TOOTLE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-cv-00017-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SAMUEL E. TOOTLE, II, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Peter Sills +1 202 537 9584 +1 202 514 8640
Office COFC
Filed 1/7/2002
Jury Demand
Demand $110000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/13/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i), dismissing the complaint, without prejudice. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (DS)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 Court Filing
    ORDER construing plaintiff's May 10, 2002, submission as equivalent to a notice of dismissali; and dismissing the case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i). (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow) Copy to parties. (DS)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002
      Case closed (DS)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
        MOTION by SAMUEL E. TOOTLE II (Service: 5/7/02) for voluntary withdrawal without prejudice , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 5/24/02. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 Terminated:
          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/6/02) to [12-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the motion to dismiss. Reply due: 5/20/02. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
            MOTION by SAMUEL E. TOOTLE II (Service: 4/26/02) to Extend Time to respond to the motion to dismiss , (until June 24, 2002). Response due: 5/13/02. [by leave of the Judge] (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 Court Filing
              ORDER denying as moot [9-1] motion requesting modification of order of the Court of 3/22/02 Plaintiff's Response to [10-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction due 5/20/02 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 Terminated:
                MOTION by USA (Service: 4/19/02) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 5/20/02. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: 4/10/2002, Terminated: 4/22/2002 Terminated:
                  MOTION by SAMUEL E. TOOTLE II (Service: 4/2/02) requesting modification of order of the Court of 3/22/02 . Response due: 4/19/02. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: 3/22/2002 Court Filing
                    ORDER denying [6-1] motion for Entry of Default as to USA, granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. reset Answer deadline to 4/19/02 ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002 Terminated:
                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/19/02) to [6-1] motion for Entry of Default as to USA. Reply due: 4/1/02 (included in motion for enlargement of time to respond to the complaint) (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002 Terminated:
                        MOTION, out of time, by USA (Service: 3/19/02) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to April 19, 2002). Response due: 4/5/02 (also includes response to motion for default, etc.) (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002, Terminated: 3/22/2002 Terminated:
                          MOTION by SAMUEL E. TOOTLE II (Service: 3/7/02) for Entry of Default as to USA , and, if not, objection to defendant's motion for enlargement of time and any other enlargement of time. Response due: 3/25/02 (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: 1/25/2002 Court Filing
                            ORDER granting [2-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jonathan Peter Sills. Service: 1/14/02. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge James F. Merow. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002, Terminated: 1/25/2002 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by SAMUEL E. TOOTLE II (Service: 1/7/02) to Proceed in Forma Pauperis . Response due: 1/24/02. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT, Answer due on 3/8/02. (FE)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 107 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?