DYSART v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-cv-00294-BAF
District Judge Bohdan A. Futey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo NOEL K. DYSART, REAR ADMIRAL (LH), Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles William Gittins +1 703 683 0660
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Louis Koger +1 202 724 6598
Office COFC
Filed 4/8/2002
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 5/6/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '03-5106'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags AUTO, CLOSED, ENDADR
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004
Appeal record returned from CAFC. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 29 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004, Terminated: 7/19/2004 CAFC Mandate Affirming
    MANDATE of CAFC affirming [26] Judgment order that directed the Clerk of the Court to dismiss this case. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004
      Appeal record sent to CAFC. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 28 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/6/2003 Terminated:
        CAFC Case Number 03-5106 for [27] Notice of Appeal filed by NOEL K. REAR ADMIRAL (LH) NOEL K. DYSART. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003, Terminated: 7/19/2004 Notice of Appeal
          NOTICE OF APPEAL by NOEL K. REAR ADMIRAL (LH) NOEL K. DYSART. Filing fee $ 105, receipt number 057584. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
            LREF
            Blank 26 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003
            JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, in favor of defendant and the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (lld, )
              LREF
              Blank 25 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003 Unpublished Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
              UNPUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION on [19] denying Cross Motion filed by NOEL K. REAR ADMIRAL (LH) NOEL K. DYSART, [12] and granting Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The United States. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment for defendant. No costs. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (lld, )
                LREF
                Blank 24 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                REPLY by NOEL K. DYSART to response to [19-1] cross motion. Service: 1/27/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD) Modified on 02/06/2003
                  LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Response to Motion
                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/6/03 ) to [19-1] cross motion filed [by leave of the judge]. Reply due: 1/23/03 (DS)
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                    COUNTER-STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 1/6/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD) Modified on 01/29/2003
                      LREF
                      Blank 21 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [20-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to cross-motion and reply Response to [19-1] cross motion due 1/6/03 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: 12/1/2002, Terminated: 12/10/2002 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service : 11/26/02 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to cross-motion and reply , (until 12/23/02). (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002, Terminated: 5/5/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                          CROSS MOTION by NOEL K. DYSART (Service: 10/30/02) and RESPONSE to [12-1] motion for Summary Judgment upon the administrative record by USA. Response due: 11/29/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                            STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by NOEL K. DYSART. Service: 10/30/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                              COUNTER-STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by NOEL K. DYSART. Service: 10/30/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [15-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss or in the alternative, for summary judgment Response to [12-1] motion for Summary Judgment upon the administrative record due 11/1/02 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002, Terminated: 10/9/2002 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by NOEL K. DYSART (Service : 10/3/02 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss or in the alternative, for summary judgment [until November 1, 2002]. Response due: 10/21/02 (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Administrative Record
                                    Administrative record filed by USA. Service: 9/17/02. (2 volumes) (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [10-1] motion for Leave to file the administrative record (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: 9/11/2002 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/02) for Summary Judgment upon the administrative record . Response due: 10/10/02. (LTD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: 9/11/2002 Statement of Facts
                                          STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 9/9/02. (LTD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: 9/11/2002, Terminated: 9/17/2002 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 9/9/02) for Leave to file the administrative record . Response due: 9/26/02. (LTD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint Response to complaint due 9/9/02 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002, Terminated: 8/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/1/02 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until September 5, 2002]. Response due: 8/19/02 (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: 7/24/2002 Court Filing
                                                  Notice of reassignment to Judge Bohdan A. Futey . Copy to parties. (Note: This case will continue in the ADR Pilot Program.) (DS)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/6/2002
                                                    ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 8/6/02 ( signed by the Clerk ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 6/6/2002, Terminated: 6/6/2002 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 5/31/02) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to August 6, 2002). (DS)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Court Filing
                                                        ORDER, re: ADR Pilot Procedures (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002
                                                          Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $150 and RECEIPT #053655. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Thomas Louis Koger. Service: 4/15/02. (LTD)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                              Notice of assignment to Judge James T. Turner. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002 Complaint
                                                                COMPLAINT (fee not received). Answer due on 6/7/02. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                  CASE assigned to ADR Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (FE)
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 216 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?