TOMLIN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-cv-01350-NBF
District Judge Nancy B. Firestone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RONALD D. TOMLIN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by FELDESMAN TUCKER LEIFER FIDELL LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eugene R. Fidell +1 202 466 8960 +1 202 293 8103 efidell@feldesmantucker.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cristina Carlucci Ashworth +1 202 353 0516 cristina.ashworth@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/7/2002
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 7/8/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 45 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/12/2004 Stipulation of Dismissal
JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. Service: 7/8/2004.(jcp, )
    LREF
    Blank 44 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
    STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 7/8/2004. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dw1)
      LREF
      Blank 43 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 Joint Status Report
      JOINT STATUS REPORT by RONALD D. TOMLIN, USA. Service: 6/21/2004.(hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 42 Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
        STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties' request for additional time is GRANTED. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by Monday, 6/21/2004. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 41 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Joint Status Report
          JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 6/7/2004.(jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 40 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
            STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties' request for additional time is GRANTED. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by Monday, 6/7/2004. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 39 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Joint Status Report
              JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 4/30/2004.(jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 38 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [37] Dft's Unopposed Motion to Stay Further Proceedings. The case is STAYED. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by Friday, 4/30/2004. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 37 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004, Terminated: 3/30/2004 Terminated:
                  UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings by USA.Service: 3/26/2004. Response due by 4/12/2004. (jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 36 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                    PUBLISHED OPINION/ORDER: Therefore, the court finds that it has jurisdiction over pltf's claims in the present action. [29] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss is hereby DENIED. In addition, the government's motion, in the alternative, for a stay is DENIED. The parties shall file a proposed schedule for resolving this case by 3/26/2004.Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004
                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 2/17/2004. (vp1, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nancy B. Firestone : Oral Argument held on 02-02-04. (dpk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 35 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Notice of Additional Authority
                          NOTICE of Additional Authority by USA. Service: 1/23/04.(hw1, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 34 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                            ORDER granting [33] Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (hw1, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 33 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004, Terminated: 2/2/2004 Terminated:
                              MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority by USA.Service: 1/23/2004. Response due by 2/9/2004. (jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 32 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re: [29] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1): Oral Argument shall be heard on Monday, 2/2/2004 02:30 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 31 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: 8/22/2003 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                  REPLY to Pltf's Opposition to [29] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss filed by USA, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 8/15/03.(jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 30 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 Court Filing
                                    OPPOSITION to [29] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by RONALD D. TOMLIN, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Reply due by 8/7/2003. Service: 7/21/03.(jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 29 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003, Terminated: 3/12/2004 Terminated: Court Filing
                                      MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), or in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by UNITED STATES, Filed by Leave of the Judge.Service: 7/2/03. Response due by 7/25/2003.(jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 28 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003 Status Report
                                        STATUS REPORT by RONALD D. TOMLIN. Service: 06/16/03.(jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: 6/12/2003
                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nancy B. Firestone : Status Conference held on 6/10/03. (dpk, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 27 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's Dispositive Motion(s) due by 7/2/2003. Plaintiff's Response due by 7/25/2003. Defendant's Reply due by 8/15/2003. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dw1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 26 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/10/2003 11:00 AM before Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dw1, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nancy B. Firestone : Status Conference held on 05-22-03. (dpk, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Administrative Record (Supplement)
                                                  SUPPLEMENT to the ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by UNITED STATES. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 5/21/03.(dw1, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [23] Motion for Leave to File Supplement to the Administrative Record under seal. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dw1, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003, Terminated: 5/21/2003 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION for Leave to File supplement to administrative record under seal by UNITED STATES.Service: 5/19/03. Response due by 6/5/2003 (hw1, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) The defendant shall have until 5/19/2003 to file the documents that support the Inspector General Report, etc.; and (2) Status Conference set for 5/22/2003 11:00 AM before Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (hw1, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003
                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nancy B. Firestone : Status Conference held on 5/5/03. (dpk, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003
                                                            ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Pages 1 - 587) by The United States. Filed UNDER SEAL. Service: 4/29/03.(hw1, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Court Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [19] Motion for Leave to File Administrative Record UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (hw1, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003, Terminated: 4/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION for Leave to File the administrative record under seal by The United States.Service: 4/25/03. Response due by 5/12/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Second Amended Complaint
                                                                  SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against The United States , filed by RONALD D. TOMLIN. Related document: [1] Complaint, [9] Amended Complaint filed by RONALD D. TOMLIN.(hw1, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting [16] Motion for Leave to File second amended and supplemental complaint. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (hw1, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003, Terminated: 4/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File second amended and supplemental complaint, by RONALD D. TOMLIN. Service: 4/15/03. Response due 5/2/2003. (lrd)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's Dispositive Motion(s) due by 5/12/2003. Defendant's Administrative Record due 4/25/2003. Status Conference set for 5/5/2003 10:30 AM before Judge Nancy B. Firestone.Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dw1, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/18/2003 Status Report
                                                                          STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 4/10/03.(hw1, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Stay Joint Status Report due 4/11/03 (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003, Terminated: 2/27/2003 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 2/25/03) to Stay . Response due: 3/14/03 (LTD)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint Answer to complaint due 3/6/03 (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003, Terminated: 2/10/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 2/3/03 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint , (until 3/6/03). (HW)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Amended Complaint
                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT by RONALD D. TOMLIN amending [1-1] complaint. Service: 1/24/03. (LTD)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Leave to file amended and supplemental complaint (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003, Terminated: 1/24/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                        MOTION by RONALD D. TOMLIN (Service: 1/21/03) for Leave to file amended and supplemental complaint . Response due: 2/7/03. (LTD)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Cristina Carlucci Ashworth Service :1/2/03 (JT)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Order
                                                                                            ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. reset Answer deadline to 2/4/03 ( signed by the Clerk ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002, Terminated: 11/25/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 11/22/02) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to February 4, 2003). (DS)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Mark Lawrence Josephs. Service: 10/23/02. (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 Complaint
                                                                                                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #055051. Answer due on 12/6/02. (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                      CASE assigned to ADR Judge Christine O. C. Miller. (FE)
                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 173 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?