MCDONALD v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:01-vv-00635-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BILLIE M MCDONALD, Petitioner
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent James Matanoski +1 202 616 4124 +1 202 616 4310 vincent.matanoski@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/8/2001
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 9/25/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003
SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion(s) for attorney's fees and costs due by 5/30/2003. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (jmm, )
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 9/25/2002
    JUDGMENT entered,pursuant to Vaccine Rules 21(b) and 21(c), that the petition is dismissed. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 9/25/2002
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: 8/9/2002 DECISION of Special Master
        Decision of Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. Copy to parties. (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Order
          ORDER Response to [4-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 12/31/01 (signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz). Copy to parties. (LTD)
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 Terminated:
            MOTION by HHS (Service : 11/16/01 ) to Dismiss Response due: 12/17/01 (AB)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001
              Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #052736. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 11/15/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Vincent James Matanoski Service : 11/15/01 (AB)
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                  NOTICE OF assignment to Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 Petition
                    PETITION by BILLIE M MCDONALD, Vac. Date: 10/28/98 ( Respondent's report due 2/6/02). [fee not received] (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                      CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 90 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?