ZABALA v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:02-cv-00309-LSM
District Judge Lawrence S. Margolis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo CARMEN ZABALA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Eugene Sullivan +1 919 832 8507
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lauren Springer Moore +1 202 616 0333 +1 202 514 8640 lauren.moore@usdoj.gov
No Logo JULIA ZABALA, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jack E. Carter
Office COFC
Filed 4/12/2002
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 9/29/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 40 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, dismissing the complaint with prejudice. (dls)
    LREF
    Blank 39 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005 Court Filing
    ORDER directing the Clerk to dismiss the case. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dls)
      LREF
      Blank 38 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice by CARMEN ZABALA. Service: 9/14/2005.(mb2, )
        LREF
        Blank 37 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004 Status Report
        STATUS REPORT by CARMEN ZABALA. Service: 12/10/2004.(dw1)
          LREF
          Blank 36 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Status Report
          STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 11/19/2004.(jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004
            Certified copy of April 29, 2004, order forwarded to the Army Board for Correction of Military Records. (dls)
              LREF
              Blank 35 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Order Staying CaseCourt Filing
              ORDER STAYING CASE and remanding to the Department of the Army Board for Correction of Military Records for reconsideration of its decision dated 6/9/99. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jat, )
                LREF
                Blank 34 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 ~Notice (other)
                PROPOSED ORDER by USA. Service: 4/27/2004.(jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/26/2004
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence S. Margolis: Settlement Conference held on 4-20-04. (lmc)
                    LREF
                    Blank 33 Filed: 2/12/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                    SCHEDULING ORDER: A Settlement Conference is set for Tuesday, 4/20/2004 09:30 AM in Suite 703 at the National Courts Building before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence S. Margolis: Status Conference held on 2-12-04. (lmc)
                        LREF
                        Blank 32 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: The Status Conference by telephone set for 2/11/2004, is rescheduled to Thursday, 2/12/2004 11:00 AM before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 31 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: The next Status Conference shall be held by telephone on Wednesday, 2/11/2004 03:00 PM before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence S. Margolis: Status Conference held on 12-03-03. (lmc)
                              LREF
                              Blank 30 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003 Response to Motion
                              RESPONSE to [29] Julia Zabala's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by CARMEN ZABALA. Reply due by 12/8/2003. Service: 11/20/03.(jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 29 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Terminated:
                                MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by JULIA ZABALA.Service: 9/19/03. Response due by 12/11/2003. (jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 28 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:A Status Conference shall be held on Wednesday, 12/3/2003 02:00 PM before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 27 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/12/2003 Return of Service Executed
                                    Return of Service Executed showing service by Certified Mail of Notice/Summons on Julia Zabala, on 8/1/03. (jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 26 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER: That the Court finds, sua sponte, that Julia Zabala is a necessary party pursuant to RCFC Rule 19(a). For the reasons stated, pltf is ORDERED to join Julia Zabala as a necessary third-party dft pursuant to RCFC 19(a) by August 4, 2003. Dft's motion for summary judgment shall be held in abeyance pending Julia Zabala's appearance in this action. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence S. Margolis : Status Conference held on 4/8/2003. (lmc, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 25 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER setting telephonic Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 4/8/03 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 03/06/2003
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 24 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Amended ComplaintCourt Filing
                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT by CARMEN ZABALA amending [1-1] complaint. Service: 2/11/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 23 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                              NOTICE of two cases decided by the BCMR by CARMEN ZABALA. Service: 2/11/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 22 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER setting Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 3/4/03 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER resetting Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 2/12/03 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Transcript
                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: one volume, at Wasington, DC, for date of december 17, 2002, exhibits: none. Notice to parties. (HW)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER setting telephonic Status Conference for 4:00 p.m. on 1/28/03 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Status Conference
                                                        Status Conference held (HW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER oral argument set for 2:00 p.m. on 12/17/02 for [6-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/26/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                            Response by USA to plaintiff's proposed findings of facts. Service: 10/24/02 (HW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/26/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [6-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 10/24/02 (HW)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motion for summary judgment Response to [6-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 10/25/02 ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motion for summary judgment Response to [6-1] motion for Summary Judgment due 10/25/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/14/2002, Terminated: 10/16/2002 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 10/10/02) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion for summary judgment , (until October 25, 2002). (HW)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to the motion for summary judgment Reply to Response to Motion due 10/11/02 for [6-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002, Terminated: 9/30/2002 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 9/25/02) to Extend Time to reply to the motion for summary judgment until 10/11/02. Response due: 10/15/02. (LTD)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                          RESPONSE by CARMEN ZABALA (Service: 9/10/02) to [6-1] motion for Summary Judgment, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 9/27/02. (FE) Modified on 09/26/2002
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment, etc. Response to [6-1] motion for Summary Judgment due 9/11/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002, Terminated: 8/7/2002 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION by CARMEN ZABALA (Service: 7/30/02) to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment, etc. , (until September 11, 2002). (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 7/11/02) for Summary Judgment Response due: 8/12/02 (LTD)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 7/11/02. (LTD)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002 Order
                                                                                    ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. reset Answer deadline to 7/11/02 ( signed by the Clerk ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002, Terminated: 6/4/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 6/4/02) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (to July 11, 2002). (DS)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lauren Springer Moore. Service: 5/14/02. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/12/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                          Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/12/2002
                                                                                            COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $150, RECEIPT #053641. Answer due on 6/11/02. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 144 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?