K & J COAL CO., INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-cv-00200-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo K & J COAL CO., INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Colavecchi +1 814 765 1566
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/15/2002
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 11/5/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
    LREF
    Blank 16 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Notice of Appearance/
    NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Charles Stoddart for USA. Service: 7/7/2004.(jcp, )
      LREF
      Blank 15 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Status Report
      STATUS REPORT by K & J COAL CO., INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (jcp, )
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
        STATUS REPORT ORDER: Counsel will advise the court whether they have resolved this case, or whether they intend to file stipulations of dismissal. If settlement discussions are continuing, they should advise the court of the status of these negotiations and the likelihood that they will be successful in the near future. The parties may file a Joint Status Report no later than 1/30/2004, or they may file independently. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: 8/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER, re: Joint Motion of Suspension (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002 Terminated:
            MOTION by USA (Service: 8/23/02) to Stay proceedings until 1/1/03 . Response due: 9/9/02. (LTD)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER, re: discovery (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/16/2002 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 8/13/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to file the "JPSR" Joint Preliminary Status Report due 8/26/02 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 8/9/2002, Entered: 8/13/2002, Terminated: 8/13/2002 Terminated:
                    JOINT MOTION by USA (Service: 8/9/02) to Extend Time to file the "JPSR" until 8/26/02. Response due: 8/26/02. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 Answer
                      ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 6/21/02 (JPSR due 8/12/02). (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert N. Dorosin. Service :6/19/02 (AB)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Rozella Ann Oliver. Service: 5/10/02. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002
                            COMPLAINT filed. Copies (5) to defendant. Answer due on 6/24/02 (DS)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002
                              **Not member of bar flag removed. (DS)
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 Court Filing
                                ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. Show Cause Response due: 4/26/02 for K & J COAL CO., INC. [Absent compliance, the Clerk is directed to dismiss the case pursuant to Rule 41(b) for failure to prosecute or otherwise comply with the rules of this court.] (DS)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/15/2002 Court Filing
                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/15/2002
                                    Record transferred from the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania, case number 01-cv-356, consisting of 1 volume. Notice to parties. (Attorney: Joseph Colavecchi) (Amended complaint due by 4/12/02). (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/15/2002
                                      **Not member of bar flag set (FE)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 166 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?