FREEDOM FELLOWSHIP v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-cv-01463-FMA
District Judge Francis M. Allegra, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FREEDOM FELLOWSHIP MINISTRY, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert N. Dorosin
Office COFC
Filed 10/24/2002
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 202 - Tax - Declaratory Judgment 28:1507
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 11/25/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
NOTICE of filing of letter dated 11/21/02 by FREEDOM FELLOWSHIP. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismisses for lack of jurisdiction. No costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 Court Filing
      ORDER directing the clerk to dismiss the complaint for lack of jurisdiction. No costs. ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002
        Case closed (LD)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/20/2002 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert N. Dorosin. Service: 11/14/02. (LTD)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/25/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
            Notice of assignment to Judge Francis M. Allegra. Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/25/2002 Complaint
              COMPLAINT (filed with Exhibits 1 through 17), FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #055183. Answer due on 12/23/02. (FE) Modified on 10/25/2002
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 82 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?