to dismiss Response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss due 3/10/03 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003, Terminated: 3/4/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                MOTION by THOMAS J. MCCANN JR. (Service: 2/21/03) to Extend Time to respond to the motion to dismiss until 3/10/03. Response due: 3/10/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER to file Plaintiff's motion to extend time (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service: 1/21/03) to Dismiss . Response due: 2/21/03. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002
                      ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 1/21/03 ( signed by the Clerk ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002, Terminated: 12/6/2002 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service: 12/4/02) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to January 21, 2003). (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Opher Shweiki Service :10/25/02 (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                            Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #055046. Answer due on 12/6/02. (FE)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 128 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?