DONOHUE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-cv-01349-DGS
District Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PAMELA K. DONOHUE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by FELDESMAN TUCKER LEIFER FIDELL LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eugene R. Fidell +1 202 466 8960 +1 202 293 8103 efidell@feldesmantucker.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Scott Ewing +1 202 616 0462 +1 202 514 8624 richard.ewing@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/7/2002
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to U.S. Agency
County
Terminated 2/19/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PAMELA K. DONOHUE, USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(ii) this day. Copy to parties. Nature of Jgm DP (HW)
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Terminated:
    MOTION by USA (Service: 1/6/03) to Extend Time to answer the complaint until 2/15/03. Response due: 1/23/03. (LTD)
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 12/11/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Terminated:
      MOTION by USA (Service : 12/11/02 ) for Clarification Response due: 12/30/02 (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 12/2/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002
        ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. reset Answer deadline to 1/6/03 ( signed by the Clerk ) Copy to parties. (DS)
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002, Terminated: 12/2/2002 Terminated:
          MOTION by USA (Service: 11/27/02) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to January 6, 2003). (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
            CHAMBER PROCEDURES (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/26/2002 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Richard Scott Ewing Service :10/24/02 (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                Notice of assignment to Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #055050. Answer due on 12/6/02. (FE)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 142 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?