VENTURE COAL SALES, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-cv-01455-DGS
District Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FUTURE INDUSTRIES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BARBERA AND CLAPPER, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent J. Barbera +1 814 443 4681 +1 814 443 2422 vbarbera@bcbrm.com
No Logo SANNER ENERGIES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BARBERA AND CLAPPER, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent J. Barbera +1 814 443 4681 +1 814 443 2422 vbarbera@bcbrm.com
No Logo VENTURE COAL SALES COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BARBERA AND CLAPPER, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent J. Barbera +1 814 443 4681 +1 814 443 2422 vbarbera@bcbrm.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/23/2002
Jury Demand
Demand $106000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 4/30/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
101-cv-00614-MMS
Other Court Case '03-5132'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: 7/23/2004
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [13] Judgment order that directed that judgment be entered in this case. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 19 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
    STATUS REPORT ORDER: The attached order, entered by the court on 4/9/2004, was captioned erroneously under case number 02-1455T, rather than under case number 01-614T. The 4/9/2004, order shall be stricken from the docket in case number 02-1455T and deemed to be filed in case number 02-614T as of the date this order is filed. The 4/30/2004 deadline for submission of the parties' Joint Status Report in case 01-614T shall be extended until 5/14/2004. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (jcp, )
      LREF
      Blank 18 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
      SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 4/30/2004. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. [STRICKEN PER ORDER OF 4/26/2004] (dw1) Modified on 4/28/2004 (jcp, ).
        LREF
        Blank 17 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Terminated:
        CAFC Case Number 03-5132 for [16] Notice of Appeal filed by VENTURE COAL SALES COMPANY, FUTURE INDUSTRIES, INC., SANNER ENERGIES, INC. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003, Terminated: 7/23/2004 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [13] Judgment by FUTURE INDUSTRIES, INC., SANNER ENERGIES, INC. and VENTURE COAL SALES COMPANY. Filing fee $105, receipt number 057982. Copies to Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt, opposing party and CAFC. (dw1, )
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Court Filing
            PUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION granting defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiffs' complaint for lack of jurisdiction. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment for defendant. No costs. [THIS OPINION WAS ORIGINALLY FILED ON APRIL 30, 2003] Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (lld, ) Modified on 6/24/2003 (lld, ).
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 Terminated:
              MOTION to Publish [13] Judgment (Court's Order of April 30, 2003) by UNITED STATES.Service: 06/13/03. Response due by 6/30/2003 (jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003
                JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that judgment is for the defendant and the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (lld, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Court Filing
                  UNPUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION granting [5] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1) filed by The United States. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment for defendant. No costs. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (lld, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Response
                    RESPONSE by USA to [10-1] memorandum by VENTURE COAL SALES. Service: 2/26/03. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                      LETTER dated 2/6/03 by VENTURE COAL SALES. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 9 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER to file Plaintiff's letter received 2/10/03 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 2/4/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                          REPLY by USA to response to [5-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Service: 1/27/03. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 7 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Response to Motion
                            RESPONSE by VENTURE COAL SALES (Service: 1/9/03) to [5-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 1/27/03. (LTD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 6 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 Response to Motion
                              RESPONSE by VENTURE COAL SALES (Service: 1/9/03) to [5-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 1/27/03. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 5 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service: 12/10/02) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 1/10/03 (DS)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Charles Stoddart. Service: 12/3/02 (DS)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002 Court Filing
                                    Notice of assignment to Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002
                                      NOTICE by VENTURE COAL SALES, SANNER ENERGIES and FUTURE INDUSTRIES of directly related case (01-614T). (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002
                                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #055173. Answer due on 12/23/02. (FE)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 103 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?