CHANDLER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-cv-01456-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PHILLIP C. CHANDLER, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy Myung-Jin Kim +1 202 353 0546 +1 202 514 8640 nancy.kim@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/23/2002
Jury Demand
Demand $329000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 3/4/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/17/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER; Plaintiff's request to file supplemental infirmation is moot and therefore DENIED. (Plaintiff's request was returned prior to this order).Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (lrd)
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
    RESPONSE by PHILLIP C. CHANDLER (Service: 2/8/03) to [7-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 2/25/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003
      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003
        Case closed (LD)
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
          UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting [7-2] motion for Summary Judgment. No costs. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (LD)
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER Response to [7-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction reset to 2/12/03, [7-2] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 2/12/03. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Administrative Record
              Administrative record filed by USA. Service: 1/2/03 (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/6/2003 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                NOTICE of Administrative Record by USA, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/23/02. (HW)
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/3/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                  MOTION by USA (Service: 12/23/02) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or for Summary Judgment Response due: 1/23/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/3/2003 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                    STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 12/23/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Nancy Myung-Jin Kim. Service: 11/13/02. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Claudia Burke. Service: 10/31/02. (LTD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER for Defendant to file a copy of the Administrative Record as soon as it is available (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002 Court Filing
                            Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002
                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #055174. Answer due on 12/23/02. (FE)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 124 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?