GOAD v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-cv-00230-DGS
District Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROLAND L. GOAD, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kyle Eric Chadwick +1 202 616 0476 +1 202 305 7644 kyle.chadwick@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/25/2002
Jury Demand
Demand $179000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 4/24/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER re: The Clerk is ordered to return plaintiff's Rule 60(b) motion and again is directed not to accept any further filings by plaintiff unless he first seeks, and is granted, leave to file the document (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002 Response to Motion
    RESPONSE by ROLAND L. GOAD (Service: 10/16/02) to [9-1] motion to Strike [8-1] motion for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60(b) by ROLAND L. GOAD. Reply due: 10/30/02. (LTD)
      LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 Terminated:
      MOTION by USA (Service : 10/3/02 ) to Strike [8-1] motion for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60(b) by ROLAND L. GOAD . Response due: 10/21/02 (HW) Modified on 10/22/2002
        LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Terminated:
        MOTION by ROLAND L. GOAD (Service : 9/17/02 ) for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60(b). Response due: 10/4/02 (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
          MOTION by ROLAND L. GOAD (Service : 9/17/02 ) to Disqualify Judge. Response due: 10/4/02 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 6 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002
            JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, with prejudice. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 Court Filing
              ORDER directing the clerk to dismiss the complaint with prejudice. The clerk is directed not to accept any further filings submitted by plaintiff unless he first seeks, and is granted, leave to file the document. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (LD)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002
                Case closed (LD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 4/17/2002, Entered: 4/17/2002 Court Filing
                  SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/15/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Kyle Eric Chadwick. Service: 4/11/02. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/25/2002 Court Filing
                      Notice of assignment to Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/25/2002
                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #053496. Answer due on 5/24/02. (FE)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 163 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?